Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 178 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7185 Week
» 13319 Month
» 241203 Year
» 1462768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "3F" Class 0-6-0T


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
3F 7260 47260 07/1924 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1960
07/1960
3F 7261 47261 07/1924 14C
14A
14B
W
St Albans
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/01/1960
16/07/1960
30/06/1962
30/06/1962
3F 7262 47262 07/1924 14B
33A
33B
30A
W
Kentish Town
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
07/11/1959
12/03/1960
09/11/1960
09/11/1960
3F 7263 47263 07/1924 14B
16B
W
Kentish Town
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
11/1961
11/1961
3F 7264 47264 07/1924 15A
15D
W
Wellingborough
Bedford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
27/04/1963
27/04/1963
3F 7265 47265 07/1924 15A
W
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1960
03/09/1960
3F 7266 47266 07/1924 5B
5E
25E
56D
56A
5C
6J
5B
6J
6A
W
Crewe South
Alsager
Sowerby Bridge
Mirfield
Wakefield
Stafford
Holyhead
Crewe South
Holyhead
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
03/12/1955
20/06/1959
01/10/1960
09/11/1963
14/12/1963
25/04/1964
31/10/1964
23/07/1966
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
3F 7267 47267 07/1924 9A
6H
6J
W
Longsight
Bangor
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
13/07/1963
23/11/1963
23/11/1963
3F 7268 47268 07/1924 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1961
08/1961
3F 7269 47269 07/1924 16B
1A
5D
10B
2A
8C
2A
6A
2A
6B
12B
W
Spital Bridge
Willesden
Stoke
Preston
Rugby
Speke Junction
Rugby
Chester (MR)
Rugby
Mold Junction
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
16/05/1953
08/08/1953
05/09/1953
06/11/1954
01/01/1955
22/11/1958
06/12/1958
23/05/1959
05/11/1960
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7270 47270 08/1924 16B
1A
5D
8F
W
Spital Bridge
Willesden
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
16/05/1953
27/02/1960
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7271 47271 08/1924 20B
55F
56A
56F
W
Stourton
Manningham
Wakefield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
31/01/1959
01/10/1960
29/12/1960
29/12/1960
3F 7272 47272 08/1924 18C
17C
17A
18C
8H
W
Hasland
Rowsley
Derby
Hasland
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/02/1963
23/02/1963
18/05/1963
15/08/1964
18/06/1966
18/06/1966
3F 7273 47273 08/1924 21A
15A
5B
5D
W
Saltley
Wellingborough
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
22/08/1964
14/11/1964
12/1966
12/1966
3F 7274 47274 08/1924 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7275 47275 08/1924 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/03/1962
31/03/1962
3F 7276 47276 08/1924 21A
21C
82F
W
Saltley
Bromsgrove
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
13/04/1964
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
3F 7277 47277 08/1924 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1961
05/1961
3F 7278 47278 08/1924 18C
W
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1963
15/06/1963
3F 7279 47279 08/1924 15A
15D
15A
12D
8L
8G
W
Wellingborough
Bedford
Wellingborough
Workington
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1957
03/08/1963
02/11/1963
04/12/1965
19/11/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7280 47280 08/1924 5B
5B
5D
5C
5D
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Stoke
Stafford
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
05/08/1961
08/09/1962
24/11/1962
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
3F 7281 47281 08/1924 1A
8F
12A
W
Willesden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1960
05/11/1960
16/03/1963
16/03/1963
3F 7282 47282 09/1924 14B
33A
35C
35A
35C
30A
W
Kentish Town
Plaistow
Spital Bridge
New England
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
17/12/1955
20/04/1957
14/12/1957
08/03/1958
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
3F 7283 47283 09/1924 14B
14A
18A
W
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1962
15/09/1962
13/04/1963
13/04/1963
3F 7284 47284 09/1924 8C
6E
26F
26A
W
Speke Junction
Wrexham Rhosddu
Patricroft
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
01/11/1958
09/04/1960
19/09/1964
19/09/1964
3F 7285 47285 09/1924 2D
8A
W
Nuneaton
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
3F 7286 47286 09/1924 2D
1D

5C

2E
W
Nuneaton
Devons Road (Bow)
Wolverton Works
Stafford
Wolverton Works
Northampton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
05/10/1957
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
07/07/1962
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
3F 7287 47287 10/1924 11B
24L
W
Barrow in Furness
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1963
26/10/1963
26/10/1963
3F 7288 47288 10/1924 2B
10E
12A
12B
24L
12B
W
Bletchley
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
14/06/1958
29/11/1958
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
21/11/1964
21/11/1964
3F 7289 47289 10/1924 9B
8A
8L
8G
16G
W
Stockport Edgeley
Edge Hill
Aintree
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Westhouses (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
04/07/1964
19/11/1966
04/02/1967
07/10/1967
07/10/1967
3F 7290 47290 10/1924 12D
W
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
3F 7291 47291 10/1924 10B
9A
W
Preston
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7292 47292 10/1924 12D
12A
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3F 7293 47293 10/1924 10B
10E
24C
10G
W
Preston
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Lostock Hall
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
16/09/1961
03/12/1966
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7294 47294 10/1924 5C
3A

2B

W
Stafford
Bescot

Nuneaton
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
20/02/1960
01/07/1961
07/07/1962
12/10/1963
12/10/1963
3F 7295 47295 10/1924 12B
W
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/04/1965
10/04/1965
3F 7296 47296 10/1924 10B
3C
3A
W
Preston
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
14/06/1958
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7297 47297 10/1924 6A
W
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1964
06/06/1964
3F 7298 47298 10/1924 2B
10E
W
Bletchley
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7299 47299 11/1924 2C
25E
W
Northampton
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
25/11/1959
25/11/1959
3F 7300 47300 12/1924 13A
13A
33B
33A
35B
35C
31B
24D
26F
26A
W
Plaistow
Plaistow
Tilbury
Plaistow
Grantham
Spital Bridge
March
Lower Darwen
Patricroft
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
19/04/1952
25/05/1956
20/07/1957
06/02/1960
24/12/1960
04/02/1961
15/09/1962
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
3F 7301 47301 12/1924 21C
21C
26A
27A
W
Bromsgrove
Bromsgrove
Newton Heath
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7302 47302 01/1925 13B
1A
1B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
19/04/1958
07/11/1959
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7303 47303 01/1925 21C
26A
27A
W
Bromsgrove
Newton Heath
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
09/1960
09/1960
3F 7304 47304 01/1925 13B
1B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
3F 7305 47305 02/1925 21C
26A
27B
12C
W
Bromsgrove
Newton Heath
Aintree
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
04/04/1964
27/02/1965
27/02/1965
3F 7306 47306 02/1925 13B
33A
35C
35A
35C
30A
24D
27A
9G
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Plaistow
Spital Bridge
New England
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Lower Darwen
Bank Hall
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
17/12/1955
20/04/1957
24/08/1957
12/04/1958
24/12/1960
04/02/1961
09/11/1963
19/12/1964
19/12/1964
3F 7307 47307 03/1925 13B
1B
1C
1A
1E
5D
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Watford
Willesden
Bletchley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
07/11/1959
14/07/1962
18/05/1963
10/07/1965
09/1966
09/1966
3F 7308 47308 1925 21C
82F
W
Bromsgrove
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/04/1964
10/08/1964
10/08/1964
3F 7309 47309 03/1925 8A
8C
8E
8C
10C
W
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Brunswick
Speke Junction
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/11/1950
25/02/1956
03/11/1956
07/11/1959
07/11/1959
3F 7310 47310 12/1928 13B
1B
3A
8C
5B
5D
5C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Bescot
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Stoke
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
07/11/1959
19/12/1959
05/11/1960
28/01/1961
11/04/1961
07/04/1962
07/04/1962
3F 7311 47311 01/1929 13A
35C
35A
35C
30A
W
Plaistow
Spital Bridge
New England
Spital Bridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1956
20/04/1957
19/10/1957
08/03/1958
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
3F 7312 47312 01/1929 13B
33A
33B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
07/11/1959
12/03/1960
01/03/1961
01/03/1961
3F 7313 47313 01/1929 21C
15C
17B
16G
W
Bromsgrove
Leicester Midland
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
29/10/1960
06/08/1966
10/06/1967
10/06/1967
3F 7314 47314 01/1929 13B
8C
8F
10D
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
21/07/1962
23/07/1966
12/1966
12/1966
3F 7315 47315 02/1929 13B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
08/1959
08/1959
3F 7316 47316 02/1929 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
3F 7317 47317 06/1926 11A
11A
24J
10A
10C
10G
W
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Fleetwood
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
07/07/1962
18/04/1964
10/04/1965
22/01/1966
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
3F 7318 47318 06/1926 2C

W
Northampton
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1962
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
3F 7319 47319 06/1926 10B
12E
24C
W
Preston
Moor Row
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
16/09/1961
09/1962
09/1962
3F 7320 47320 06/1926 5D
8E
16A
17C
16C
W
Stoke
Brunswick
Nottingham
Rowsley
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
16/09/1961
01/06/1963
02/05/1964
09/05/1964
09/05/1964
3F 7321 47321 06/1926 7C
W
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1965
11/1965
3F 7322 47322 06/1926 11B
24J
26F
W
Barrow in Furness
Lancaster Green Ayre
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1961
23/02/1963
20/07/1963
20/07/1963
3F 7323 47323 06/1926 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
12/03/1960
3F 7324 47324 06/1926 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7325 47325 06/1926 8A
8E
17A
5B
W
Edge Hill
Brunswick
Derby
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
01/10/1960
06/06/1964
11/09/1965
11/09/1965
3F 7326 47326 07/1926 12B
12A
10D
W
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/04/1965
10/12/1966
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7327 47327 07/1926 1A
8E
17A
27A
8L
W
Willesden
Brunswick
Derby
Bank Hall
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
01/10/1960
13/01/1962
14/12/1963
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7328 47328 07/1926 13A
33B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
3F 7329 47329 07/1926 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1959
05/1959
3F 7330 47330 07/1926 5B
5D
5B
99C
W
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1960
05/08/1961
25/04/1964
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
3F 7331 47331 07/1926 27A
66C
W
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/03/1956
23/04/1959
23/04/1959
3F 7332 47332 07/1926 27A
68A
W
Polmadie
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/03/1956
05/05/1962
05/05/1962
3F 7333 47333 07/1926 15A
22A
24B
10D
W
Wellingborough
Bristol Barrow Road
Rose Grove
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
15/07/1961
26/09/1964
28/11/1964
28/11/1964
3F 7334 47334 07/1926 20D
50D
50A
50B
W
Normanton
Starbeck
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/10/1958
27/12/1958
27/02/1960
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7335 47335 07/1926 20D
56F
56D
W
Normanton
Low Moor
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/07/1957
14/06/1958
09/12/1960
09/12/1960
3F 7336 47336 07/1926 19E
39A
9B
8A
24C
W
Belle Vue
Gorton
Stockport Edgeley
Edge Hill
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
21/02/1959
07/11/1959
11/05/1963
06/1966
06/1966
3F 7337 47337 08/1926 12E
12D
12B
W
Moor Row
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
13/12/1958
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7338 47338 08/1926 5D
5B
2D
6C
5B
W
Stoke
Crewe South
Coventry
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
05/11/1955
15/11/1958
14/05/1960
09/10/1965
09/10/1965
3F 7339 47339 08/1926 11A
W
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1959
12/12/1959
3F 7340 47340 08/1926 12B
W
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
24/03/1962
3F 7341 47341 08/1926 9A
5B
9A
24L
5B
5D
21E
21D
1A
1E
1A

W
Longsight
Crewe South
Longsight
Carnforth
Crewe South
Stoke
Monument Lane
Aston
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1960
29/10/1960
26/11/1960
24/12/1960
28/01/1961
11/04/1961
10/02/1962
29/09/1962
11/05/1963
18/05/1963
14/03/1964
16/07/1966
16/07/1966
3F 7342 47342 08/1926 1A
12A
24L
12B
W
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
24/01/1959
07/11/1959
12/05/1962
12/05/1962
3F 7343 47343 08/1926 9A
6F
6C
W
Longsight
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
09/02/1963
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
3F 7344 47344 08/1926 5B
5D
8C
12F
10F
W
Crewe South
Stoke
Speke Junction
Workington
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
10/12/1960
16/09/1961
25/01/1964
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
3F 7345 47345 09/1926 9A
11A
12B
W
Longsight
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
06/10/1962
09/1964
09/1964
3F 7346 47346 09/1926 9B
W
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7347 47347 07/1926 9A
24J
W
Longsight
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
05/11/1960
05/11/1960
3F 7348 47348 07/1926 13B
1B
1E

W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Bletchley
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
07/11/1959
30/04/1960
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7349 47349 07/1926 13B
12A
3A
5B
5D
8D
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Bescot
Crewe South
Stoke
Widnes
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
24/01/1959
05/11/1960
28/01/1961
11/04/1961
07/09/1963
08/1964
08/1964
3F 7350 47350 07/1926 13B
1A
1B
12D
6K
6B
6J
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Camden
Workington
Rhyl
Mold Junction
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
19/06/1954
06/11/1954
09/02/1963
30/10/1965
18/12/1965
18/12/1965
3F 7351 47351 07/1926 13A
33B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
3F 7352 47352 07/1926 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
12/03/1960
3F 7353 47353 07/1926 6B
W
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/02/1962
17/02/1962
3F 7354 47354 07/1926 1B
12A
3A
5B
W
Camden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Bescot
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
24/01/1959
05/11/1960
17/10/1964
17/10/1964
3F 7355 47355 07/1926 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
3F 7356 47356 07/1926 1B
12A
9A
11A
24J
W
Camden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Barrow in Furness
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
24/01/1959
07/11/1959
25/11/1961
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
3F 7357 47357 07/1926 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7358 47358 07/1926 1B
12A
W
Camden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
08/12/1962
08/12/1962
3F 7359 47359 07/1926 1C
1B
2D
5C
W
Watford
Camden
Coventry
Stafford
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
13/08/1955
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
3F 7360 47360 07/1926 2A
10B
24C
W
Rugby
Preston
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
16/09/1961
20/07/1963
20/07/1963
3F 7361 47361 07/1926 1A
8D
11B
W
Willesden
Widnes
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
17/05/1958
01/05/1965
01/05/1965
3F 7362 47362 08/1926 1A
8B
10A
9D
W
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Carnforth
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
20/06/1964
21/08/1965
06/11/1965
06/11/1965
3F 7363 47363 08/1926 3D
3B
W
Aston
Bushbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7364 47364 07/1926 3D
10C
W
Aston
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7365 47365 07/1926 3D
10C
W
Aston
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
19/12/1964
19/12/1964
3F 7366 47366 07/1926 3D
10E
W
Aston
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
28/04/1962
28/04/1962
3F 7367 47367 08/1926 2D
8E
18A
8G
8L
W
Nuneaton
Brunswick
Toton
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
16/09/1961
20/06/1964
03/07/1965
12/1966
12/1966
3F 7368 47368 08/1926 7C
W
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1964
28/02/1964
3F 7369 47369 09/1926 9A
24J
W
Longsight
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
3F 7370 47370 09/1926 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1959
10/10/1959
3F 7371 47371 09/1926 6B
6A
W
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/12/1958
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7372 47372 09/1926 6B
6G
6C
W
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/12/1958
10/10/1959
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
3F 7373 47373 09/1926 6A
11A
11A
12F
W
Chester (MR)
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
07/11/1959
01/09/1962
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7374 47374 09/1926 6A
W
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
12/03/1960
3F 7375 47375 09/1926 6A
24L
24J
10A
W
Chester (MR)
Carnforth
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1961
08/09/1962
18/04/1964
08/08/1964
08/08/1964
3F 7376 47376 09/1926 8B
8G
W
Warrington Dallam
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3F 7377 47377 09/1926 12B
8G
W
Carlisle Upperby
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1963
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
3F 7378 47378 10/1926 2A
1A
10C
W
Rugby
Willesden
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
18/05/1957
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
3F 7379 47379 10/1926 2A
5C
2A
25E
56A
56E
56A
W
Rugby
Stafford
Rugby
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
21/05/1955
03/12/1955
01/10/1960
07/10/1961
17/03/1962
18/11/1963
18/11/1963
3F 7380 47380 10/1926 1A
99C
W
Willesden
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1962
02/05/1964
02/05/1964
3F 7381 47381 10/1926 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
3F 7382 47382 10/1926 3A
W
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7383 47383 10/1926 6A
8C
12C
24B
9D
16G
W
Chester (MR)
Speke Junction
Carlisle Canal
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Westhouses (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1961
10/11/1962
22/06/1963
08/01/1966
04/02/1967
07/10/1967
07/10/1967
3F 7384 47384 10/1926 5B
5B
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7385 47385 10/1926 8A
3A
21E
2B

W
Edge Hill
Bescot
Monument Lane
Nuneaton
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
03/09/1960
01/07/1961
07/07/1962
04/1964
04/1964
3F 7386 47386 10/1926 24B
24C
W
Rose Grove
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
27/04/1963
27/04/1963
3F 7387 47387 11/1926 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7388 47388 11/1926 8C
12C
26C
9D
W
Speke Junction
Carlisle Canal
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
22/06/1963
27/11/1965
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
3F 7389 47389 11/1926 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1966
07/1966
3F 7390 47390 11/1926 12E
12D
W
Moor Row
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
3F 7391 47391 11/1926 12B
5B
99C
5B
5B
6A
W
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Crewe South
Crewe South
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
27/12/1958
18/04/1959
25/04/1964
23/07/1966
10/1966
10/1966
3F 7392 47392 11/1926 5E
9B
24K
9B
8B
8F
8G
W
Alsager
Stockport Edgeley
Preston
Stockport Edgeley
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/12/1958
02/05/1959
20/06/1959
07/11/1959
09/01/1960
05/05/1962
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3F 7393 47393 11/1926 10E
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
3F 7394 47394 11/1926 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7395 47395 11/1926 1A
5B
5F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/05/1960
28/01/1961
17/04/1965
17/04/1965
3F 7396 47396 11/1926 3A
2B

W
Bescot
Nuneaton
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/07/1961
16/03/1963
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
3F 7397 47397 11/1926 3B
5B
W
Bushbury
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1960
09/1966
09/1966
3F 7398 47398 11/1926 3B
5B
5F
24J
W
Bushbury
Crewe South
Uttoxeter
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1960
28/01/1961
25/02/1961
06/05/1961
06/05/1961
3F 7399 47399 11/1926 3B
10C
3B
5E
5B
W
Bushbury
Patricroft
Bushbury
Alsager
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
03/10/1959
19/11/1960
23/06/1962
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
3F 7400 47400 11/1926 9A
5B
99C
W
Longsight
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/05/1960
25/04/1964
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
3F 7401 47401 11/1926 10D
10C
8B
24L
5E
W
Plodder Lane
Patricroft
Warrington Dallam
Carnforth
Alsager
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
03/10/1959
09/01/1960
12/03/1960
12/11/1960
12/11/1960
3F 7402 47402 12/1926 8A
99H
W
Edge Hill
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/05/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
3F 7403 47403 12/1926 12B
25B
50A
50D
50A
50E
W
Carlisle Upperby
Huddersfield Hillhouse
York (North)
Starbeck
York (North)
Scarborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
08/03/1958
27/12/1958
11/04/1959
19/09/1959
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7404 47404 12/1926 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1962
24/02/1962
3F 7405 47405 12/1926 20D
56F
56A
W
Normanton
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/05/1958
01/10/1960
30/09/1961
30/09/1961
3F 7406 47406 12/1926 11A
8B
12F
27A
9G
8A
W
Carnforth
Warrington Dallam
Workington
Bank Hall
Gorton
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
11/08/1962
06/04/1963
07/09/1963
23/01/1965
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7407 47407 12/1926 11A
8A
W
Carnforth
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7408 47408 12/1926 12B
26A
W
Carlisle Upperby
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1963
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
3F 7409 47409 12/1926 11A
W
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7410 47410 12/1926 11A
6B
6J
W
Carnforth
Mold Junction
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1960
15/02/1964
09/1966
09/1966
3F 7411 47411 12/1926 13B
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7412 47412 12/1926 1A
8A
W
Willesden
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1959
10/1963
10/1963
3F 7413 47413 12/1926 3B
10B
24C
W
Bushbury
Preston
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
16/09/1961
05/1963
05/1963
3F 7414 47414 12/1926 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1962
05/05/1962
3F 7415 47415 12/1926 12B
8A
W
Carlisle Upperby
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/08/1964
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
3F 7416 47416 12/1926 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1966
07/1966
3F 7417 47417 12/1926 17A
17A
22B
W
Derby
Derby
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
3F 7418 47418 12/1926 20A
50A
W
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1958
09/06/1961
09/06/1961
3F 7419 47419 12/1926 20E
55C
W
Manningham
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1960
23/12/1963
23/12/1963
3F 7420 47420 12/1926 20B
55C
W
Stourton
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1960
30/09/1961
30/09/1961
3F 7421 47421 12/1926 20C
50A
W
Royston
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7422 47422 12/1926 16A
22B
W
Nottingham
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
08/1962
08/1962
3F 7423 47423 12/1926 18C
8H
W
Hasland
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/08/1964
07/1965
07/1965
3F 7424 47424 12/1926 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1962
23/05/1962
3F 7425 47425 12/1926 21C
26A
27B
W
Bromsgrove
Newton Heath
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1956
23/02/1957
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
3F 7426 47426 12/1926 18C
18D
W
Hasland
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
09/1962
09/1962
3F 7427 47427 10/1926 14B
16A
W
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
3F 7428 47428 10/1926 14B
20F
26B
W
Kentish Town
Skipton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
15/09/1962
09/10/1965
09/10/1965
3F 7429 47429 10/1926 14B
33A
35A
35B
35C
35A
16D
17A
99H
9J
W
Kentish Town
Plaistow
New England
Grantham
Spital Bridge
New England
Annesley
Derby
Horwich Works
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
17/12/1955
25/05/1956
20/07/1957
19/10/1957
20/12/1958
04/04/1959
25/03/1961
09/10/1965
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
3F 7430 47430 10/1926 1A
8A
10C
W
Willesden
Edge Hill
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
26/01/1952
04/01/1964
04/01/1964
3F 7431 47431 10/1926 5B
8A
6C
9B
5B
8C
W
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stockport Edgeley
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/01/1958
01/11/1958
07/11/1959
17/09/1960
10/12/1960
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
3F 7432 47432 10/1926 14B
19A
8E
14A
1A
W
Kentish Town
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Brunswick
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
10/08/1957
31/01/1959
12/12/1964
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
3F 7433 47433 10/1926 14A
15A
14A
W
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1960
30/09/1961
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7434 47434 11/1926 14A
16C
W
Cricklewood East
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/12/1963
05/1964
05/1964
3F 7435 47435 11/1926 14A
1A

W
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1964
02/10/1965
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
3F 7436 47436 04/1927 18A
20A
50A
W
Toton
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
19/07/1958
20/12/1960
20/12/1960
3F 7437 47437 04/1927 15B
14B
14A
14E
15A
16C
6A
2K
2F
6A
W
Kettering
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Bedford
Wellingborough
Derby
Chester (MR)
Bushbury
Bescot
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
25/08/1962
29/06/1963
03/08/1963
21/12/1963
20/06/1964
05/12/1964
17/04/1965
16/10/1965
13/08/1966
13/08/1966
3F 7438 47438 04/1927 16A
20C
50D
50A
53E
W
Nottingham
Royston
Starbeck
York (North)
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
14/12/1957
19/09/1959
10/10/1959
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7439 47439 05/1927 8C
6J
W
Speke Junction
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7440 47440 05/1927 19E
26A
W
Belle Vue
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7441 47441 05/1927 15C
17A
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
21/12/1963
21/12/1963
3F 7442 47442 05/1927 15C
15E
14B
14A
18A
17C
18A
18B
W
Leicester Midland
Leicester (G.C.)
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Rowsley
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
02/04/1960
04/08/1962
25/08/1962
26/01/1963
18/05/1963
27/07/1963
06/03/1965
06/03/1965
3F 7443 47443 05/1927 20B
56B
56D
W
Stourton
Ardsley
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
09/12/1960
09/12/1960
3F 7444 47444 05/1927 5B
8F
8L
W
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1961
07/05/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
3F 7445 47445 05/1927 5B
5B
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1960
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
3F 7446 47446 06/1927 15A
20D
56F
W
Wellingborough
Normanton
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/05/1958
20/12/1960
20/12/1960
3F 7447 47447 06/1927 14A
16C
8H
W
Cricklewood East
Derby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/05/1964
05/09/1964
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
3F 7448 47448 06/1927 20C
50A
W
Royston
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7449 47449 07/1927 17C
14B
14A
18A
99H
W
Coalville
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/03/1959
04/08/1962
25/08/1962
05/01/1963
30/03/1963
30/03/1963
3F 7450 47450 07/1927 6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
3F 7451 47451 07/1927 5B
10B
5D
11B
5D

W
Crewe South
Preston
Stoke
Workington
Stoke
Wolverton Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
05/09/1953
27/02/1960
19/03/1960
24/08/1963
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7452 47452 10/1926 2B
10E
W
Bletchley
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
3F 7453 47453 10/1926 10E
8L
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1965
23/04/1966
23/04/1966
3F 7454 47454 10/1926 18A
20F
10D
W
Toton
Skipton
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
26/09/1964
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
3F 7455 47455 10/1926 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1962
23/05/1962
3F 7457 47457 11/1926 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
3F 7458 47458 11/1926 13A
35A
35B
35C
35A
16D
17B
26F
W
Plaistow
New England
Grantham
Spital Bridge
New England
Annesley
Burton
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
25/05/1956
20/07/1957
24/08/1957
20/12/1958
04/04/1959
15/12/1962
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
3F 7459 47459 12/1926 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
26/01/1963
3F 7460 47460 12/1926 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1963
18/05/1963
3F 7461 47461 04/1927 17D
16C
8H
16C
W
Rowsley
Derby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/05/1964
15/08/1964
05/09/1964
12/09/1964
12/09/1964
3F 7462 47462 04/1927 20C
50D
50A
53E
W
Royston
Starbeck
York (North)
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
19/09/1959
10/10/1959
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7463 47463 04/1927 20B
56B
56A
56D
W
Stourton
Ardsley
Wakefield
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
28/02/1959
01/10/1960
12/1960
12/1960
3F 7464 47464 05/1927 17B
21C
17B
W
Burton
Bromsgrove
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
28/12/1957
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
3F 7465 47465 05/1927 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/06/1963
01/06/1963
3F 7466 47466 06/1927 18B
W
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7467 47467 01/1928 1B
5B
W
Camden
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
3F 7468 47468 01/1928 20H
10A
10F
10C
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Rose Grove
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1964
19/09/1964
26/09/1964
23/01/1965
23/01/1965
3F 7469 47469 01/1928 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/01/1964
11/01/1964
3F 7470 47470 01/1928 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
3F 7471 47471 01/1928 20H
24L
12A
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7472 47472 12/1927 6C
5D
10B
24C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Preston
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
05/09/1953
16/09/1961
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
3F 7473 47473 12/1927 3B
24L
W
Bushbury
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1960
17/02/1962
17/02/1962
3F 7474 47474 12/1927 1A
3E
21D
5C
W
Willesden
Monument Lane
Aston
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
10/02/1962
03/03/1962
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
3F 7475 47475 12/1927 1A
12A
5C
W
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
17/01/1959
24/02/1962
24/02/1962
3F 7476 47476 12/1927 7C
W
Holyhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1964
09/05/1964
3F 7477 47477 12/1927 4C
27A
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7478 47478 01/1928 4C
87D

6C

2B
5C
2B
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Swansea East Dock
Wolverton Works
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Wolverton Works
Nuneaton
Stafford
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
03/10/1959
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
07/07/1962
06/04/1963
25/05/1963
11/04/1964
11/04/1964
3F 7479 47479 01/1928 4C
87D

5B

2B
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Swansea East Dock
Wolverton Works
Crewe South
Wolverton Works
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
03/10/1959
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
07/07/1962
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3F 7480 47480 01/1928 4C
27E
27A
27B
9D
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Walton on the Hill
Bank Hall
Aintree
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
04/10/1958
10/03/1962
21/03/1964
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7481 47481 01/1928 4C
24J
12A
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/03/1959
02/02/1963
30/03/1963
30/03/1963
3F 7482 47482 01/1928 13B
1A
5B
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
29/10/1960
22/10/1966
22/10/1966
3F 7483 47483 01/1928 13B
1A
24J
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
05/11/1960
03/03/1962
03/03/1962
3F 7484 47484 01/1928 13A
33B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
02/1961
02/1961
3F 7485 47485 01/1928 16A
17B
15C
14B
14E
15A
8A
W
Nottingham
Burton
Leicester Midland
Kentish Town
Bedford
Wellingborough
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
06/02/1960
04/03/1961
17/03/1962
03/08/1963
02/11/1963
09/01/1965
09/01/1965
3F 7486 47486 01/1928 13B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
12/03/1960
12/03/1960
3F 7487 47487 01/1928 13B
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
21/08/1965
21/08/1965
3F 7488 47488 01/1928 13B
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3F 7489 47489 01/1928 13B
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
3F 7490 47490 02/1928 13B
8C
8D
8G
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Speke Junction
Widnes
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
06/10/1956
23/09/1961
13/07/1963
13/07/1963
3F 7491 47491 02/1928 13B
1A
5F
2B
6E
26F
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Uttoxeter
Nuneaton
Wrexham Rhosddu
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
21/04/1956
03/11/1956
01/12/1956
01/11/1958
15/12/1962
15/12/1962
3F 7492 47492 02/1928 13B
1A
12A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
22/03/1958
08/1964
08/1964
3F 7493 47493 02/1928 13B
8C
26A
8C
8F
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Speke Junction
Newton Heath
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
13/12/1958
14/03/1959
21/07/1962
04/09/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7494 47494 02/1928 13B
11B
3E
21D
5B
99C
5B
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Barrow in Furness
Monument Lane
Aston
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
30/11/1957
10/02/1962
08/12/1962
17/08/1963
14/12/1963
22/10/1966
22/10/1966
3F 7495 47495 02/1928 13B
1B
6F
6C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
09/01/1960
09/02/1963
25/09/1965
25/09/1965
3F 7496 47496 02/1928 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1963
30/11/1963
3F 7497 47497 04/1928 13B
12A
6C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
22/11/1958
22/09/1962
22/09/1962
3F 7498 47498 04/1928 13B
8A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
12/03/1960
12/03/1960
3F 7499 47499 04/1928 13B
2B
2E
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Nuneaton
Northampton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
25/01/1958
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
3F 7500 47500 04/1928 13B
1E

1E
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Bletchley
Wolverton Works
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
26/09/1959
23/04/1960
07/1965
07/1965
3F 7501 47501 04/1928 13B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
3F 7502 47502 04/1928 13B
21C
17B
15C
14B
9G
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Bromsgrove
Burton
Leicester Midland
Kentish Town
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
05/10/1957
06/02/1960
18/11/1961
28/07/1962
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
3F 7503 47503 04/1928 11A
11B
11A
W
Carnforth
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
06/09/1958
14/03/1964
14/03/1964
3F 7504 47504 04/1928 6A
6A
W
Chester (MR)
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
21/04/1962
21/04/1962
3F 7505 47505 04/1928 13B
1A
11B
5B
99C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
28/12/1957
02/12/1961
06/07/1963
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
3F 7506 47506 04/1928 13B
22B
85D
82F
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Gloucester Barnwood
Bromsgrove
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
09/03/1963
30/11/1963
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
3F 7507 47507 04/1928 6C
6K
6G
6A
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1962
09/02/1963
23/07/1966
09/1966
09/1966
3F 7508 47508 04/1928 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/09/1961
30/09/1961
3F 7509 47509 04/1928 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/12/1960
09/12/1960
3F 7510 47510 05/1928 25E
56E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1960
11/11/1960
11/11/1960
3F 7511 47511 05/1928 13B
6H
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
18/04/1964
18/04/1964
3F 7512 47512 05/1928 13A
33B
24D

27B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Lower Darwen

Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
07/01/1961
28/01/1961
06/05/1961
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
3F 7513 47513 05/1928 19A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1961
09/05/1961
3F 7514 47514 05/1928 13B
1B
24L
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Camden
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
05/11/1960
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
3F 7515 47515 05/1928 13B
12A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
11/07/1964
11/07/1964
3F 7516 47516 05/1928 13B
8C
5B
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
11/09/1954
10/02/1962
10/02/1962
3F 7517 47517 02/1928 13B
11A
26A
11A
8F
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Barrow in Furness
Newton Heath
Barrow in Furness
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
13/12/1958
14/03/1959
25/11/1961
27/06/1964
27/06/1964
3F 7518 47518 02/1928 13B
5C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1961
26/10/1963
26/10/1963
3F 7519 47519 02/1928 3A
8A
W
Bescot
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7520 47520 02/1928 1A
11B
8F
12E
24L
12C
26C
9D
W
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Barrow in Furness
Carnforth
Carlisle Canal
Bolton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
21/01/1961
04/02/1961
10/03/1962
08/09/1962
22/06/1963
20/11/1965
27/11/1965
27/11/1965
3F 7521 47521 02/1928 2B
5D
5B
5D
W
Bletchley
Stoke
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/07/1965
04/12/1965
13/08/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7522 47522 02/1928 1B
24L
12F
W
Camden
Carnforth
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1960
16/09/1961
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3F 7523 47523 02/1928 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1960
12/11/1960
3F 7524 47524 03/1928 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
3F 7525 47525 03/1928 12E
12D
W
Moor Row
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7526 47526 03/1928 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3F 7527 47527 03/1928 1B
12A
W
Camden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7528 47528 03/1928 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7529 47529 03/1928 1B
5B
W
Camden
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
3F 7530 47530 03/1928 6C
8E
6C
5B
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Brunswick
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
16/06/1957
28/10/1961
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7531 47531 03/1928 1A
11B
8B
10A
12D
10D
W
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Warrington Dallam
Carnforth
Workington
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
08/06/1963
20/06/1964
21/08/1965
10/12/1966
04/02/1967
04/02/1967
3F 7532 47532 04/1928 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/03/1963
30/03/1963
3F 7533 47533 04/1928 15C
17A
16A
17C
16C
8H
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Nottingham
Rowsley
Derby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
13/01/1962
25/05/1963
02/05/1964
13/06/1964
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
3F 7534 47534 04/1928 15C
17A
16G
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
26/06/1965
25/03/1967
25/03/1967
3F 7535 47535 04/1928 18C
16G
W
Hasland
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/10/1964
22/01/1966
22/01/1966
3F 7536 47536 04/1928 27A
66D
66A
66B
W
Polmadie
Greenock Ladyburn
Polmadie
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1957
26/10/1957
12/03/1960
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
3F 7537 47537 04/1928 27A
68A
W
Polmadie
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
09/1960
09/1960
3F 7536 47538 04/1928 20B
56B
56A
W
Stourton
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
28/02/1959
10/06/1959
10/06/1959
3F 7539 47539 04/1928 16A
22B
85B
82F
W
Nottingham
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
11/08/1962
03/11/1962
09/02/1963
09/02/1963
3F 7540 47540 04/1928 27A
68A
W
Polmadie
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/06/1956
15/04/1961
15/04/1961
3F 7541 47541 04/1928 32A
66A
66B
W
Inverness
Polmadie
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
12/03/1960
16/06/1960
16/06/1960
3F 7542 47542 11/1927 22C
82G
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1958
06/1962
06/1962
3F 7543 47543 12/1927 15A
15C
14A
18C
16G
W
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Cricklewood East
Hasland
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
10/03/1962
03/08/1963
17/10/1964
11/1965
11/1965
3F 7544 47544 12/1927 22A
82F
82F
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
09/02/1963
03/12/1965
03/12/1965
3F 7545 47545 12/1927 19A
18A
16A
18D
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Toton
Nottingham
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
08/08/1953
02/08/1962
02/08/1962
3F 7546 47546 12/1927 19C
26A
W
Canklow
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1959
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
3F 7547 47547 12/1927 19C
26A
W
Canklow
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1959
07/12/1963
07/12/1963
3F 7548 47548 12/1927 14A
41D
W
Cricklewood East
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
15/08/1962
15/08/1962
3F 7549 47549 12/1927 15D
99H
W
Bedford
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/03/1963
08/1964
08/1964
3F 7550 47550 01/1928 22A
27A
99H
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bank Hall
Horwich Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/03/1959
13/01/1962
14/03/1964
14/03/1964
3F 7551 47551 01/1928 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1963
23/02/1963
3F 7552 47552 01/1928 16A
22A
82G
82E
82G
W
Nottingham
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
31/10/1959
30/01/1960
19/05/1962
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
3F 7554 47554 02/1928 15A
14C
14A
14B
W
Wellingborough
St Albans
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
16/01/1960
15/07/1961
09/1962
09/1962
3F 7555 47555 02/1928 18A
33A
33B
W
Toton
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
07/11/1959
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
3F 7556 47556 02/1928 12B
25B
55F
50A
W
Carlisle Upperby
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Manningham
York (North)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
08/03/1958
31/01/1959
10/12/1962
10/12/1962
3F 7557 47557 03/1928 22C
82F
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/02/1963
28/02/1964
28/02/1964
3F 7558 47558 03/1928 13B
6H
6G
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
07/11/1959
21/03/1964
21/03/1964
3F 7559 47559 03/1928 13B
1A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
06/05/1961
06/05/1961
3F 7560 47560 03/1928 13B
8C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
16/07/1960
16/07/1960
3F 7561 47561 04/1928 13B
3E
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
20/08/1960
20/08/1960
3F 7562 47562 04/1928 13B
24A
24B
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Accrington
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
04/03/1961
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3F 7563 47563 04/1928 13B
19B
17A
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Sheffield Millhouses
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
16/06/1956
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7564 47564 04/1928 13B
12F
12E
24C
W
Devons Road (Bow)
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1962
01/09/1962
11/05/1963
20/03/1965
20/03/1965
3F 7565 47565 05/1928 21C
6F
6C
5B
W
Bromsgrove
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1957
22/11/1958
26/12/1964
02/04/1966
02/04/1966
3F 7566 47566 05/1928 16B
8E
8A
8L
W
Spital Bridge
Brunswick
Edge Hill
Aintree
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
03/11/1956
04/07/1964
10/1966
10/1966
3F 7567 47567 09/1928 25G
56A
W
Farnley Junction
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
11/1960
11/1960
3F 7568 47568 10/1928 25G
W
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1960
12/1960
3F 7569 47569 10/1928 25G
W
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1960
12/1960
3F 7570 47570 10/1928 25G
W
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/09/1961
30/09/1961
3F 7571 47571 10/1928 25G
56A
24A
24B
W
Farnley Junction
Wakefield
Accrington
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
10/12/1960
04/03/1961
13/05/1961
13/05/1961
3F 7572 47572 10/1928 26B
25A
24C
W
Agecroft
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
10/12/1960
14/05/1962
14/05/1962
3F 7573 47573 10/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1960
23/12/1960
3F 7574 47574 10/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1962
15/12/1962
3F 7575 47575 10/1928 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7576 47576 10/1928 24B
26A
W
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/08/1960
24/09/1960
24/09/1960
3F 7577 47577 10/1928 26E
24B
24G
24C
12B
10C
W
Bacup
Rose Grove
Skipton
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Upperby
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
09/07/1960
10/08/1963
26/12/1964
06/02/1965
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
3F 7578 47578 10/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
3F 7579 47579 11/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/07/1964
04/07/1964
3F 7580 47580 11/1928 26E
56D
53A
W
Bacup
Mirfield
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1959
16/01/1960
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7581 47581 11/1928 20C
50A
50D
50A
53E
55C
W
Royston
York (North)
Starbeck
York (North)
Goole
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
27/12/1958
19/09/1959
10/10/1959
23/09/1961
08/02/1963
08/02/1963
3F 7582 47582 11/1928 26E
56F
24D
26A
W
Bacup
Low Moor
Lower Darwen
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1960
10/12/1960
17/12/1960
08/08/1963
08/08/1963
3F 7583 47583 11/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1963
23/03/1963
3F 7584 47584 12/1928 26B
26D
9H
W
Agecroft
Bury
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
29/02/1964
08/1964
08/1964
3F 7585 47585 12/1928 26B
W
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7586 47586 12/1928 26A
24B
W
Newton Heath
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7587 47587 01/1929 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1964
07/11/1964
3F 7588 47588 01/1929 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
3F 7589 47589 01/1929 56B
50B
50D
55C
W
Ardsley
Hull Dairycoates
Goole
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
14/06/1958
05/03/1960
18/06/1960
23/09/1961
23/12/1963
23/12/1963
3F 7590 47590 02/1929 5B
5C
2A
5C
1H
5B
5D
W
Crewe South
Stafford
Rugby
Stafford
Northampton
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
24/08/1963
28/12/1963
11/07/1964
02/10/1965
08/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
3F 7591 47591 02/1929 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7592 47592 08/1928 99C
W
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/03/1966
05/03/1966
3F 7593 47593 08/1928 12D
W
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
3F 7594 47594 09/1928 2D
8A
8D
8A
8B
8A
W
Nuneaton
Edge Hill
Widnes
Edge Hill
Warrington Dallam
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
20/08/1960
25/03/1961
29/07/1961
03/03/1962
11/07/1964
11/07/1964
3F 7595 47595 09/1928 5E
W
Alsager
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7596 47596 09/1928 5D
5E
5D
W
Stoke
Alsager
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1960
23/06/1962
03/07/1965
03/07/1965
3F 7597 47597 10/1928 8A
8D
8A
99C
W
Edge Hill
Widnes
Edge Hill
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/08/1960
08/07/1961
26/08/1961
11/1965
11/1965
3F 7598 47598 11/1928 5C
5B
5E
5D
5C
2A
5C
6G
6B
6A
W
Stafford
Crewe South
Alsager
Stoke
Stafford
Rugby
Stafford
Llandudno Junction
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
29/11/1952
23/06/1962
24/11/1962
24/08/1963
28/12/1963
18/04/1964
22/05/1965
23/04/1966
23/07/1966
23/07/1966
3F 7599 47599 11/1928 5D
12A
24J
10A
10C
10D
10G
W
Stoke
Carlisle Kingmoor
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1960
20/05/1961
18/04/1964
16/10/1965
19/02/1966
09/04/1966
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7600 47600 11/1928 6A
W
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1960
08/1960
3F 7601 47601 11/1928 9B
8D
5B
W
Stockport Edgeley
Widnes
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
07/05/1960
17/03/1962
17/03/1962
3F 7602 47602 09/1928 5B
12A
26D
10C
10G
W
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Bury
Fleetwood
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
22/06/1963
29/02/1964
03/10/1964
08/01/1966
08/01/1966
3F 7603 47603 09/1928 8A
8F
8G
W
Edge Hill
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1962
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
3F 7604 47604 09/1928 12D
12D
W
Workington
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3F 7605 47605 10/1928 11A
11B
W
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1955
13/05/1961
13/05/1961
3F 7606 47606 10/1928 5C
5E
1A
1C

1C
1E
W
Stafford
Alsager
Willesden
Watford
Wolverton Works
Watford
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
23/06/1962
14/07/1962
09/02/1963
09/03/1963
11/05/1963
19/06/1965
19/06/1965
3F 7607 47607 10/1928 20D
50A
W
Normanton
York (North)
Withdrawn
03/12/1955
14/06/1958
30/01/1961
30/01/1961
3F 7608 47608 10/1928 5B
6B
5B
99C
5B
W
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
03/02/1962
31/03/1962
01/12/1962
01/12/1962
3F 7609 47609 10/1928 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/01/1964
25/01/1964
3F 7610 47610 10/1928 5D
11B
W
Stoke
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
3F 7611 47611 10/1928 17B
27F
14B
99C
14A
18C
16G
W
Burton
Brunswick
Kentish Town
Crewe Works
Cricklewood East
Hasland
Westhouses
Withdrawn
06/10/1956
07/02/1959
11/04/1961
25/11/1961
20/04/1963
03/08/1963
17/10/1964
14/05/1966
14/05/1966
3F 7612 47612 10/1928 2C
8C
12F
W
Northampton
Speke Junction
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
10/11/1962
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
3F 7614 47614 11/1928 12B
12C
W
Carlisle Upperby
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/04/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
3F 7615 47615 11/1928 6B
12A
5B
99C
W
Mold Junction
Carlisle Kingmoor
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1962
24/03/1962
14/12/1963
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7616 47616 11/1928 5B
5B
8D
10J
10A
9H
12A
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Widnes
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Patricroft
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
06/10/1956
21/12/1963
18/04/1964
01/08/1964
12/12/1964
09/01/1965
09/01/1965
3F 7618 47618 11/1928 12B
5B
99C
W
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
24/09/1960
10/1963
10/1963
3F 7619 47619 11/1928 22B
18A
18D
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
01/01/1955
17/03/1961
17/03/1961
3F 7620 47620 11/1928 22B
18D
41D
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
26/12/1959
09/1961
09/1961
3F 7621 47621 11/1928 14A
10C
26D
W
Cricklewood East
Patricroft
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
09/04/1960
12/05/1962
12/05/1962
3F 7622 47622 11/1928 16B
2A
6C
6F
6C
5B
5C
W
Spital Bridge
Rugby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
14/08/1954
11/08/1956
09/02/1963
16/11/1963
14/12/1963
11/07/1964
11/07/1964
3F 7623 47623 11/1928 18A
20B
19B
22B
82F
W
Toton
Stourton
Sheffield Millhouses
Gloucester Barnwood
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
23/04/1955
21/05/1955
30/11/1963
13/04/1964
13/04/1964
3F 7624 47624 11/1928 19A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
3F 7625 47625 11/1928 18D
41B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
09/05/1961
09/05/1961
3F 7626 47626 11/1928 18D
41D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/02/1960
05/1961
05/1961
3F 7627 47627 11/1928 18D
6F
6C
6J
6C
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Holyhead
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
01/01/1955
08/09/1956
26/01/1957
09/04/1966
09/04/1966
3F 7628 47628 12/1928 18D
6F
6C
5F
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
09/02/1963
06/04/1963
08/1964
08/1964
3F 7629 47629 12/1928 16A
17A
17C
17A
17C
16C
16F
16G
W
Nottingham
Derby
Rowsley
Derby
Rowsley
Derby
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
13/01/1962
23/02/1963
18/05/1963
02/05/1964
12/09/1964
05/02/1966
07/10/1967
07/10/1967
3F 7630 47630 12/1928 18A
18A
16A
18D
W
Toton
Toton
Nottingham
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
19/06/1954
04/12/1954
02/08/1962
02/08/1962
3F 7631 47631 12/1928 16A
6G
26B
10F
10H
10G
10F
9D
W
Nottingham
Llandudno Junction
Agecroft
Rose Grove
Lower Darwen
Skipton
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1958
15/12/1962
18/01/1964
20/06/1964
11/07/1964
26/09/1964
08/01/1966
06/1966
06/1966
3F 7632 47632 12/1928 16A
20B
56B
56D
50B
W
Nottingham
Stourton
Ardsley
Mirfield
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
30/01/1960
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7633 47633 12/1928 5B
5B
5E
5D
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Alsager
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/06/1952
23/06/1962
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
3F 7634 47634 12/1928 20C
50D
50C
53E
W
Royston
Starbeck
Selby
Goole
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
14/06/1958
19/09/1959
26/09/1961
26/09/1961
3F 7635 47635 12/1928 22B
21C
22B
20D
56F
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Bromsgrove
Gloucester Barnwood
Normanton
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
03/12/1955
10/05/1958
12/1960
12/1960
3F 7636 47636 12/1928 15A
19A
W
Wellingborough
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
09/03/1960
09/03/1960
3F 7637 47637 12/1928 16A
18D
41D
W
Nottingham
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
13/02/1960
05/1961
05/1961
3F 7638 47638 12/1928 21A
16D
17B
17A
18B
W
Saltley
Annesley
Burton
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
04/04/1959
20/02/1960
06/01/1962
06/07/1963
06/07/1963
3F 7639 47639 12/1928 21A
20H
W
Saltley
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7640 47640 12/1928 14B
20B
56B
26A
W
Kentish Town
Stourton
Ardsley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
14/06/1958
24/12/1960
09/1964
09/1964
3F 7641 47641 01/1929 17B
9G
10J
10A
12A
W
Burton
Gorton
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
25/01/1964
18/04/1964
25/07/1964
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
3F 7642 47642 01/1929 15A
14B
14A
14B
W
Wellingborough
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
16/01/1960
08/07/1961
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
3F 7643 47643 01/1929 17B
16G
W
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1966
10/1966
10/1966
3F 7644 47644 01/1929 14B
17A
W
Kentish Town
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1960
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
3F 7645 47645 02/1929 14B
14A
18A
W
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1962
01/09/1962
24/04/1965
24/04/1965
3F 7646 47646 02/1929 6B
99C
W
Mold Junction
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/09/1963
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
3F 7647 47647 02/1929 5D
8C
12F
12A
24B
26F
W
Stoke
Speke Junction
Workington
Carlisle Kingmoor
Rose Grove
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1960
10/11/1962
06/04/1963
22/06/1963
17/08/1963
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
3F 7648 47648 02/1929 5D
5C
6A
99C
6A
12E
5B

5B
W
Stoke
Stafford
Chester (MR)
Crewe Works
Chester (MR)
Barrow in Furness
Crewe South
Wolverton Works
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/09/1960
15/10/1960
20/05/1961
24/06/1961
22/07/1961
25/11/1961
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
18/04/1964
18/04/1964
3F 7649 47649 02/1929 5C
5F
5D
5B
99C
W
Stafford
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/07/1964
05/12/1964
04/12/1965
12/03/1966
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7650 47650 02/1929 6B
W
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7651 47651 02/1929 8A
24J
W
Edge Hill
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/04/1963
07/12/1963
07/12/1963
3F 7652 47652 03/1929 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1960
07/1960
3F 7653 47653 03/1929 5C
2B
2E
5E
W
Stafford
Nuneaton
Northampton
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/07/1961
19/01/1963
24/10/1964
24/10/1964
24/10/1964
3F 7654 47654 03/1929 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1963
23/02/1963
3F 7655 47655 03/1929 4C
27E
27B
W
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
30/11/1957
09/04/1960
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
3F 7656 47656 03/1929 6B
24J
8A
8D
9D
W
Mold Junction
Lancaster Green Ayre
Edge Hill
Widnes
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
07/03/1959
07/09/1963
16/11/1963
25/12/1965
25/12/1965
3F 7657 47657 03/1929 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1963
19/10/1963
3F 7658 47658 03/1929 5D
5F
5D
99C
W
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
30/11/1957
24/02/1962
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7659 47659 03/1929 10B
8B
8F
8D
8F
6C

6C
W
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Widnes
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Wolverton Works
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
21/02/1953
29/11/1958
09/01/1960
11/02/1961
18/03/1961
08/04/1961
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
3F 7660 47660 03/1929 15A
24B
9D
W
Wellingborough
Rose Grove
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
30/09/1961
22/12/1962
07/03/1964
01/01/1966
01/01/1966
3F 7661 47661 03/1929 5E
99C
W
Alsager
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1961
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7662 47662 03/1929 5E
12C
11B
24J
24L
24J
10A
9H
W
Alsager
Carlisle Canal
Workington
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Lancaster Green Ayre
Carnforth
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
06/09/1958
05/11/1960
04/02/1961
22/04/1961
18/04/1964
15/05/1965
29/01/1966
29/01/1966
3F 7664 47664 04/1929 12B
5B
5D
W
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
29/09/1962
23/01/1965
23/01/1965
3F 7665 47665 04/1929 5B

5C
W
Crewe South
Wolverton Works
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1962
17/03/1962
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
3F 7666 47666 04/1929 12B
24F
W
Carlisle Upperby
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/06/1963
09/1965
09/1965
3F 7667 47667 04/1931 1B
12A
12B
12A
10G
W
Camden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
02/06/1962
16/01/1965
17/09/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
3F 7668 47668 05/1931 1B
24L
8G
W
Camden
Carnforth
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1960
18/08/1962
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
3F 7669 47669 05/1931 1B
8F
8B
12A
6K
6G
W
Camden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Warrington Dallam
Carlisle Kingmoor
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
17/09/1960
10/02/1962
05/05/1962
09/02/1963
20/02/1965
20/02/1965
3F 7670 47670 06/1931 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
22/10/1960
3F 7671 47671 06/1931 1B
8F
8G
W
Camden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
3F 7672 47672 06/1931 6C
6F
9E
10C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Trafford Park (LMS)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
19/05/1956
01/12/1956
19/03/1960
19/03/1960
3F 7673 47673 07/1931 9A
6B
6G
6A
W
Longsight
Mold Junction
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/04/1960
22/05/1965
10/09/1966
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
3F 7674 47674 07/1931 6C
6F
6C
6F
6C
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bidston
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
22/11/1958
19/05/1962
09/02/1963
17/12/1966
17/12/1966
3F 7675 47675 08/1931 1A
11B
W
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
04/1966
04/1966
3F 7676 47676 08/1931 1A
11B
12F
W
Willesden
Barrow in Furness
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
15/09/1962
14/08/1965
14/08/1965
3F 7677 47677 08/1931 2A
6C
5B
W
Rugby
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
28/05/1960
06/11/1965
06/11/1965
3F 7678 47678 09/1931 22A
26B
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/07/1961
20/01/1962
20/01/1962
3F 7679 47679 09/1931 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
3F 7680 47680 10/1931 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
3F 7681 47681 10/1931 5B
27E
8L
9J
9D
W
Crewe South
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Agecroft
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
14/12/1963
01/05/1965
19/06/1965
07/08/1965
07/08/1965