Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1027 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5998 Week
» 20575 Month
» 383820 Year
» 460407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Clan" Class 4-6-2


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Clan 72000 29/12/1951 CLAN BUCHANAN 29/12/1951   29/12/1962 29/12/1962
Clan 72001 12/1951 CLAN CAMERON 12/1951   29/12/1962 29/12/1962
Clan 72002 01/1952 CLAN CAMPBELL 01/1952   29/12/1962 29/12/1962
Clan 72003 01/1952 CLAN FRASER 01/1952   29/12/1962 29/12/1962
Clan 72004 02/1952 CLAN MACDONALD 02/1952   29/12/1962 29/12/1962
Clan 72005 02/1952 CLAN MACGREGOR 02/1952   01/05/1965 01/05/1965
Clan 72006 02/1952 CLAN MACKENZIE 02/1952   21/05/1966 21/05/1966
Clan 72007 02/1952 CLAN MacKINTOSH 02/1952   04/12/1965 04/12/1965
Clan 72008 02/1952 CLAN MACLEOD 02/1952   16/04/1966 16/04/1966
Clan 72009 03/1952 CLAN STEWART 03/1952   28/08/1965 28/08/1965