Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5997 Week
» 20574 Month
» 383819 Year
» 460406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Clan" Class 4-6-2


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
72000 29/12/1951 Polmadie 29/12/1962 Polmadie 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 11.72
72001 12/1951 Polmadie 29/12/1962 Polmadie 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 11.76
72002 01/1952 Polmadie 29/12/1962 Polmadie 10.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 11.67
72003 01/1952 Polmadie 29/12/1962 Polmadie 10.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 11.67
72004 02/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 29/12/1962 Polmadie 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 11.59
72005 02/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.25 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 07/1965 13.42
72006 02/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 21/05/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/08/1966 14.50
72007 02/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 04/12/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 24/03/1966 14.11
72008 02/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 16/04/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 23/06/1966 14.36
72009 03/1952 Carlisle Kingmoor 28/08/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 19/11/1965 13.69