Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5997 Week
» 20574 Month
» 383819 Year
» 460406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Clan" Class 4-6-2


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
CLAN 72000 29/12/1951 66A
64B
66A
64A
66A
W
Polmadie
Haymarket
Polmadie
St Margarets
Polmadie
Withdrawn
29/12/1951
26/10/1957
10/05/1958
19/12/1959
09/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
CLAN 72001 12/1951 66A
64B
66A
W
Polmadie
Haymarket
Polmadie
Withdrawn
12/1951
21/11/1959
09/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
CLAN 72002 01/1952 66A
64B
66A
64B
66A
W
Polmadie
Haymarket
Polmadie
Haymarket
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/1952
26/10/1957
10/05/1958
21/11/1959
09/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
CLAN 72003 01/1952 66A
64A
66A
W
Polmadie
St Margarets
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/1952
21/11/1959
09/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
CLAN 72004 02/1952 68A
64A
66A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
St Margarets
Polmadie
Withdrawn
02/1952
21/11/1959
09/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
CLAN 72005 02/1952 68A
64B
12A
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Haymarket
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/1952
26/10/1957
19/04/1958
10/05/1958
01/05/1965
01/05/1965
CLAN 72006 02/1952 68A
64B
12A
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Haymarket
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/1952
26/10/1957
19/04/1958
10/05/1958
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
CLAN 72007 02/1952 68A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/1952
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
CLAN 72008 02/1952 68A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/1952
16/04/1966
16/04/1966
CLAN 72009 03/1952 68A
30A
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Stratford
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
03/1952
13/09/1958
25/10/1958
28/08/1965
28/08/1965