Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1298 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9039 Week
» 29481 Month
» 366327 Year
» 1587892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "BR2/2" Class 2-6-2T


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
BR2/2 84000 04/07/1953 5A
10D
6E
6C
8B
89D
6C
W
Crewe North
Plodder Lane
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Oswestry
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
04/07/1953
08/08/1953
27/03/1954
11/08/1956
17/06/1961
13/04/1963
23/01/1965
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
BR2/2 84001 06/07/1953 5A
10D
6E
6D
6C
8B
6G
W
Crewe North
Plodder Lane
Wrexham Rhosddu
Chester Northgate
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
06/07/1953
08/08/1953
27/03/1954
08/10/1955
09/01/1960
17/06/1961
01/12/1962
31/10/1964
31/10/1964
BR2/2 84002 07/08/1953 10D
6E
6D
1E
W
Plodder Lane
Wrexham Rhosddu
Chester Northgate
Bletchley
Withdrawn
07/08/1953
27/03/1954
08/10/1955
11/08/1956
17/04/1965
17/04/1965
BR2/2 84003 10/08/1953 10D
6E
6C
6K
6G
6C
6G
W
Plodder Lane
Wrexham Rhosddu
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Croes Newydd
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
10/08/1953
27/03/1954
11/08/1956
16/09/1961
09/02/1963
21/03/1964
13/06/1964
02/10/1965
02/10/1965
BR2/2 84004 19/08/1953 10D
6E
1E
89D
6C
W
Plodder Lane
Wrexham Rhosddu
Bletchley
Oswestry
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
19/08/1953
09/10/1954
11/08/1956
20/04/1963
23/01/1965
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
BR2/2 84005 24/08/1953 15D
14D
14E
14D
14B
15A
14E
15A
15A
15B
15A
W
Bedford
Neasden
Bedford
Neasden
Kentish Town
Wellingborough
Bedford
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
24/08/1953
01/07/1961
09/12/1961
17/03/1962
07/07/1962
19/01/1963
02/02/1963
09/02/1963
08/02/1964
30/05/1964
19/09/1964
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
BR2/2 84006 26/08/1953 17B
15A
14D
14E
14D
16D
15B
15A
W
Burton
Wellingborough
Neasden
Bedford
Neasden
Annesley
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
26/08/1953
10/01/1959
09/12/1961
20/01/1962
17/03/1962
14/04/1962
18/07/1964
19/09/1964
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
BR2/2 84007 31/08/1953 17B
15A
16D
15B
W
Burton
Wellingborough
Annesley
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
31/08/1953
14/02/1959
24/03/1962
14/12/1963
18/01/1964
18/01/1964
BR2/2 84008 31/08/1953 17B
15A
14D
14B
15C
15A
15A
15B
15A
W
Burton
Wellingborough
Neasden
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
31/08/1953
14/02/1959
24/06/1961
07/07/1962
29/12/1962
04/05/1963
08/02/1964
30/05/1964
19/09/1964
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
BR2/2 84009 03/09/1953 20C
20F
20C
53A
6G
6C
6G
W
Royston
Skipton
Royston
Hull Dairycoates
Llandudno Junction
Croes Newydd
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
03/09/1953
29/01/1955
16/07/1955
20/06/1959
08/12/1962
21/03/1964
13/06/1964
20/11/1965
20/11/1965
BR2/2 84010 08/09/1953 25F
26F
24B
24F
70D
91M
70D
W
Low Moor
Lees (Oldham)
Rose Grove
Fleetwood
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
08/09/1953
25/09/1954
19/05/1956
12/12/1959
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84011 18/09/1953 25F
27A
24B
24D
24F
W
Low Moor
Bank Hall
Rose Grove
Lower Darwen
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
18/09/1953
29/01/1955
19/05/1956
18/05/1957
25/03/1961
24/04/1965
24/04/1965
BR2/2 84012 17/09/1953 25F
26F
24B
27A
24D
24F
27C
W
Low Moor
Lees (Oldham)
Rose Grove
Bank Hall
Lower Darwen
Fleetwood
Southport
Withdrawn
17/09/1953
09/10/1954
21/05/1955
08/10/1955
18/05/1957
25/03/1961
16/02/1963
12/10/1963
12/10/1963
BR2/2 84013 21/09/1953 25F
27A
26E
26C
9B
15A
9B
70D
91M
70D
W
Low Moor
Bank Hall
Lees (Oldham)
Bolton
Stockport Edgeley
Leicester Midland
Stockport Edgeley
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
21/09/1953
29/01/1955
03/12/1955
02/05/1959
19/12/1964
22/05/1965
10/07/1965
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84014 22/09/1953 25F
27A
27C
26E
26C
9B
70D
91M
70D
W
Low Moor
Bank Hall
Southport
Lees (Oldham)
Bolton
Stockport Edgeley
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
22/09/1953
29/01/1955
23/04/1955
03/12/1955
21/02/1959
19/12/1964
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84015 02/10/1953 25F
26F
24B
24F
24J
24G
70D
91M
70D
W
Low Moor
Lees (Oldham)
Rose Grove
Fleetwood
Lancaster Green Ayre
Skipton
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
02/10/1953
25/09/1954
21/05/1955
08/10/1955
10/08/1957
09/08/1958
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84016 07/10/1953 26D
24F
24J
24F
9B
10C
70D
91M
70D
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Lancaster Green Ayre
Fleetwood
Stockport Edgeley
Fleetwood
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
07/10/1953
19/06/1954
10/08/1957
15/11/1958
19/06/1965
03/07/1965
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84017 13/10/1953 26D
24F
8M
9K
9B
70D
91M
70D
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Southport
Bolton
Stockport Edgeley
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
13/10/1953
19/06/1954
26/10/1963
20/06/1964
19/06/1965
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84018 23/10/1953 26D
24F
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
23/10/1953
19/06/1954
24/04/1965
24/04/1965
BR2/2 84019 31/10/1953 26D
24F
26E
26C
70D
91M
70D
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Lees (Oldham)
Bolton
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
19/06/1954
03/12/1955
19/04/1958
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84020 27/03/1957 74A
73A
72A
6G
W
Ashford
Stewarts Lane
Exmouth Junction
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
27/03/1957
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
31/10/1964
31/10/1964
BR2/2 84021 30/03/1957 74A
73B
72A
6G
99C
W
Ashford
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Llandudno Junction
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
30/03/1957
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
14/07/1962
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
BR2/2 84022 30/03/1957 74A
73B
72A
6G
99C
W
Ashford
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Llandudno Junction
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
30/03/1957
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
14/07/1962
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
BR2/2 84023 05/04/1957 74A
73B
72A
24J
8D
99C
W
Ashford
Bricklayers Arms
Exmouth Junction
Lancaster Green Ayre
Widnes
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
05/04/1957
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
06/01/1962
14/07/1962
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
BR2/2 84024 10/04/1957 74A
73B
75A
8B
8D
99C
W
Ashford
Bricklayers Arms
Brighton
Warrington Dallam
Widnes
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
10/04/1957
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
06/01/1962
14/07/1962
05/09/1964
05/09/1964
BR2/2 84025 16/04/1957 74B
73F
75A
26A
26C
70D
91M
70D
W
Ramsgate
Ashford
Brighton
Newton Heath
Bolton
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
16/04/1957
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
11/11/1961
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84026 18/04/1957 74B
73F
75A
26A
26C
99H
9K
9B
70D
91M
70D
W
Ramsgate
Ashford
Brighton
Newton Heath
Bolton
Horwich Works
Bolton
Stockport Edgeley
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
18/04/1957
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
04/11/1961
25/05/1963
28/12/1963
19/12/1964
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84027 16/05/1957 74B
73F
75A
26A
26C
15A
16D
W
Ramsgate
Ashford
Brighton
Newton Heath
Bolton
Wellingborough
Annesley
Withdrawn
16/05/1957
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
21/10/1961
27/01/1962
24/03/1962
02/05/1964
02/05/1964
BR2/2 84028 15/05/1957 74B
73F
71A
24G
70D
91M
70D
W
Ramsgate
Ashford
Eastleigh
Skipton
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
15/05/1957
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
13/11/1965
06/12/1965
06/12/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR2/2 84029 11/06/1957 74B
73F
71A
14E
14D
14B
15A
15C
W
Ramsgate
Ashford
Eastleigh
Bedford
Neasden
Kentish Town
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
11/06/1957
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
16/09/1961
20/01/1962
07/07/1962
19/01/1963
16/02/1963
13/06/1964
13/06/1964