Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 4" Class 2-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 08/1954 76017 71A   Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day - Open day exhibit RO 9/1954  
Mon 20/07/1959 76104 61A   Passed through Craigellachie with the 9:40am ex Elgin BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sat 18/02/1961 76005,
76019,
76063
72B,
71A,
71A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 76016,
76025,
76029,
76063
71A,
71A,
71A,
71A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 76059 71A   Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962  
Sat 09/12/1961 76051,
76079
24J,
8G
  Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 76020 8G   Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Bolton shed SLS 5/1962  
Sat 07/05/1966 76060 Wdn   Stored at Alexandra Dock Jct. RO 8/1966  
Sun 23/10/1966 76006 70F   Shunting in Salisbury yard Railway Observer No 454  
Sun 23/10/1966 76061,
76067
70D,
70E
  Salisbury depot: On shed
Salisbury depot: On shed
RO 12/1966  
Sat 29/04/1967 76077 8G   A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt  
Sat 27/01/1968 76098 Wdn   Eastfield depot: Stored - Former stationary boiler here. RO 3/1968