BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT" Class 2-6-0
Class | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR4/2 | 76000 | 01/12/1952 | 66B W |
Motherwell Withdrawn |
12/1952 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76001 | 05/12/1952 | 66B 63a 66B 63C 63B 67A 67D 67C W |
Motherwell Blair Atholl Motherwell Oban Fort William Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
12/1952 16/04/1955 14/05/1955 05/1960 02/07/1960 08/09/1962 30/05/1964 27/02/1965 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76002 | 11/12/1952 | 66B W |
Motherwell Withdrawn |
12/1952 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76003 | 19/12/1952 | 66B W |
Motherwell Withdrawn |
12/1952 25/03/1966 |
25/03/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76004 | 24/12/1952 | 66B 66D 66A W |
Motherwell Greenock Ladyburn Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/1952 19/01/1963 26/12/1964 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76005 | 31/12/1952 | 71A 71B 71A 75A 71C 71A 72B 70F W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Brighton Dorchester Eastleigh Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
12/1952 20/07/1953 01/10/1953 01/1954 13/05/1954 11/03/1955 21/06/1955 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76006 | 16/01/1953 | 71A 71B 71A 75A 71C 71A 72B 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Brighton Dorchester Eastleigh Salisbury Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/1953 20/07/1953 01/10/1953 01/1954 13/05/1954 11/03/1955 21/06/1955 10/03/1960 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76007 | 30/01/1953 | 71A 72B 72B 70F W |
Eastleigh Salisbury (on loan) Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/1953 06/06/1958 13/10/1958 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76008 | 02/1953 | 71A 72B 70F W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
02/1953 21/06/1955 17/04/1967 14/05/1967 |
14/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76009 | 26/02/1953 | 71A 75B 71A 72C 72B 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Redhill Eastleigh Yeovil Town Salisbury Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
02/1953 27/08/1956 25/01/1957 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 10/03/1960 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76010 | 09/03/1953 | 71A 72C 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Yeovil Town Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
03/1953 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 10/10/1965 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76011 | 23/03/1953 | 71A 72C 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Yeovil Town Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
03/1953 13/10/1958 11/03/1959 10/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76012 | 31/03/1953 | 71A 70C W |
Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
04/1953 27/06/1966 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76013 | 15/04/1953 | 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
04/1953 12/10/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76014 | 28/04/1953 | 71A 75B 71A 70F W |
Eastleigh Redhill Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/1953 27/08/1956 25/01/1957 12/10/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76015 | 13/05/1953 | 71A 71B W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/1953 06/07/1961 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76016 | 26/05/1953 | 71A 70C W |
Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
05/1953 27/06/1966 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76017 | 13/06/1953 | 71A 72B W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Withdrawn |
06/1953 10/03/1960 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76018 | 26/06/1953 | 71A 72B 70D 70C W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
06/1953 10/03/1960 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76019 | 11/07/1953 | 71A 71B 70D W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1953 23/08/1961 14/09/1964 20/02/1966 |
20/02/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76020 | 18/12/1952 | 51A 51H 2B 8G 21D 5D 5F 5D 6A W |
Darlington Kirkby Stephen Nuneaton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Aston Stoke Uttoxeter Stoke Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
12/1952 21/07/1956 30/05/1959 06/06/1959 21/07/1962 22/12/1962 12/10/1963 05/12/1964 31/07/1965 23/04/1966 |
23/04/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76021 | 12/1952 | 50A 50B 50C 50F 50C 51F 67B W |
York (North) Neville Hill Selby Malton Selby West Auckland Hurlford Withdrawn |
12/1952 14/02/1953 18/04/1953 20/06/1953 23/01/1954 16/06/1956 02/11/1963 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76022 | 12/1952 | 53A 51H 24J 8F 21D 5D 5F 2C 2B W |
Hull Dairycoates Kirkby Stephen Lancaster Green Ayre Springs Branch (Wigan) Aston Stoke Uttoxeter Stourbridge Junction Oxley Withdrawn |
12/1952 16/06/1956 30/04/1960 10/02/1962 14/07/1962 22/12/1962 12/10/1963 15/08/1964 07/11/1964 27/08/1966 |
27/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76023 | 12/1952 | 54A 51C 51H 24J 8G 21D 5D 5F 5B 5D W |
Sunderland West Hartlepool Kirkby Stephen Lancaster Green Ayre Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Aston Stoke Uttoxeter Crewe South Stoke Withdrawn |
12/1952 18/06/1955 21/07/1956 30/04/1960 06/08/1960 21/07/1962 22/12/1962 12/10/1963 20/06/1964 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76024 | 01/1953 | 52A 52C 52E 52d 52c 51F 52A 52B 52G 50A 51L 67B W |
Gateshead Blaydon Percy Main Alnmouth Alston West Auckland Gateshead Heaton Sunderland York (North) Thornaby Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/1953 21/03/1953 18/04/1953 16/05/1953 24/04/1954 16/06/1956 20/06/1959 28/11/1959 09/07/1960 16/09/1961 23/06/1962 02/11/1963 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76025 | 29/09/1953 | 71A 71B W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
10/1953 26/05/1961 31/10/1965 |
31/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76026 | 10/1953 | 71A 71B W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
10/1953 23/08/1961 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76027 | 15/10/1953 | 71A 71B W |
Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
10/1953 05/03/1962 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76028 | 10/1953 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
10/1953 10/05/1964 |
10/05/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76029 | 11/1953 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
11/1953 04/10/1964 |
04/10/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76030 | 17/11/1953 | 30A 31A 31B 75A 70C 70D W |
Stratford Cambridge March Brighton Guildford Eastleigh Withdrawn |
11/1953 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 18/01/1965 25/04/1965 |
25/04/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76031 | 27/11/1953 | 30A 31B 75A 70C 70D 70C W |
Stratford March Brighton Guildford Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
11/1953 26/11/1960 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 18/01/1965 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76032 | 09/12/1953 | 30A 31A 31B 75A 70C W |
Stratford Cambridge March Brighton Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1953 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 02/08/1964 |
02/08/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76033 | 17/12/1953 | 30A 31A 31B 75A 70C 70D 70C W |
Stratford Cambridge March Brighton Guildford Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1953 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 18/01/1965 27/06/1966 01/1967 |
01/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76034 | 12/1953 | 30A 32A 31B 75A 70C W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe March Brighton Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1953 26/11/1960 16/09/1961 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 13/09/1964 |
13/09/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76035 | 28/05/1954 | 34E 34D 38E 14A 1A 6A W |
Neasden Hitchin (GNR) Woodford Halse Cricklewood East Willesden Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
05/1954 19/03/1955 18/06/1955 30/06/1962 12/12/1964 31/07/1965 07/05/1966 |
07/05/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76036 | 08/06/1954 | 34E 14A 2E 2F 2C 6A W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Saltley Bescot Stourbridge Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
06/1954 30/06/1962 08/08/1964 27/03/1965 13/11/1965 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 |
28/01/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76037 | 11/06/1954 | 34E 14A 1A 2B 6A 6C W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Willesden Oxley Chester (MR) Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
06/1954 30/06/1962 12/12/1964 02/10/1965 04/02/1967 08/04/1967 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76038 | 01/07/1954 | 34E 14A 2E 6F W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Saltley Machynlleth Withdrawn |
07/1954 30/06/1962 08/08/1964 18/06/1966 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76039 | 09/07/1954 | 34E 14A 1A 2B 6A 6C W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Willesden Oxley Chester (MR) Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
07/1954 30/06/1962 12/12/1964 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 08/04/1967 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76040 | 23/07/1954 | 34E 14A 2E 2J 2E 6C W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Saltley Aston Saltley Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
07/1954 30/06/1962 01/08/1964 30/01/1965 16/10/1965 10/09/1966 08/04/1967 |
08/04/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76041 | 30/07/1954 | 34E 14A 1A 2B 6A W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Willesden Oxley Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
07/1954 30/06/1962 12/12/1964 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 01/04/1967 |
01/04/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76042 | 06/08/1954 | 34E 14A 2E 2F 2C 2B W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Saltley Bescot Stourbridge Junction Oxley Withdrawn |
08/1954 14/07/1962 01/08/1964 27/03/1965 13/11/1965 07/05/1966 25/06/1966 |
25/06/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76043 | 10/08/1954 | 34E 14A 2E 6F W |
Neasden Cricklewood East Saltley Machynlleth Withdrawn |
08/1954 07/07/1962 01/08/1964 18/06/1966 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76044 | 08/1954 | 34E 2F 5D 6A W |
Neasden Woodford Halse Stoke Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
08/1954 30/06/1962 20/06/1964 12/03/1966 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76045 | 09/03/1955 | 52A 52C 52A 51F 65F 66E W |
Gateshead Blaydon Gateshead West Auckland Grangemouth Carstairs Withdrawn |
03/1955 22/10/1955 21/01/1956 16/06/1956 02/11/1963 30/10/1965 10/01/1966 |
10/01/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76046 | 03/1955 | 52A 52C 51F 65D 65F 67A W |
Gateshead Blaydon West Auckland Dawsholm Grangemouth Corkerhill Withdrawn |
03/1955 23/07/1955 16/06/1956 02/11/1963 31/10/1964 30/10/1965 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76047 | 18/03/1955 | 52A 52C 51H 9E 14A 5D 2E 2F 6A W |
Gateshead Blaydon Kirkby Stephen Trafford Park (LMS) Cricklewood East Stoke Saltley Bescot Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
03/1955 22/10/1955 16/06/1956 25/06/1960 22/09/1962 28/09/1963 12/10/1963 27/03/1965 19/03/1966 03/12/1966 |
03/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76048 | 25/03/1955 | 52A 52C 51H 24J 24G 9F 14A 2E 6C W |
Gateshead Blaydon Kirkby Stephen Lancaster Green Ayre Skipton Heaton Mersey Cricklewood East Saltley Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
03/1955 22/10/1955 16/06/1956 11/10/1958 25/10/1958 30/05/1959 22/09/1962 25/07/1964 10/09/1966 04/02/1967 |
04/02/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76049 | 01/04/1955 | 52A 52C 52A 51F 64G 64A W 64F |
Gateshead Blaydon Gateshead West Auckland Hawick St Margarets Withdrawn Bathgate |
01/04/1955 18/06/1955 21/01/1956 16/06/1956 02/11/1963 30/10/1965 24/01/1966 29/01/1966 |
24/01/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76050 | 08/1956 | 51A 51F 64G W |
Darlington West Auckland Hawick Withdrawn |
08/1956 20/10/1956 02/11/1963 10/09/1965 |
10/09/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76051 | 31/08/1956 | 50A 51H 24J 8F 21D 5D 16B 8G W |
York (North) Kirkby Stephen Lancaster Green Ayre Springs Branch (Wigan) Aston Stoke Colwick Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
08/1956 20/10/1956 30/04/1960 10/02/1962 14/07/1962 22/12/1962 05/02/1966 12/11/1966 29/04/1967 |
29/04/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76052 | 06/09/1956 | 50A 51H 14D 2F 2E 2B 2E 6A W |
York (North) Kirkby Stephen Neasden Woodford Halse Saltley Oxley Saltley Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
08/1956 20/10/1956 14/05/1960 07/07/1962 12/10/1963 29/05/1965 17/07/1965 07/08/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76053 | 23/04/1955 | 75B 72B 70C 70B 70D 70C W |
Redhill Salisbury Guildford Feltham Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
21/04/1955 06/05/1960 22/06/1964 18/01/1965 05/07/1965 27/06/1966 29/01/1967 |
29/01/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76054 | 30/04/1955 | 75B 72B 70C W |
Redhill Salisbury Guildford Withdrawn |
26/04/1955 06/05/1960 22/06/1964 18/10/1964 |
18/10/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76055 | 30/04/1955 | 75B 72B 70C 70B 70E W |
Redhill Salisbury Guildford Feltham Salisbury Withdrawn |
29/04/1955 06/05/1960 22/06/1964 18/01/1965 05/07/1965 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76056 | 14/05/1955 | 75B 71A 71B W |
Redhill Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/1955 26/11/1959 31/12/1959 07/11/1965 |
07/11/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76057 | 21/05/1955 | 75B 71A 71B W |
Redhill Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/1955 26/11/1959 31/12/1959 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76058 | 06/1955 | 75B 71A 71B 71A 70C W |
Redhill Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
06/1955 26/11/1959 31/12/1959 05/03/1962 27/06/1966 26/03/1967 |
26/03/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76059 | 06/1955 | 75B 72B 71A 70C W |
Redhill Salisbury Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
06/1955 14/06/1959 10/03/1960 27/06/1966 25/09/1966 |
25/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76060 | 07/1955 | 75B 72B 71A W |
Redhill Salisbury Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 10/03/1960 05/12/1965 |
05/12/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76061 | 07/1955 | 75B 71A W |
Redhill Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 08/01/1967 |
08/01/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76062 | 07/1955 | 75B 71A 71A W |
Redhill Eastleigh Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 05/04/1960 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76063 | 07/1956 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1956 09/04/1967 |
09/04/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76064 | 07/1956 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1956 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76065 | 07/1956 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1956 10/10/1965 |
10/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76066 | 07/1956 | 71A 72B 70C 70B 70D W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Guildford Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1956 10/03/1960 14/09/1964 18/01/1965 05/07/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76067 | 08/1956 | 71A 72B 70F W |
Eastleigh Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
08/1956 10/03/1960 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76068 | 08/1956 | 71A W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/1956 10/10/1965 |
10/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76069 | 15/08/1956 | 71A 70C W |
Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
08/1956 17/10/1966 18/06/1967 |
18/06/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76070 | 27/09/1956 | 66B 66D 66F 66A W |
Motherwell Greenock Ladyburn Beattock Polmadie Withdrawn |
09/1956 19/01/1963 30/05/1964 26/12/1964 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76071 | 05/10/1956 | 66B 66D 66A W |
Motherwell Greenock Ladyburn Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/1956 19/01/1963 26/12/1964 17/01/1966 |
17/01/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76072 | 12/10/1956 | 68B W |
Dumfries Withdrawn |
10/1956 12/10/1964 |
12/10/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76073 | 20/10/1956 | 68B 67C W |
Dumfries Ayr Withdrawn |
10/1956 30/04/1966 26/06/1966 |
26/06/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76074 | 02/11/1956 | 65A 65C 65F 65D 67E 67C W |
Eastfield Parkhead Grangemouth Dawsholm Dumfries Ayr Withdrawn |
11/1956 26/08/1961 21/10/1961 30/11/1963 31/10/1964 26/03/1966 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76075 | 14/12/1956 | 10D 5D 16B 8G 8F W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Stoke Colwick Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
12/1956 19/01/1963 05/02/1966 12/11/1966 24/06/1967 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76076 | 19/12/1956 | 10D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
12/1956 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76077 | 27/12/1956 | 10D 8F W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
12/1956 24/06/1967 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76078 | 29/12/1956 | 10D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
12/1956 03/12/1966 |
03/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76079 | 30/01/1957 | 10D 8F W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/1957 24/06/1967 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76080 | 08/02/1957 | 24D 8G 8F W |
Lower Darwen Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/1957 13/03/1965 24/06/1967 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76081 | 21/02/1957 | 24D 8G 8F W |
Lower Darwen Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/1957 13/03/1965 24/06/1967 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76082 | 03/1957 | 24D 8G W |
Lower Darwen Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
03/1957 13/03/1965 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76083 | 20/03/1957 | 24D 8G W |
Lower Darwen Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
03/1957 13/03/1965 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76084 | 28/03/1957 | 24D 24J 24G 24J 24D 8G 8F W |
Lower Darwen Lancaster Green Ayre Skipton Lancaster Green Ayre Lower Darwen Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
04/1957 04/10/1958 25/10/1958 21/02/1959 28/03/1959 13/03/1965 24/06/1967 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76085 | 10/04/1957 | 15C 21A 9F 14A 5D 2E 5D 16B W |
Leicester Midland Saltley Heaton Mersey Cricklewood East Stoke Saltley Stoke Colwick Withdrawn |
04/1957 10/08/1957 10/01/1959 22/09/1962 28/09/1963 12/10/1963 23/01/1965 12/03/1966 06/1966 |
06/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76086 | 23/04/1957 | 15C 9E 5D 2E 2F 2E 6F 6C W |
Leicester Midland Trafford Park (LMS) Stoke Saltley Bescot Saltley Machynlleth Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
05/1957 10/01/1959 21/09/1963 12/10/1963 27/03/1965 26/03/1966 18/06/1966 17/09/1966 24/09/1966 |
24/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76087 | 07/05/1957 | 17F 21A 9F 2F 2E 2F 2C 2B W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Saltley Heaton Mersey Woodford Halse Saltley Bescot Stourbridge Junction Oxley Withdrawn |
05/1957 10/08/1957 10/01/1959 22/09/1962 12/10/1963 27/03/1965 26/03/1966 07/05/1966 07/01/1967 |
07/01/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76088 | 16/05/1957 | 17F 14D 9E 14A 5D 2E 2F 2B 6A W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Neasden Trafford Park (LMS) Cricklewood East Stoke Saltley Bescot Oxley Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
05/1957 10/09/1960 10/12/1960 22/09/1962 21/09/1963 12/10/1963 27/03/1965 26/03/1966 25/02/1967 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76089 | 25/05/1957 | 17F 14A 1A 5D 16B W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Cricklewood East Willesden Stoke Colwick Withdrawn |
06/1957 22/09/1962 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 05/02/1966 24/09/1966 |
24/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76090 | 06/06/1957 | 67A 65C 68D W |
Corkerhill Parkhead Beattock Withdrawn |
06/1957 14/01/1961 08/09/1962 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76091 | 19/06/1957 | 67A 65C 67A 67B W |
Corkerhill Parkhead Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
06/1957 14/01/1961 21/10/1961 30/05/1964 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76092 | 28/06/1957 | 67A 67B W |
Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
06/1957 30/05/1964 09/08/1966 |
09/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76093 | 11/07/1957 | 67A 65C 67A W |
Corkerhill Parkhead Corkerhill Withdrawn |
07/1957 14/01/1961 21/10/1961 22/02/1967 |
22/02/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76094 | 08/08/1957 | 67A 65C 67A 67B 66F W |
Corkerhill Parkhead Corkerhill Hurlford Beattock Withdrawn |
08/1957 14/01/1961 21/10/1961 27/06/1964 26/11/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76095 | 08/1957 | 67A 65C 67A 2J 6A W |
Corkerhill Parkhead Corkerhill Aston Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
08/1957 11/03/1961 30/12/1961 16/01/1965 07/08/1965 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76096 | 04/09/1957 | 67A 67C W |
Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
09/1957 16/06/1962 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76097 | 25/09/1957 | 67A 67C W |
Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
09/1957 16/06/1962 13/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
BR4/2 | 76098 | 17/10/1957 | 67A 67D 67C 66F W |
Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Beattock Withdrawn |
10/1957 30/05/1964 27/02/1965 25/12/1965 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76099 | 27/11/1957 | 67A 67C 67A 67D 5D 16B W |
Corkerhill Ayr Corkerhill Ardrossan Stoke Colwick Withdrawn |
11/1957 16/06/1962 19/01/1963 30/05/1964 23/01/1965 12/03/1966 06/08/1966 |
06/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76100 | 30/05/1957 | 65D 65C 65D 65F 67C 66F 67C W |
Dawsholm Parkhead Dawsholm Grangemouth Ayr Beattock Ayr Withdrawn |
05/1957 10/07/1960 24/02/1961 12/10/1964 18/10/1965 13/12/1965 30/04/1966 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76101 | 06/06/1957 | 65D 65F 67C 67F 67C W |
Dawsholm Grangemouth Ayr Stranraer Ayr Withdrawn |
06/1957 31/10/1964 30/10/1965 04/12/1965 26/03/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76102 | 14/06/1957 | 65C 65B 65C 65D 65F 67E 67B W |
Parkhead St Rollox (Balornock) Parkhead Dawsholm Grangemouth Dumfries Hurlford Withdrawn |
06/1957 11/04/1959 30/07/1960 17/12/1960 31/10/1964 30/10/1965 25/06/1966 12/1966 |
12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76103 | 21/06/1957 | 65C 65B 65C 65B 65F 65D 65F 67E 66A 66F 67C W |
Parkhead St Rollox (Balornock) Parkhead St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Dawsholm Grangemouth Dumfries Polmadie Beattock Ayr Withdrawn |
06/1957 11/04/1959 30/07/1960 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 02/11/1963 31/10/1964 30/10/1965 04/12/1965 30/04/1966 25/06/1966 17/07/1966 |
17/07/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76104 | 06/07/1957 | 61A 61B 64F 66A W |
Kittybrewster Aberdeen Ferryhill Bathgate Polmadie Withdrawn |
07/1957 01/07/1961 28/11/1964 29/01/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR4/2 | 76105 | 13/07/1957 | 61A 61B 64C 64F W 66A |
Kittybrewster Aberdeen Ferryhill Dalry Road Bathgate Withdrawn Polmadie |
07/1957 01/07/1961 30/12/1961 28/03/1964 24/01/1966 29/01/1966 |
24/01/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76106 | 07/1957 | 61A 61C 61B 64C 64F 1A W |
Kittybrewster Keith Aberdeen Ferryhill Dalry Road Bathgate Willesden Withdrawn |
07/1957 04/06/1960 01/07/1961 30/12/1961 28/03/1964 04/09/1965 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76107 | 01/08/1957 | 61A 61C 61B 64F W |
Kittybrewster Keith Aberdeen Ferryhill Bathgate Withdrawn |
08/1957 04/06/1960 01/07/1961 28/11/1964 22/10/1965 |
22/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76108 | 10/08/1957 | 61A 61B 67B W |
Kittybrewster Aberdeen Ferryhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
08/1957 01/07/1961 19/01/1963 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76109 | 20/08/1957 | 62A 62C W |
Thornton Junction Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
08/1957 16/01/1960 23/09/1966 |
23/09/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76110 | 20/08/1957 | 62A 62C W |
Thornton Junction Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
08/1957 07/05/1960 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76111 | 20/08/1957 | 62A 62C 62A 64F W |
Thornton Junction Dunfermline Upper Thornton Junction Bathgate Withdrawn |
08/1957 07/05/1960 24/03/1962 28/11/1964 03/01/1966 |
03/01/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76112 | 19/09/1957 | 68B 68C W |
Dumfries Stranraer Withdrawn |
09/1957 21/12/1957 29/10/1965 |
29/10/1965 |
BR4/2 | 76113 | 02/10/1957 | 65B 65C 65B 65F 66E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Parkhead St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Carstairs Withdrawn |
10/1957 11/02/1961 18/11/1961 19/05/1962 30/10/1965 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR4/2 | 76114 | 17/10/1957 | 65B 65C 65B 67A 66F W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Parkhead St Rollox (Balornock) Corkerhill Beattock Withdrawn |
10/1957 30/07/1960 21/10/1961 19/05/1962 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |