BR Standard Riddles "Std 2MT" Class 2-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 11/11/1961 | 78026 | 41D | Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 78008 | 85A | Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 78035, 78035, 78042 |
8D, W26W, 27A |
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 25/03/1962 | 78015 | 51J | Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 08/04/1962 | 78013 | 16B | Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 78009 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: Dump | RO 1/1965 |