BR Standard Riddles "Std 2MT" Class 2-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/12/1952 | To Service | 78000 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
23/12/1952 | To Service | 78001 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
24/12/1952 | To Service | 78002 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 78000 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 78001 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 78002 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
31/12/1952 | To Service | 78003 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
21/01/1953 | To Service | 78004 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
24/02/1953 | To Service | 78005 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
03/1953 | To Service | 78008 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
06/03/1953 | To Service | 78006 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
13/03/1953 | To Service | 78007 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
04/1953 | To Service | 78009 | NEW | 89A | Oswestry | ||
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 78000 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 78001 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 78003 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 78002 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 78004 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 78005 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 78008 | 89A | Oswestry | 85A | Worcester | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 78009 | 89A | Oswestry | 85A | Worcester | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 78006 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 78007 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
12/1953 | To Service | 78010 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
12/1953 | To Service | 78011 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
01/1954 | To Service | 78012 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
01/1954 | To Service | 78013 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 78004 | 89C | Machynlleth | 82C | Swindon | |
02/1954 | To Service | 78014 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
02/1954 | To Service | 78015 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
03/1954 | To Service | 78016 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
03/1954 | To Service | 78017 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
03/1954 | To Service | 78018 | NEW | 51F | West Auckland | ||
03/1954 | To Service | 78019 | NEW | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
04/1954 | To Service | 78020 | NEW | 15B | Kettering | ||
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 78016 | 51F | West Auckland | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 78017 | 51F | West Auckland | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 78018 | 51F | West Auckland | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
05/1954 | To Service | 78021 | NEW | 15B | Kettering | ||
05/1954 | To Service | 78022 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
05/1954 | To Service | 78023 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
05/1954 | To Service | 78024 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 78001 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85A | Worcester | |
06/1954 | To Service | 78025 | NEW | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
06/1954 | To Service | 78026 | NEW | 19C | Canklow | ||
06/1954 | To Service | 78027 | NEW | 19C | Canklow | ||
07/1954 | To Service | 78028 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
07/1954 | To Service | 78029 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
09/1954 | To Service | 78030 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
09/1954 | To Service | 78031 | NEW | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
09/1954 | To Service | 78032 | NEW | 6K | Rhyl | ||
09/1954 | To Service | 78033 | NEW | 6K | Rhyl | ||
10/1954 | To Service | 78034 | NEW | 6K | Rhyl | ||
06/11/1954 | To Service | 78035 | NEW | 6K | Rhyl | ||
13/11/1954 | To Service | 78036 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
13/11/1954 | To Service | 78037 | NEW | 10B | Preston | ||
20/11/1954 | To Service | 78038 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
27/11/1954 | To Service | 78039 | NEW | 6K | Rhyl | ||
12/1954 | To Service | 78044 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 78025 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
11/12/1954 | To Service | 78040 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
18/12/1954 | To Service | 78041 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
25/12/1954 | To Service | 78042 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
25/12/1954 | To Service | 78043 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 78033 | 6K | Rhyl | 5A | Crewe North | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78010 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78011 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78012 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78013 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78014 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 78033 | 5A | Crewe North | 6K | Rhyl | |
12/10/1955 | To Service | 78045 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
20/10/1955 | To Service | 78046 | NEW | 64G | Hawick | ||
25/10/1955 | To Service | 78047 | NEW | 64G | Hawick | ||
28/10/1955 | To Service | 78048 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | ||
11/1955 | To Service | 78049 | NEW | 64A | St Margarets | ||
11/1955 | To Service | 78050 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
11/1955 | To Service | 78051 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
11/1955 | To Service | 78052 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
11/1955 | To Service | 78053 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
12/1955 | To Service | 78054 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 78030 | 10B | Preston | 5A | Crewe North | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 78032 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 78033 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 78034 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 78035 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 78039 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
08/1956 | To Service | 78055 | NEW | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
08/1956 | To Service | 78056 | NEW | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
09/1956 | To Service | 78057 | NEW | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
09/1956 | To Service | 78058 | NEW | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
09/1956 | To Service | 78059 | NEW | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 78031 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 78038 | 3A | Bescot | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
13/10/1956 | To Service | 78060 | NEW | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
13/10/1956 | To Service | 78061 | NEW | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
20/10/1956 | To Service | 78062 | NEW | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 78053 | 66B | Motherwell | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 78054 | 66B | Motherwell | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
11/1956 | To Service | 78063 | NEW | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
11/1956 | To Service | 78064 | NEW | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 78043 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27B | Aintree | |
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 78015 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
22/12/1956 | Reallocation | 78052 | 66B | Motherwell | 60A | Inverness | |
22/12/1956 | Reallocation | 78053 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 61C | Keith | |
22/12/1956 | Reallocation | 78054 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 61C | Keith | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 78057 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6K | Rhyl | |
02/1957 | Reallocation | 78052 | 60A | Inverness | 60C | Helmsdale | Acted as a replacement for LMS 55053 (which was life-expired), pending the arrival of permanent replacements which came in the bizarre form of a pair of GWR pannier tanks (1646 and 1649) |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 78040 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
23/03/1957 | Reallocation | 78043 | 27B | Aintree | 27A | Bank Hall | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 78004 | 82C | Swindon | 85C | Hereford | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 78055 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 3A | Bescot | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 78057 | 6K | Rhyl | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 78055 | 3A | Bescot | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 78057 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6H | Bangor | |
31/01/1958 | Reallocation | 78013 | 51J | Northallerton | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | |
08/02/1958 | Reallocation | 78016 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 51J | Northallerton | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 78003 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85A | Worcester | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 78038 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6K | Rhyl | |
12/04/1958 | Reallocation | 78016 | 51J | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 78035 | 8D | Widnes | 24K | Preston | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 78003 | 85A | Worcester | 89C | Machynlleth | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 78035 | 24K | Preston | 8D | Widnes | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 78052 | 60C | Helmsdale | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 78052 | 64A | St Margarets | 60B | Aviemore | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 78028 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 15B | Kettering | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 78056 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6K | Rhyl | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 78059 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 78031 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6K | Rhyl | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 78055 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 78058 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
04/07/1959 | Reallocation | 78049 | 64A | St Margarets | 64G | Hawick | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78020 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78021 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78028 | 15B | Kettering | 16A | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78029 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 16A | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78055 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6K | Rhyl | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78058 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6H | Bangor | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78059 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6H | Bangor | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78038 | 6K | Rhyl | 8E | Northwich | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 78057 | 6H | Bangor | 8E | Northwich | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 78032 | 8D | Widnes | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 78017 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 78018 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 78019 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 78032 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
13/06/1960 | Reallocation | 78032 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
13/06/1960 | Reallocation | 78033 | 8D | Widnes | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 78013 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | |
02/07/1960 | Reallocation | 78045 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 61C | Keith | |
30/07/1960 | Reallocation | 78048 | 64A | St Margarets | 64G | Hawick | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 78055 | 6K | Rhyl | 8E | Northwich | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 78040 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 27B | Aintree | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 78017 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6K | Rhyl | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 78019 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8E | Northwich | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 78045 | 61C | Keith | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 78053 | 61C | Keith | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 78054 | 61C | Keith | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 78034 | 8D | Widnes | 2B | Nuneaton | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 78034 | 2B | Nuneaton | 6H | Bangor | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 78036 | 10B | Preston | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 78037 | 10B | Preston | 24C | Lostock Hall | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 78017 | 6K | Rhyl | 8D | Widnes | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 78022 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 36A | Doncaster | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 78023 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 36A | Doncaster | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 78024 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 36A | Doncaster | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 78025 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 36A | Doncaster | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 78026 | 19C | Canklow | 67C | Ayr | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 78017 | 8D | Widnes | 6K | Rhyl | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 78008 | 85A | Worcester | 84A | Stafford Road | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 78031 | 6K | Rhyl | 5B | Crewe South | |
28/04/1962 | Reallocation | 78017 | 6K | Rhyl | 5D | Stoke | |
28/04/1962 | Reallocation | 78056 | 6K | Rhyl | 5D | Stoke | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 78018 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 12F | Workington | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78022 | 36A | Doncaster | 30A | Stratford | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78023 | 36A | Doncaster | 30A | Stratford | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78024 | 36A | Doncaster | 30A | Stratford | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78025 | 36A | Doncaster | 30A | Stratford | |
04/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78027 | 19C | Canklow | 30A | Stratford | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 78052 | 60B | Aviemore | 63A | Perth South | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78022 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78023 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78024 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78025 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78027 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78036 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24G | Skipton | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78037 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 24G | Skipton | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78043 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27B | Aintree | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78044 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27B | Aintree | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 78060 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 27B | Aintree | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 78006 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 78018 | 12F | Workington | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 78005 | 89C | Machynlleth | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 78008 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84B | Oxley | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 78055 | 8E | Northwich | 5B | Crewe South | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78022 | 31B | March | 12E | Barrow in Furness | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78023 | 31B | March | 12E | Barrow in Furness | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78024 | 31B | March | 51A | Darlington | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78025 | 31B | March | 51A | Darlington | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78027 | 31B | March | 12E | Barrow in Furness | |
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 78025 | 51A | Darlington | 51F | West Auckland | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 78026 | 67C | Ayr | 67E | Dumfries | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 78053 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 65J | Stirling | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78011 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78012 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78014 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78015 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78010 | 51J | Northallerton | 66A | Polmadie | |
23/03/1963 | Reallocation | 78013 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | 16A | Nottingham | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 78009 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78022 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 27B | Aintree | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78027 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 27A | Bank Hall | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78057 | 8E | Northwich | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78023 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 27B | Aintree | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78000 | 89C | Machynlleth | 16A | Nottingham | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78003 | 89C | Machynlleth | 6H | Bangor | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78018 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78019 | 8E | Northwich | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78029 | 16A | Nottingham | 89D | Oswestry | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78033 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78034 | 6H | Bangor | 1C | Watford | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78035 | 8D | Widnes | 1C | Watford | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78036 | 24G | Skipton | 5B | Crewe South | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78038 | 8E | Northwich | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78039 | 8D | Widnes | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78043 | 27B | Aintree | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78055 | 5B | Crewe South | 24G | Skipton | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78060 | 27B | Aintree | 1A | Willesden | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 78063 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 1A | Willesden | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 78029 | 89D | Oswestry | 1C | Watford | |
08/06/1963 | Reallocation | 78010 | 66A | Polmadie | 66B | Motherwell | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 78007 | 89C | Machynlleth | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 78027 | 27A | Bank Hall | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
13/07/1963 | Reallocation | 78010 | 66B | Motherwell | 51A | Darlington | |
17/08/1963 | Reallocation | 78002 | 89C | Machynlleth | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
17/08/1963 | Reallocation | 78016 | 51F | West Auckland | 66B | Motherwell | |
07/09/1963 | Reallocation | 78032 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6H | Bangor | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 78002 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8K | Bank Hall | |
19/10/1963 | Reallocation | 78024 | 51A | Darlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
19/10/1963 | Reallocation | 78025 | 51F | West Auckland | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78016 | 66B | Motherwell | 67E | Dumfries | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78050 | 66B | Motherwell | 65D | Dawsholm | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78051 | 66B | Motherwell | 65D | Dawsholm | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78010 | 51A | Darlington | 55C | Farnley Junction | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78011 | 51A | Darlington | 55C | Farnley Junction | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78012 | 51A | Darlington | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78014 | 51A | Darlington | 55C | Farnley Junction | |
25/11/1963 | Condemned | 78015 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 78052 | 63A | Perth South | 64F | Bathgate | |
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 78013 | 16A | Nottingham | 15E | Coalville | |
14/12/1963 | Reallocation | 78020 | 16A | Nottingham | 8P | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 78022 | 27B | Aintree | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 78044 | 27B | Aintree | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
04/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78028 | 16A | Nottingham | 15E | Coalville | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78000 | 16A | Nottingham | 16C | Derby | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78001 | 85A | Worcester | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78004 | 85C | Hereford | 87F | Llanelli | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78021 | 16A | Nottingham | 16C | Derby | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 78046 | 64G | Hawick | 64F | Bathgate | |
07/02/1964 | Condemned | 78009 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | COND | ||
08/02/1964 | Reallocation | 78064 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 16C | Derby | |
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 78016 | 67E | Dumfries | 67F | Stranraer | |
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 78026 | 67E | Dumfries | 67F | Stranraer | |
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 78037 | 24G | Skipton | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 78055 | 24G | Skipton | 8L | Aintree | |
11/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78040 | 27B | Aintree | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
11/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78044 | 10D | Lostock Hall | 8L | Aintree | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78011 | 55C | Farnley Junction | 55F | Manningham | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78014 | 55C | Farnley Junction | 55F | Manningham | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78020 | 8P | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78027 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78057 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78061 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78062 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78010 | 55C | Farnley Junction | 5B | Crewe South | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 78059 | 6H | Bangor | 6J | Holyhead | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78001 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78005 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78006 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78020 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16C | Derby | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78023 | 27B | Aintree | 16D | Nottingham | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78027 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16C | Derby | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78037 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16C | Derby | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78042 | 27A | Bank Hall | 16D | Nottingham | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78044 | 8L | Aintree | 16D | Nottingham | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78055 | 8L | Aintree | 16D | Nottingham | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78057 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16C | Derby | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78061 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16C | Derby | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 78062 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16D | Nottingham | |
20/06/1964 | Reallocation | 78002 | 8K | Bank Hall | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
20/06/1964 | Reallocation | 78041 | 27A | Bank Hall | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 78007 | 5A | Crewe North | 5B | Crewe South | |
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 78048 | 64G | Hawick | COND | ||
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 78004 | 87F | Llanelli | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 78045 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64F | Bathgate | |
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 78054 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64F | Bathgate | |
30/07/1964 | Condemned | 78053 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 78050 | 65D | Dawsholm | 64F | Bathgate | |
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 78051 | 65D | Dawsholm | 67E | Dumfries | |
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 78013 | 15E | Coalville | 15A | Leicester Midland | |
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 78028 | 15E | Coalville | 15A | Leicester Midland | |
28/09/1964 | Condemned | 78005 | 98W | COND | |||
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 78027 | 16C | Derby | 15A | Leicester Midland | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 78061 | 16C | Derby | 15A | Leicester Midland | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 78030 | 5A | Crewe North | 5B | Crewe South | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 78059 | 6J | Holyhead | 6H | Bangor | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78026 | 67F | Stranraer | 67A | Corkerhill | |
29/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78011 | 55F | Manningham | 9G | Gorton | |
29/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78012 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 9G | Gorton | |
29/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78014 | 55F | Manningham | 9G | Gorton | |
29/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78024 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 9G | Gorton | |
29/11/1964 | Reallocation | 78025 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 9G | Gorton | |
06/02/1965 | Reallocation | 78021 | 16C | Derby | 15A | Leicester Midland | |
13/02/1965 | Condemned | 78025 | 9G | Gorton | COND | ||
20/02/1965 | Condemned | 78024 | 9G | Gorton | COND | ||
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 78007 | 5B | Crewe South | 9G | Gorton | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 78023 | 16D | Nottingham | 9G | Gorton | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 78037 | 16C | Derby | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 78057 | 16C | Derby | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78029 | 1C | Watford | 1A | Willesden | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78034 | 1C | Watford | 1A | Willesden | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78035 | 1C | Watford | 1A | Willesden | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78042 | 16D | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78044 | 16D | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78055 | 16D | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78062 | 16D | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
24/04/1965 | Reallocation | 78062 | 16A | Toton | 9G | Gorton | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78007 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78011 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78012 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78014 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78023 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78062 | 9G | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78003 | 6H | Bangor | 1A | Willesden | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78032 | 6H | Bangor | 1A | Willesden | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78058 | 6H | Bangor | 1A | Willesden | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 78059 | 6H | Bangor | 1A | Willesden | |
26/06/1965 | Condemned | 78000 | 16C | Derby | COND | ||
18/09/1965 | Condemned | 78011 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
18/09/1965 | Condemned | 78014 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
18/09/1965 | Condemned | 78027 | 15A | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
18/09/1965 | Condemned | 78042 | 16A | Toton | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78003 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78018 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78019 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 78029 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 78032 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 78033 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78034 | 1A | Willesden | 5B | Crewe South | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78035 | 1A | Willesden | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78038 | 1A | Willesden | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78039 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 78043 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78058 | 1A | Willesden | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78059 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78060 | 1A | Willesden | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78063 | 1A | Willesden | 5E | Nuneaton | |
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 78030 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 78047 | 64G | Hawick | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/11/1965 | Condemned | 78004 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | COND | ||
12/1965 | Condemned | 78035 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
16/12/1965 | Condemned | 78054 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 78001 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 78006 | 98W | COND | |||
03/01/1966 | Condemned | 78045 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
03/01/1966 | Condemned | 78050 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
03/01/1966 | Condemned | 78052 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
08/01/1966 | Condemned | 78034 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 78003 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 78019 | 5E | Nuneaton | 5B | Crewe South | |
22/01/1966 | Condemned | 78040 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 78047 | 64A | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 78049 | 64G | Hawick | 64A | St Margarets | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 78018 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 78039 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 78063 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
21/05/1966 | Condemned | 78057 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 78059 | 5E | Nuneaton | 5D | Stoke | |
11/06/1966 | Condemned | 78002 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
25/06/1966 | Reallocation | 78051 | 67E | Dumfries | 67C | Ayr | |
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 78013 | 15A | Leicester Midland | 16A | Toton | |
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 78021 | 15A | Leicester Midland | 16A | Toton | |
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 78028 | 15A | Leicester Midland | 16A | Toton | |
16/07/1966 | Condemned | 78056 | 5D | Stoke | COND | ||
16/07/1966 | Reallocation | 78061 | 15A | Leicester Midland | 16A | Toton | |
13/08/1966 | Reallocation | 78007 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9K | Bolton | |
13/08/1966 | Reallocation | 78012 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9K | Bolton | |
13/08/1966 | Reallocation | 78023 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9K | Bolton | |
17/08/1966 | Condemned | 78016 | 67F | Stranraer | COND | ||
20/08/1966 | Condemned | 78038 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
22/08/1966 | Condemned | 78049 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
24/08/1966 | Condemned | 78026 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
02/09/1966 | Condemned | 78047 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
10/09/1966 | Condemned | 78010 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
17/09/1966 | Condemned | 78022 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
24/09/1966 | Reallocation | 78046 | 64F | Bathgate | 64A | St Margarets | |
24/09/1966 | Reallocation | 78047 | 98W | 64A | St Margarets | ||
01/10/1966 | Condemned | 78039 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 78017 | 5D | Stoke | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 78020 | 16C | Derby | 16A | Toton | |
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 78031 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 78059 | 5D | Stoke | 5B | Crewe South | |
08/10/1966 | Condemned | 78060 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 78064 | 16C | Derby | 16A | Toton | |
22/10/1966 | Condemned | 78008 | 84B | Oxley | COND | ||
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78013 | 16A | Toton | 9K | Bolton | |
12/11/1966 | Condemned | 78018 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
12/11/1966 | Condemned | 78019 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78020 | 16A | Toton | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78021 | 16A | Toton | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78028 | 16A | Toton | 9K | Bolton | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78036 | 5B | Crewe South | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78044 | 16A | Toton | 9K | Bolton | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78055 | 16A | Toton | 9K | Bolton | |
12/11/1966 | Condemned | 78059 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
12/11/1966 | Condemned | 78061 | 16A | Toton | COND | ||
19/11/1966 | Condemned | 78046 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/11/1966 | Reallocation | 78062 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9K | Bolton | |
29/11/1966 | Condemned | 78051 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
12/1966 | Condemned | 78064 | 16A | Toton | COND | ||
03/12/1966 | Condemned | 78036 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 78017 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 78058 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 78063 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
17/12/1966 | Condemned | 78003 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
11/02/1967 | Condemned | 78028 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
11/02/1967 | Condemned | 78055 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78007 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78012 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78013 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78020 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78021 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78023 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78037 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78041 | 10D | Lostock Hall | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78044 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 78062 | 9K | Bolton | COND |