BR Standard Riddles "Std 2MT" Class 2-6-0
Class | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR2/1 | 78000 | 12/12/1952 | 89A 89A 89C 16A 16C W |
Oswestry Oswestry Machynlleth Nottingham Derby Withdrawn |
12/1952 27/12/1952 18/04/1953 25/05/1963 25/01/1964 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78001 | 23/12/1952 | 89A 89A 89C 85A 85C 85B W |
Oswestry Oswestry Machynlleth Worcester Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
12/1952 27/12/1952 18/04/1953 22/05/1954 25/01/1964 04/05/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78002 | 24/12/1952 | 89A 89A 89C 27D 8K 10D W |
Oswestry Oswestry Machynlleth Wigan Central (L&Y) Bank Hall Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
12/1952 27/12/1952 16/05/1953 17/08/1963 14/09/1963 20/06/1964 11/06/1966 |
11/06/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78003 | 31/12/1952 | 89A 89C 85A 89C 6H 1A 5E 6D W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Worcester Machynlleth Bangor Willesden Nuneaton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
12/1952 18/04/1953 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 25/05/1963 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 15/01/1966 17/12/1966 |
17/12/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78004 | 21/01/1953 | 89A 89C 82C 85C 87F 85B W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Swindon Hereford Llanelli Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
01/1953 16/05/1953 30/01/1954 13/07/1957 25/01/1964 20/07/1964 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78005 | 24/02/1953 | 89A 89C 85C 85B W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
02/1953 16/05/1953 03/11/1962 04/05/1964 09/1964 |
28/09/1964 |
BR2/1 | 78006 | 06/03/1953 | 89A 89C 85C 85B W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
03/1953 03/10/1953 06/10/1962 04/05/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78007 | 13/03/1953 | 89A 89C 5A 5B 9G 9E 9K W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Crewe North Crewe South Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
03/1953 03/10/1953 22/06/1963 27/06/1964 06/03/1965 12/06/1965 13/08/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78008 | 03/1953 | 89A 85A 84A 84B W |
Oswestry Worcester Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
03/1953 11/07/1953 24/03/1962 17/11/1962 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78009 | 04/1953 | 89A 85A 85C W |
Oswestry Worcester Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
04/1953 11/07/1953 06/04/1963 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 |
BR2/1 | 78010 | 12/1953 | 51F 51J 66A 66B 51A 55C 5B W |
West Auckland Northallerton Polmadie Motherwell Darlington Farnley Junction Crewe South Withdrawn |
12/1953 19/03/1955 16/03/1963 08/06/1963 13/07/1963 09/11/1963 25/04/1964 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78011 | 12/1953 | 51F 51J 51A 55C 55F 9G 9E W |
West Auckland Northallerton Darlington Farnley Junction Manningham Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
12/1953 19/03/1955 09/03/1963 09/11/1963 18/04/1964 29/11/1964 12/06/1965 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78012 | 01/1954 | 51F 51J 51A 52D 9G 9E 9K W |
West Auckland Northallerton Darlington Tweedmouth Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
01/1954 19/03/1955 09/03/1963 09/11/1963 29/11/1964 12/06/1965 13/08/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78013 | 01/1954 | 51F 51J 51H 16B 16A 15E 15A 16A 9K W |
West Auckland Northallerton Kirkby Stephen Kirkby in Ashfield Nottingham Coalville Leicester Midland Toton Bolton Withdrawn |
01/1954 19/03/1955 31/01/1958 18/06/1960 23/03/1963 07/12/1963 26/09/1964 16/07/1966 12/11/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78014 | 02/1954 | 51F 51J 51A 55C 55F 9G 9E W |
West Auckland Northallerton Darlington Farnley Junction Manningham Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
02/1954 19/03/1955 09/03/1963 09/11/1963 18/04/1964 29/11/1964 12/06/1965 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78015 | 02/1954 | 51F 51J 51A W |
West Auckland Northallerton Darlington Withdrawn |
02/1954 15/12/1956 09/03/1963 25/11/1963 |
25/11/1963 |
BR2/1 | 78016 | 03/1954 | 51F 51H 51J 51F 66B 67E 67F W |
West Auckland Kirkby Stephen Northallerton West Auckland Motherwell Dumfries Stranraer Withdrawn |
03/1954 24/04/1954 08/02/1958 12/04/1958 17/08/1963 02/11/1963 29/02/1964 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78017 | 03/1954 | 51F 51H 8F 6K 8D 6K 5D 6D W |
West Auckland Kirkby Stephen Springs Branch (Wigan) Rhyl Widnes Rhyl Stoke Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
03/1954 24/04/1954 30/04/1960 10/06/1961 04/11/1961 10/03/1962 28/04/1962 08/10/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78018 | 03/1954 | 51F 51H 6A 12F 6A 1A 5E 6D W |
West Auckland Kirkby Stephen Chester (MR) Workington Chester (MR) Willesden Nuneaton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
03/1954 24/04/1954 30/04/1960 23/06/1962 06/10/1962 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 23/04/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78019 | 03/1954 | 51H 8F 8E 1A 5E 5B W |
Kirkby Stephen Springs Branch (Wigan) Northwich Willesden Nuneaton Crewe South Withdrawn |
03/1954 30/04/1960 10/06/1961 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 15/01/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78020 | 04/1954 | 15B 16A 8P 8F 16C 16A 10D W |
Kettering Nottingham Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Derby Toton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
04/1954 07/11/1959 14/12/1963 18/04/1964 23/05/1964 08/10/1966 12/11/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78021 | 05/1954 | 15B 16A 16C 15A 16A 10D W |
Kettering Nottingham Derby Leicester Midland Toton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
05/1954 07/11/1959 25/01/1964 06/02/1965 16/07/1966 12/11/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78022 | 05/1954 | 19B 36A 30A 31B 12E 27B 10D W |
Sheffield Millhouses Doncaster Stratford March Barrow in Furness Aintree Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
05/1954 06/01/1962 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 11/05/1963 28/12/1963 17/09/1966 |
17/09/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78023 | 05/1954 | 19B 36A 30A 31B 12E 27B 16D 9G 9E 9K W |
Sheffield Millhouses Doncaster Stratford March Barrow in Furness Aintree Nottingham Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
05/1954 06/01/1962 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 18/05/1963 23/05/1964 06/03/1965 12/06/1965 13/08/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78024 | 05/1954 | 19B 36A 30A 31B 51A 52D 9G W |
Sheffield Millhouses Doncaster Stratford March Darlington Tweedmouth Gorton Withdrawn |
05/1954 06/01/1962 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 19/10/1963 29/11/1964 20/02/1965 |
20/02/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78025 | 06/1954 | 19A 19B 36A 30A 31B 51A 51F 52D 9G W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Doncaster Stratford March Darlington West Auckland Tweedmouth Gorton Withdrawn |
06/1954 04/12/1954 06/01/1962 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 22/12/1962 19/10/1963 29/11/1964 13/02/1965 |
13/02/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78026 | 06/1954 | 19C 67C 67E 67F 67A W |
Canklow Ayr Dumfries Stranraer Corkerhill Withdrawn |
06/1954 27/01/1962 19/01/1963 29/02/1964 28/11/1964 24/08/1966 |
24/08/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78027 | 06/1954 | 19C 30A 31B 12E 27A 27D 8F 16C 15A W |
Canklow Stratford March Barrow in Furness Bank Hall Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Derby Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
06/1954 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 08/12/1962 11/05/1963 29/06/1963 18/04/1964 23/05/1964 03/10/1964 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78028 | 07/1954 | 15C 15B 16A 15E 15A 16A 9K W |
Leicester Midland Kettering Nottingham Coalville Leicester Midland Toton Bolton Withdrawn |
07/1954 10/01/1959 07/11/1959 04/01/1964 26/09/1964 16/07/1966 12/11/1966 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78029 | 07/1954 | 15C 16A 89D 1C 1A W |
Leicester Midland Nottingham Oswestry Watford Willesden Withdrawn |
07/1954 07/11/1959 25/05/1963 01/06/1963 03/04/1965 02/10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78030 | 09/1954 | 10B 5A 5B W |
Preston Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
09/1954 21/04/1956 31/10/1964 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78031 | 09/1954 | 11E 6D 6K 5B W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Chester Northgate Rhyl Crewe South Withdrawn |
09/1954 06/10/1956 20/06/1959 07/04/1962 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78032 | 09/1954 | 6K 8D 12D 6A 6A 6H 1A W |
Rhyl Widnes Kirkby Stephen Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Bangor Willesden Withdrawn |
09/1954 19/05/1956 09/04/1960 30/04/1960 13/06/1960 07/09/1963 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78033 | 09/1954 | 6K 5A 6K 8D 6A 1A W |
Rhyl Crewe North Rhyl Widnes Chester (MR) Willesden Withdrawn |
09/1954 26/02/1955 26/03/1955 19/05/1956 13/06/1960 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78034 | 10/1954 | 6K 8D 2B 6H 1C 1A 5B W |
Rhyl Widnes Nuneaton Bangor Watford Willesden Crewe South Withdrawn |
10/1954 19/05/1956 09/09/1961 16/09/1961 25/05/1963 03/04/1965 02/10/1965 08/01/1966 |
08/01/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78035 | 06/11/1954 | 6K 8D 24K 8D 1C 1A 6D W |
Rhyl Widnes Preston Widnes Watford Willesden Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
06/11/1954 19/05/1956 19/04/1958 17/05/1958 25/05/1963 03/04/1965 02/10/1965 12/1965 |
12/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78036 | 13/11/1954 | 10B 24C 24G 5B 6D W |
Preston Lostock Hall Skipton Crewe South Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
13/11/1954 16/09/1961 15/09/1962 25/05/1963 12/11/1966 03/12/1966 |
03/12/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78037 | 13/11/1954 | 10B 24C 24G 8F 16C 10D W |
Preston Lostock Hall Skipton Springs Branch (Wigan) Derby Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
13/11/1954 16/09/1961 15/09/1962 21/03/1964 23/05/1964 06/03/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78038 | 20/11/1954 | 3A 6D 6K 8E 1A 6D W |
Bescot Chester Northgate Rhyl Northwich Willesden Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
20/11/1954 06/10/1956 22/03/1958 28/11/1959 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 |
20/08/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78039 | 27/11/1954 | 6K 8D 1A 5E 6D W |
Rhyl Widnes Willesden Nuneaton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
27/11/1954 19/05/1956 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 23/04/1966 01/10/1966 |
01/10/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78040 | 11/12/1954 | 27A 27D 27B 10D W |
Bank Hall Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
11/12/1954 23/02/1957 14/01/1961 11/04/1964 22/01/1966 |
22/01/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78041 | 18/12/1954 | 27A 10D W |
Bank Hall Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
18/12/1954 20/06/1964 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78042 | 25/12/1954 | 27A 16D 16A W |
Bank Hall Nottingham Toton Withdrawn |
25/12/1954 23/05/1964 03/04/1965 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78043 | 25/12/1954 | 27A 27B 27A 27B 1A W |
Bank Hall Aintree Bank Hall Aintree Willesden Withdrawn |
25/12/1954 01/12/1956 23/03/1957 15/09/1962 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78044 | 12/1954 | 27A 27B 10D 8L 16D 16A 9K W |
Bank Hall Aintree Lostock Hall Aintree Nottingham Toton Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1954 15/09/1962 28/12/1963 11/04/1964 23/05/1964 03/04/1965 12/11/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78045 | 12/10/1955 | 61A 61C 61B 64F W |
Kittybrewster Keith Aberdeen Ferryhill Bathgate Withdrawn |
12/10/1955 02/07/1960 01/07/1961 25/07/1964 03/01/1966 |
03/01/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78046 | 20/10/1955 | 64G 64F 64A W |
Hawick Bathgate St Margarets Withdrawn |
20/10/1955 25/01/1964 24/09/1966 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78047 | 25/10/1955 | 64G 64A 64F W 64A |
Hawick St Margarets Bathgate Withdrawn St Margarets |
25/10/1955 30/10/1965 29/01/1966 02/09/1966 24/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78048 | 28/10/1955 | 64A 64G W |
St Margarets Hawick Withdrawn |
28/10/1955 30/07/1960 13/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
BR2/1 | 78049 | 11/1955 | 64A 64G 64A W |
St Margarets Hawick St Margarets Withdrawn |
11/1955 04/07/1959 29/01/1966 22/08/1966 |
22/08/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78050 | 11/1955 | 66B 65D 64F W |
Motherwell Dawsholm Bathgate Withdrawn |
11/1955 02/11/1963 22/08/1964 03/01/1966 |
03/01/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78051 | 11/1955 | 66B 65D 67E 67C W |
Motherwell Dawsholm Dumfries Ayr Withdrawn |
11/1955 02/11/1963 22/08/1964 25/06/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78052 | 11/1955 | 66B 60A 60C 64A 60B 63A 64F W |
Motherwell Inverness Helmsdale St Margarets Aviemore Perth South Bathgate Withdrawn |
11/1955 22/12/1956 02/1957 27/09/1958 22/11/1958 11/08/1962 30/11/1963 03/01/1966 |
03/01/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78053 | 11/1955 | 66B 61B 61C 61B 65J W |
Motherwell Aberdeen Ferryhill Keith Aberdeen Ferryhill Stirling Withdrawn |
11/1955 27/10/1956 22/12/1956 01/07/1961 19/01/1963 30/07/1964 |
30/07/1964 |
BR2/1 | 78054 | 12/1955 | 66B 61B 61C 61B 64F W |
Motherwell Aberdeen Ferryhill Keith Aberdeen Ferryhill Bathgate Withdrawn |
12/1955 27/10/1956 22/12/1956 01/07/1961 25/07/1964 16/12/1965 |
16/12/1965 |
BR2/1 | 78055 | 08/1956 | 6D 3A 6D 6G 6K 8E 5B 24G 8L 16D 16A 9K W |
Chester Northgate Bescot Chester Northgate Llandudno Junction Rhyl Northwich Crewe South Skipton Aintree Nottingham Toton Bolton Withdrawn |
08/1956 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 17/09/1960 17/11/1962 25/05/1963 21/03/1964 23/05/1964 03/04/1965 12/11/1966 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78056 | 08/1956 | 6D 6K 5D W |
Chester Northgate Rhyl Stoke Withdrawn |
08/1956 11/04/1959 28/04/1962 16/07/1966 |
16/07/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78057 | 09/1956 | 6D 6K 6A 6H 8E 27D 8F 16C 10D W |
Chester Northgate Rhyl Chester (MR) Bangor Northwich Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Derby Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
09/1956 26/01/1957 10/08/1957 30/11/1957 28/11/1959 11/05/1963 18/04/1964 23/05/1964 06/03/1965 21/05/1966 |
21/05/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78058 | 09/1956 | 6D 6G 6H 1A 6D W |
Chester Northgate Llandudno Junction Bangor Willesden Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
09/1956 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78059 | 09/1956 | 6D 6G 6H 6J 6H 1A 5E 5D 5B W |
Chester Northgate Llandudno Junction Bangor Holyhead Bangor Willesden Nuneaton Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
09/1956 11/04/1959 07/11/1959 25/04/1964 31/10/1964 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 04/06/1966 08/10/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78060 | 13/10/1956 | 27D 27B 1A 6D W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Willesden Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
13/10/1956 15/09/1962 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78061 | 13/10/1956 | 27D 8F 16C 15A 16A W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Derby Leicester Midland Toton Withdrawn |
13/10/1956 18/04/1964 23/05/1964 03/10/1964 16/07/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78062 | 20/10/1956 | 27D 8F 16D 16A 9G 9E 9K W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Nottingham Toton Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
20/10/1956 18/04/1964 23/05/1964 03/04/1965 24/04/1965 12/06/1965 19/11/1966 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR2/1 | 78063 | 11/1956 | 27D 1A 5E 6D W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Willesden Nuneaton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
11/1956 25/05/1963 02/10/1965 23/04/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR2/1 | 78064 | 11/1956 | 27D 16C 16A W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Derby Toton Withdrawn |
11/1956 08/02/1964 08/10/1966 12/1966 |
12/1966 |