Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 578 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3973 Week
» 19952 Month
» 215406 Year
» 1099787 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "Tilbury tanks" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1980     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1981     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1982     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1983     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1984     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1985     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1986     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1987     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1988     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1989     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1990     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1991     13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1992     13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1993     13A Plaistow  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 1987 13A Plaistow 24B Rose Grove  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41980 13C Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41981 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41985 13A Plaistow 33C Shoeburyness  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41992 13D Northwich 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41981 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41982 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41990 13A Plaistow 33C Shoeburyness  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41991 13D Northwich 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41993 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 41985 33C Shoeburyness 33B Tilbury  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41982 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41990 33C Shoeburyness 33A Plaistow  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41993 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
04/1958 Condemned 41988 13A Plaistow   COND  
04/1958 Condemned 41989 13A Plaistow   COND  
05/1958 Condemned 41980 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41982 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41983 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41984 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41985 33B Tilbury   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41986 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41987 24B Rose Grove   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41990 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41991 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41992 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41993 33A Plaistow   COND  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 41981 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
18/06/1962 Condemned 41981 33B Tilbury   COND