Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 576 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3971 Week
» 19950 Month
» 215404 Year
» 1099785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "Tilbury tanks" Class 0-6-2T


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Tilbury tanks 1980 41980 06/1903 13C
33A
W
Tilbury
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
05/1958
05/1958
Tilbury tanks 1981 41981 06/1903 13A
33B
33A
33B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
19/04/1952
07/11/1959
18/06/1962
18/06/1962
Tilbury tanks 1982 41982 06/1903 13A
33B
33A
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
15/12/1956
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1983 41983 06/1903 13A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1984 41984 07/1903 13A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1985 41985 07/1903 13A
33C
33B
W
Plaistow
Shoeburyness
Tilbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
17/05/1952
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1986 41986 08/1908 13A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1987 41987 08/1908 13A
24B
W
Plaistow
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1988 41988 08/1908 13A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1958
04/1958
Tilbury tanks 1989 41989 09/1908 13A
W
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1958
04/1958
Tilbury tanks 1990 41990 11/1912 13A
33C
33A
W
Plaistow
Shoeburyness
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
15/12/1956
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1991 41991 11/1912 13D
33A
W
Northwich
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1992 41992 11/1912 13D
33A
W
Northwich
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
02/1959
02/1959
Tilbury tanks 1993 41993 11/1912 13A
33B
33A
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Plaistow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
15/12/1956
02/1959
02/1959