07 0-6-0
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D2985 | 07001 | 27/06/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
27/06/1962 20/07/1964 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2986 | 07002 | 16/06/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
16/06/1962 07/02/1966 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2987 | 07003 | 16/06/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
16/06/1962 07/02/1966 04/10/1976 |
04/10/1976 |
D2988 | 16/06/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
16/06/1962 07/02/1966 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 | |
D2989 | 07005 | 27/06/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
27/06/1962 07/02/1966 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2990 | 07006 | 13/07/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
13/07/1962 07/02/1966 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2991 | 07007 | 21/07/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
21/07/1962 07/02/1966 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D2992 | 07008 | 28/07/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
28/07/1962 07/02/1966 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D2993 | 07009 | 21/08/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
21/08/1962 07/02/1966 04/10/1976 |
04/10/1976 |
D2994 | 07010 | 05/09/1962 | 71I 70D BM W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/09/1962 07/02/1966 31/10/1975 04/10/1976 |
04/10/1976 |
D2995 | 07011 | 22/09/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
22/09/1962 07/02/1966 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2996 | 07012 | 06/10/1962 | 71I 70D BM EH W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
06/10/1962 07/02/1966 31/10/1975 31/10/1976 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2997 | 07013 | 20/10/1962 | 71I 70D BM EH W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Bournemouth Eastleigh Withdrawn |
20/10/1962 07/02/1966 31/10/1975 31/10/1976 02/07/1977 |
02/07/1977 |
D2998 | 10/11/1962 | 71I 70D W |
Southampton Docks (New) Eastleigh Withdrawn |
10/11/1962 20/07/1964 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |