Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 147 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2292 Week
» 16549 Month
» 244433 Year
» 1465998 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/7 0-6-0


LMS BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
7110 12023 31/01/1942 DE 23/12/1967 25.92 Cut W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) 01/07/1968 26.43
7111 12024 31/01/1942 DE 16/12/1967 25.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/03/1968 26.10
7112 12025 28/02/1942 DE 11/11/1967 Speke Junction 25.75 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/10/1968 26.61
7113 12026 28/02/1942 DE 21/10/1967 25.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 02/04/1968 26.11
7114 12027 31/03/1942 DE 04/11/1967 25.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 03/04/1968 26.03
7115 12028 31/03/1942 DE 24/06/1967 25.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/04/1968 26.03
7116 12029 31/03/1942 DE 21/05/1966 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/07/1966 24.27
7117 12030 31/03/1942 DE 08/08/1964 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/09/1964 22.44
7118 12031 31/07/1942 DE 30/12/1967 25.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/07/1968 25.94
7119 12032 30/06/1942 DE 16/12/1967 25.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/07/1968 26.02