Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 322 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1421 Week
» 7555 Month
» 235439 Year
» 1457004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/7 0-6-0


LMS BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
7080 12003 31/05/1939 DE 18/11/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 28.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 29.19
7081 12004 31/05/1939 DE 09/12/1967 28.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/05/1968 28.94
7082 12005 31/05/1939 DE 09/09/1967 28.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 28.86
7083 12006 30/06/1939 DE 30/09/1967 28.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/06/1968 28.94
7084 12007 30/06/1939 DE 14/10/1967 28.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 28.78
7085 12008 30/09/1939 DE 15/07/1967 27.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1968 28.36
7086 12009 30/11/1939 DE 30/09/1967 27.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1968 28.78
7087 12010 31/12/1939 DE 30/09/1967 27.75 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1968 28.69
7088 12011 31/12/1939 DE 12/03/1966 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/05/1966 26.35
7089 12012 31/12/1939 DE 30/12/1967 28 Cut W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) 01/07/1968 28.52
7090 12013 31/01/1940 DE 18/11/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 28.52
7091 12014 31/03/1940 DE 21/10/1967 27.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 28.02
7092 12015 31/03/1940 DE 28/10/1967 27.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 28.02
7093 12016 30/04/1940 DE 30/09/1967 27.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/10/1968 28.44
7094 12017 30/04/1940 DE 28/10/1967 27.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 27.94
7095 12018 31/05/1940 DE 28/10/1967 27.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 02/04/1968 27.86
7096 12019 30/06/1940 DE 14/10/1967 27.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 03/04/1968 27.78
7097 12020 30/06/1940 DE 18/11/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 28.11
7098 12021 30/06/1940 DE 28/10/1967 27.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 27.77
7099 12022 31/07/1940 DE 12/11/1966 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/08/1967 27.02