Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 970 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6946 Week
» 13080 Month
» 240964 Year
» 1462529 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/7 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 09/12/1961 12004,
12014,
12020,
12027
21B,
5B,
6B,
8C
  Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel test house.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 08/04/1962 12009,
12019
5B,
5B
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - On Crewe South shed waiting works.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - On Crewe South shed waiting works.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 12009,
12019
5B,
5B
  Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 29/04/1967 12020,
12031
8F,
8F
  A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt