Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 171 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7178 Week
» 13312 Month
» 241196 Year
» 1462761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/7 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7080     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7081     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7082     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7083     18A Toton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7084     18A Toton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7085     18A Toton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7086     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7087     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7088     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7089     18A Toton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7090     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7091     5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7092     5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7093     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7094     5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7095     5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7096     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7097     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7098     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7099     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7110     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7111     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7112     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7113     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7114     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7115     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7116     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7117     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7118     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7119     1A Willesden  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 12024 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 7112 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 12026 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 7114 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 12028 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 91M To London Midland Region  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 12024 91M To London Midland Region 8C Speke Junction  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 7112 91M To London Midland Region 8C Speke Junction  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 12026 91M To London Midland Region 8C Speke Junction  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 7114 91M To London Midland Region 8C Speke Junction  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 12028 91M To London Midland Region 8C Speke Junction  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 12012 18A Toton 18A Toton  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 12018 5B Crewe South 8A Edge Hill  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 12018 8A Edge Hill 8C Speke Junction  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 12012 18A Toton 8C Speke Junction  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 12012 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 12015 5B Crewe South 5B Crewe South  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 12007 18A Toton 5B Crewe South  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 12012 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 12015 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 12027 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 12007 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 12027 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 12012 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
02/01/1954 Reallocation 12013 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 12020 8C Speke Junction 1A Willesden  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 12013 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12005 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12020 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12021 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12022 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12023 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12030 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12031 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 12032 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 12004 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 12009 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 12010 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 12019 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 12013 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 12029 1A Willesden 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 12026 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
13/08/1955 Reallocation 12026 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
01/12/1956 Reallocation 12029 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 12011 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 12003 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 12025 8C Speke Junction 5B Crewe South  
30/05/1959 Reallocation 12005 5B Crewe South 6A Chester (MR)  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 12006 18A Toton 8C Speke Junction  
25/07/1959 Reallocation 12003 5B Crewe South 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
25/07/1959 Reallocation 12019 5B Crewe South 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
25/07/1959 Reallocation 12022 5B Crewe South 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
25/07/1959 Reallocation 12023 5B Crewe South 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 12005 6A Chester (MR) 5B Crewe South  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 12003 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 8C Speke Junction  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 12004 5B Crewe South 21E Monument Lane  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 12012 5B Crewe South 21E Monument Lane  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 12013 5B Crewe South 21B Bescot  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 12030 5B Crewe South 21B Bescot  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 12004 21E Monument Lane 21B Bescot  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 12012 21E Monument Lane 21B Bescot  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 12019 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5B Crewe South  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 12022 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5B Crewe South  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 12031 5B Crewe South 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 12032 5B Crewe South 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
19/08/1961 Reallocation 12003 8C Speke Junction 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
30/09/1961 Reallocation 12020 5B Crewe South 6B Mold Junction  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 12012 21B Bescot 2K Bushbury  
18/07/1964 Reallocation 12010 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
08/08/1964 Reallocation 12024 8C Speke Junction 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
08/08/1964 Condemned 12030 21B Bescot   COND  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 12010 8C Speke Junction 9B Stockport Edgeley  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 12023 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 12024 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 9B Stockport Edgeley  
17/04/1965 Reallocation 12012 2K Bushbury 2F Bescot  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 12010 9B Stockport Edgeley 8C Speke Junction  
11/09/1965 Reallocation 12009 5B Crewe South 1H Northampton  
02/10/1965 Reallocation 12009 1H Northampton 1F Rugby  
06/11/1965 Reallocation 12024 9B Stockport Edgeley 9D Newton Heath  
19/02/1966 Reallocation 12009 1F Rugby 5A Crewe Diesel  
19/02/1966 Reallocation 12012 2F Bescot 2B Oxley  
19/02/1966 Reallocation 12013 21B Bescot 2B Oxley  
12/03/1966 Condemned 12011 5B Crewe South   COND  
16/04/1966 Reallocation 12004 21B Bescot 2G Ryecroft (Walsall)  
16/04/1966 Reallocation 12013 2B Oxley 2G Ryecroft (Walsall)  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 12020 6B Mold Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
21/05/1966 Condemned 12029 8C Speke Junction   COND  
12/11/1966 Condemned 12022 5B Crewe South   COND  
14/01/1967 Reallocation 12009 5A Crewe Diesel 1F Rugby  
14/01/1967 Reallocation 12019 5B Crewe South 1F Rugby  
28/01/1967 Reallocation 12012 2B Oxley 8C Speke Junction  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12004 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12005 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12009 1F Rugby 8C Speke Junction  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12013 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12019 1F Rugby 8C Speke Junction  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12020 6A Chester (MR) 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12021 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 12025 5B Crewe South 8C Speke Junction  
24/06/1967 Condemned 12028 8C Speke Junction   COND  
15/07/1967 Condemned 12008 18A Toton   COND  
09/09/1967 Condemned 12005 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 12006 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 12009 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 12010 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 12016 8C Speke Junction   COND  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 12017 5B Crewe South 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 12021 8C Speke Junction 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
14/10/1967 Condemned 12007 8C Speke Junction   COND  
14/10/1967 Condemned 12019 8C Speke Junction   COND  
21/10/1967 Condemned 12014 5B Crewe South   COND  
21/10/1967 Condemned 12026 8C Speke Junction   COND  
28/10/1967 Condemned 12015 8C Speke Junction   COND  
28/10/1967 Condemned 12017 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
28/10/1967 Condemned 12018 8C Speke Junction   COND  
28/10/1967 Condemned 12021 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
04/11/1967 Condemned 12027 8C Speke Junction   COND  
11/11/1967 Condemned 12025 8C Speke Junction   COND  
18/11/1967 Condemned 12003 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
18/11/1967 Condemned 12013 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
18/11/1967 Condemned 12020 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
09/12/1967 Condemned 12004 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
16/12/1967 Condemned 12024 9D Newton Heath   COND  
16/12/1967 Condemned 12032 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
23/12/1967 Condemned 12023 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 12012 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 12031 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND