Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 302 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1401 Week
» 7535 Month
» 235419 Year
» 1456984 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/7 0-6-0


LMS BR (1955 Num) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
7080 12003 31/05/1939 8C
5B
8F
8C
8F
W
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
25/07/1959
02/07/1960
19/08/1961
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
7081 12004 31/05/1939 1A
5B
21E
21B
2G
8F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Monument Lane
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
05/11/1960
26/11/1960
16/04/1966
29/04/1967
09/12/1967
09/12/1967
7082 12005 31/05/1939 1A
5B
6A
5B
8C
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Chester (MR)
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
30/05/1959
16/01/1960
29/04/1967
09/09/1967
09/09/1967
7083 12006 30/06/1939 18A
8C
W
Toton
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
7084 12007 30/06/1939 18A
5B
8C
W
Toton
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
7085 12008 30/09/1939 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/07/1967
15/07/1967
7086 12009 30/11/1939 1A
5B
1H
1F
5A
1F
8C
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Northampton
Rugby
Crewe Diesel
Rugby
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
11/09/1965
02/10/1965
19/02/1966
14/01/1967
29/04/1967
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
7087 12010 31/12/1939 1A
5B
8C
9B
8C
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Stockport Edgeley
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
18/07/1964
28/11/1964
03/07/1965
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
7088 12011 31/12/1939 8C
5B
W
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/02/1958
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
7089 12012 31/12/1939 18A
18A
8C
5B
8C
5B
21E
21B
2K
2F
2B
8C
W
Toton
Toton
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Monument Lane
Bescot
Bushbury
Bescot
Oxley
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
03/01/1953
21/03/1953
16/05/1953
03/10/1953
05/11/1960
26/11/1960
27/06/1964
17/04/1965
19/02/1966
28/01/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
7090 12013 31/01/1940 8C
5B
1A
5B
21B
2B
2G
8F
W
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Willesden
Crewe South
Bescot
Oxley
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1954
19/06/1954
29/01/1955
05/11/1960
19/02/1966
16/04/1966
29/04/1967
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
7091 12014 31/03/1940 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
7092 12015 31/03/1940 5B
5B
8C
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
16/05/1953
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
7093 12016 30/04/1940 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
7094 12017 30/04/1940 5B
8F
W
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1967
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
7095 12018 31/05/1940 5B
8A
8C
W
Crewe South
Edge Hill
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
29/11/1952
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
7096 12019 30/06/1940 1A
5B
8F
5B
1F
8C
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe South
Rugby
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1955
25/07/1959
21/01/1961
14/01/1967
29/04/1967
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
7097 12020 30/06/1940 8C
1A
5B
6B
6A
8F
W
Speke Junction
Willesden
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Chester (MR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
06/11/1954
30/09/1961
23/04/1966
29/04/1967
18/11/1967
18/11/1967
7098 12021 30/06/1940 1A
5B
8C
8F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
29/04/1967
07/10/1967
28/10/1967
28/10/1967
7099 12022 31/07/1940 1A
5B
8G
5B
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
25/07/1959
21/01/1961
12/11/1966
12/11/1966
7110 12023 31/01/1942 1A
5B
8G
8F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
25/07/1959
28/11/1964
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
7111 12024 31/01/1942 12A
91M
8C
8F
9B
9D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stockport Edgeley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
08/08/1964
28/11/1964
06/11/1965
16/12/1967
16/12/1967
7112 12025 28/02/1942 12A
91M
8C
5B
8C
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
22/11/1958
29/04/1967
11/11/1967
11/11/1967
7113 12026 28/02/1942 12A
91M
8C
5B
8C
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
23/04/1955
13/08/1955
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
7114 12027 31/03/1942 12A
91M
8C
5B
8C
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
7115 12028 31/03/1942 12A
91M
8C
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
24/06/1967
24/06/1967
7116 12029 31/03/1942 1A
5B
8C
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
01/12/1956
21/05/1966
21/05/1966
7117 12030 31/03/1942 1A
5B
21B
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
05/11/1960
08/08/1964
08/08/1964
7118 12031 31/07/1942 1A
5B
8F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/06/1961
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
7119 12032 30/06/1942 1A
5B
8F
W
Willesden
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
10/06/1961
16/12/1967
16/12/1967