Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 90 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4727 Week
» 16020 Month
» 280653 Year
» 1502218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "18" Passenger Tank" Class 0-6-2T


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
18" Passenger Tank 6876 46876 09/1898 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
18" Passenger Tank 6878 46878 09/1898 3E
W
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
28/02/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6881 46881 08/1899 3B
W
Bushbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1948
24/07/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6883 46883 08/1899 12B
W
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6899 46899 08/1900 7C
3E
W
Holyhead
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
07/1952
07/1952
18" Passenger Tank 6900 46900 08/1900 8A
3E
W
Edge Hill
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
28/02/1953
28/02/1953
18" Passenger Tank 6906 46906 08/1900 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1951
05/1951
18" Passenger Tank 6909 46909 05/1901 2B
W
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1948
27/03/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6912 46912 05/1901 2B
W
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1951
08/12/1951
18" Passenger Tank 6917 46917 05/1901 8A
W
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/04/1949
30/04/1949
18" Passenger Tank 6920 46920 03/1902 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/05/1948
01/05/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6922 46922 03/1902 3E
W
Monument Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1951
07/1951
18" Passenger Tank 6924 46924 03/1902 8B
W
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1949
12/1949
18" Passenger Tank 6926 46926 03/1902 7B
W
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1948
14/02/1948
18" Passenger Tank 6931 46931 06/1902 3B
W
Bushbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949