Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER "Y5" Class 0-4-0ST


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
209 7209 05/1874 12/11/1926 Lowestoft 52.5
210 03/1875 Lowestoft 09/1914 Lowestoft 39.5
228 07228 04/1876 30/06/1927 Stratford 51.17 Cut
229 04/1876 02/1917 Stratford 40.83
226 06/1897 08/1911 Stratford 14.17
227 06/1897 12/1911 Stratford 14.5
230 7230 8081 68081 03/1903 15/04/1948 45.08 Cut
7231 04/1903 Colchester 16/07/1931 Colchester 28.25 Cut