Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 424 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 424 Week
» 23405 Month
» 386650 Year
» 463237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER "Y5" Class 0-4-0ST


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
03/1875 To Service 210   NEW LOW Lowestoft  
04/1903 To Service 7231   NEW COL Colchester  
08/1911 Condemned 226       COND  
12/1911 Condemned 227       COND  
09/1914 Condemned 210 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
02/1917 Condemned 229       COND  
14/12/1924 Reallocation 07228     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
08/03/1925 Reallocation 07228 NOR Norwich Thorpe STR Stratford  
27/05/1926 Reallocation 07228 STR Stratford NOR Norwich Thorpe  
12/11/1926 Condemned 7209       COND  
03/01/1927 Reallocation 07228 NOR Norwich Thorpe STR Stratford  
30/06/1927 Condemned 07228 STR Stratford   COND  
16/07/1931 Condemned 7231 COL Colchester   COND  
15/04/1948 Condemned 68081       COND