Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 424 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 424 Week
» 23405 Month
» 386650 Year
» 463237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER "Y5" Class 0-4-0ST


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Y5 209 7209     05/1874 W Withdrawn 12/11/1926 12/11/1926
Y5 210       03/1875 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
03/1875
09/1914
09/1914
Y5 228 07228     04/1876 NOR
STR
NOR
STR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/12/1924
08/03/1925
27/05/1926
03/01/1927
30/06/1927
30/06/1927
Y5 229       04/1876 W Withdrawn 02/1917 02/1917
Y5 226       06/1897 W Withdrawn 08/1911 08/1911
Y5 227       06/1897 W Withdrawn 12/1911 12/1911
Y5 230 7230 8081 68081 03/1903 W Withdrawn 15/04/1948 15/04/1948
Y5   7231     04/1903 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
04/1903
16/07/1931
16/07/1931