Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17317 Week
» 70333 Month
» 189860 Year
» 3216713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LNER |
4842 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
771 |
1946 1st |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
4821 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
750 |
1946 1st |
on |
10/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4880 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
809 |
1946 1st |
on |
13/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4781 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
710 |
1946 1st |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4785 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
714 |
1946 1st |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4792 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
721 |
1946 1st |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4866 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
795 |
1946 1st |
on |
19/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4800 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
729 |
1946 1st |
on |
23/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4876 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
805 |
1946 1st |
on |
23/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4790 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
719 |
1946 1st |
|
30/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4793 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
722 |
1946 1st |
|
30/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4789 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
718 |
1946 1st |
|
31/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
4791 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
720 |
1946 1st |
|
03/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4780 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
709 |
1946 1st |
|
05/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4833 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
762 |
1946 1st |
|
13/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4870 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
799 |
1946 1st |
|
13/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
3683 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
871 |
1946 1st |
|
18/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4772 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
701 |
1946 1st |
|
18/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4804 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
733 |
1946 1st |
|
18/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4782 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
711 |
1946 1st |
|
28/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
4848 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
877 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
722 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
822 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
720 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
820 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4784 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
813 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4794 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
823 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
3686 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
974 |
1946 2nd |
|
19/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4783 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
812 |
1946 2nd |
|
19/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
701 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
801 |
1946 2nd |
|
19/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
711 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
811 |
1946 2nd |
|
19/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
750 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
850 |
1946 2nd |
|
19/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4858 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
887 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
3695 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
983 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
710 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
810 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
721 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
821 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
733 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
833 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
895 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
799 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
899 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4856 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
885 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
3651 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
949 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
4808 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
837 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4814 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
843 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
718 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
818 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
719 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
819 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4815 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
844 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
714 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
814 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
762 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
862 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
809 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
909 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
824 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4796 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
825 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
4828 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
857 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
709 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
809 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
3648 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
946 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3653 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
951 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3665 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
953 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3666 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
954 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3672 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
960 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4775 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
804 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4869 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
898 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3671 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
959 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4840 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
869 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3674 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
962 |
1946 2nd |
|
14/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3681 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
969 |
1946 2nd |
|
14/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4831 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
860 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4860 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
889 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3667 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
955 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3670 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
958 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4853 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
882 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
4865 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
894 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
805 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
905 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
3668 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
956 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4836 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
865 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4843 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
872 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4861 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
890 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4776 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
805 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4863 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
892 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4779 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
808 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
4845 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
874 |
1946 2nd |
|
31/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
3664 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
937 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
3669 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
957 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4809 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
838 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4855 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
884 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4881 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
910 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4805 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
834 |
1946 2nd |
|
08/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
729 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
829 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
3650 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
948 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4859 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
888 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4890 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
919 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
4868 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
897 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
3687 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
975 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4803 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
832 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
3684 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
972 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4799 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
828 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4822 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
851 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4864 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
893 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
871 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
971 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4820 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
849 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
3663 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
936 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4849 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
878 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
771 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
871 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4811 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
840 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4852 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
881 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4857 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
886 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4879 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
908 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4824 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
853 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4825 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
854 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4850 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
879 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
3675 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
963 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4798 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
827 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4807 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
836 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4812 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
841 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4832 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
861 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
3652 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
950 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
4788 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
817 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4844 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
873 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3685 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
973 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3689 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
977 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4787 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
816 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4816 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
845 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3645 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
943 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3662 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
935 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4830 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
859 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4801 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
830 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4889 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
918 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3654 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
952 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4839 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
868 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4771 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
800 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4851 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
880 |
1946 2nd |
|
13/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4835 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
864 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3644 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
942 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3646 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
944 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3673 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
961 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3676 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
964 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3677 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
965 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4773 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
802 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4778 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
807 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4810 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
839 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4867 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
896 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4897 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
926 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4834 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
863 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3649 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
947 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4806 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
835 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4838 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
867 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4871 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
900 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3641 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
939 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3679 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
967 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4854 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
883 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4872 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
901 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4873 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
902 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4802 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
831 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3655 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
928 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4777 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
806 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4786 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
815 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
4887 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
916 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3647 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
945 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4774 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
803 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4882 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
911 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3688 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
976 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3690 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
978 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3691 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
979 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4877 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
906 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4886 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
915 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3694 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
982 |
1946 2nd |
|
06/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4837 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
866 |
1946 2nd |
|
06/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4813 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
842 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4823 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
852 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3642 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
940 |
1946 2nd |
|
08/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3678 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
966 |
1946 2nd |
|
08/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3693 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
981 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4884 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
913 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3643 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
941 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4841 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
870 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4878 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
907 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4883 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
912 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4874 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
903 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4893 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
922 |
1946 2nd |
|
11/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3656 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
929 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4875 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
904 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4819 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
848 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4885 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
914 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4891 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
920 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4895 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
924 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4896 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
925 |
1946 2nd |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4888 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
917 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
938 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4797 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
826 |
1946 2nd |
|
18/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4862 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
891 |
1946 2nd |
|
20/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4827 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
856 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4829 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
858 |
1946 2nd |
|
21/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3659 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
932 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4826 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
855 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4847 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
876 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4892 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
921 |
1946 2nd |
|
23/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3658 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
931 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3682 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
970 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4898 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
927 |
1946 2nd |
|
28/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4817 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
846 |
1946 2nd |
|
29/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
4818 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
847 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
3657 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
930 |
1946 2nd |
|
02/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
3660 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
933 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
3680 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
968 |
1946 2nd |
|
04/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
4846 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
875 |
1946 2nd |
|
05/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
3661 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
934 |
1946 2nd |
|
06/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
3692 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
980 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
4894 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
923 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
862 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E862 |
BR Tmp |
|
22/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
887 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E887 |
BR Tmp |
|
24/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
924 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E924 |
BR Tmp |
|
27/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
903 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E903 |
BR Tmp |
|
28/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
851 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E851 |
BR Tmp |
|
30/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
875 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E875 |
BR Tmp |
|
30/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
964 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E964 |
BR Tmp |
|
31/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
873 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E873 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
810 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E810 |
BR Tmp |
|
07/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
891 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E891 |
BR Tmp |
|
07/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
957 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E957 |
BR Tmp |
|
07/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
867 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E867 |
BR Tmp |
|
09/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
893 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E893 |
BR Tmp |
|
11/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
912 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E912 |
BR Tmp |
|
16/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
823 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E823 |
BR Tmp |
|
17/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
815 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E815 |
BR Tmp |
|
19/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
937 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E937 |
BR Tmp |
|
20/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
983 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E983 |
BR Tmp |
|
20/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
872 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E872 |
BR Tmp |
|
25/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
860 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E860 |
BR Tmp |
|
28/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
865 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E865 |
BR Tmp |
|
04/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
804 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E804 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
819 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E819 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
819 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60819 |
|
on |
05/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
958 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E958 |
BR Tmp |
|
05/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
889 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E889 |
BR Tmp |
|
08/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
982 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60982 |
|
|
24/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
925 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60925 |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
869 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60869 |
|
|
02/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
933 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60933 |
|
|
02/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
820 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60820 |
|
|
04/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
923 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60923 |
|
|
04/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
822 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60822 |
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
835 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60835 |
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
866 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60866 |
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
884 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60884 |
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
966 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60966 |
|
|
14/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
821 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60821 |
|
|
16/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
825 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60825 |
|
|
23/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
882 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60882 |
|
|
23/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
973 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60973 |
|
|
07/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
881 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60881 |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
956 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60956 |
|
|
12/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
834 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60834 |
|
|
13/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
836 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60836 |
|
|
13/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
959 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60959 |
|
|
14/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
972 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60972 |
|
|
14/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
914 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60914 |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
962 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60962 |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
809 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60809 |
|
|
02/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
965 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60965 |
|
|
02/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
839 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60839 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
814 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60814 |
|
|
08/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
880 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60880 |
|
|
10/06/1948 |
|
BR |
E964 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60964 |
|
|
10/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
806 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60806 |
|
|
11/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
877 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60877 |
|
|
16/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
808 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60808 |
|
|
18/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
816 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60816 |
|
|
25/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
870 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60870 |
|
|
07/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
818 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60818 |
|
|
16/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
824 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60824 |
|
|
16/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
922 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60922 |
|
|
23/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
883 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60883 |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
898 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60898 |
|
|
06/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
920 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60920 |
|
|
06/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
849 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60849 |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
974 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60974 |
|
|
11/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
913 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60913 |
|
|
13/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
975 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60975 |
|
|
20/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
910 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60910 |
|
|
25/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
811 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60811 |
|
|
26/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
868 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60868 |
|
|
27/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
892 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60892 |
|
|
27/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
940 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60940 |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
894 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60894 |
|
|
30/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
953 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60953 |
|
|
02/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
942 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60942 |
|
|
08/09/1948 |
|
BR |
E804 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60804 |
|
|
10/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
817 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60817 |
|
|
10/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
980 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60980 |
|
|
10/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
979 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60979 |
|
|
15/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
941 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60941 |
|
|
16/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
854 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60854 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
|
BR |
E810 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60810 |
|
|
01/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
850 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60850 |
|
|
01/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
919 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60919 |
|
|
01/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
961 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60961 |
|
|
08/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
876 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60876 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
826 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60826 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
932 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60932 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
833 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60833 |
|
|
18/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
934 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60934 |
|
|
20/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
927 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60927 |
|
|
22/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
807 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60807 |
|
|
25/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
885 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60885 |
|
|
29/10/1948 |
|
BR |
E887 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60887 |
|
|
31/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
805 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60805 |
|
|
12/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
827 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60827 |
|
on |
12/11/1948 |
|
BR |
E860 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60860 |
|
|
12/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
886 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60886 |
|
|
12/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
981 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60981 |
|
|
12/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
908 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60908 |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
971 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60971 |
|
|
25/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
831 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60831 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
856 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60856 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
946 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60946 |
|
|
03/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
960 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60960 |
|
|
08/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
951 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60951 |
|
|
09/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
837 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60837 |
|
|
15/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
902 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60902 |
|
|
15/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
813 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60813 |
|
|
17/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
970 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60970 |
|
on |
23/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
948 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60948 |
|
|
24/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
918 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60918 |
|
|
31/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
909 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60909 |
|
|
05/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
969 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60969 |
|
|
06/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
846 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60846 |
|
|
12/01/1949 |
|
BR |
E862 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60862 |
|
|
12/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
952 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60952 |
|
|
17/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
801 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60801 |
|
|
19/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
895 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60895 |
|
|
21/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
944 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60944 |
|
|
27/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
930 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60930 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
800 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60800 |
|
|
04/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
838 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60838 |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
|
BR |
E893 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60893 |
|
|
07/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
859 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60859 |
|
|
11/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
967 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60967 |
|
|
11/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
926 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60926 |
|
|
14/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
931 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60931 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
863 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60863 |
|
|
04/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
830 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60830 |
|
|
11/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
871 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60871 |
|
|
16/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
832 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60832 |
|
|
17/03/1949 |
|
BR |
E889 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60889 |
|
|
25/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
853 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60853 |
|
|
31/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
847 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60847 |
|
|
01/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
896 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60896 |
|
|
12/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
954 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60954 |
|
|
22/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
928 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60928 |
|
|
29/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
911 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60911 |
|
|
10/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
840 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60840 |
|
|
12/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
802 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60802 |
|
|
16/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
888 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60888 |
|
|
20/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
848 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60848 |
|
|
27/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
915 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60915 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
|
BR |
E912 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60912 |
|
|
30/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
917 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60917 |
|
|
02/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
955 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60955 |
|
|
03/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
841 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60841 |
|
|
10/06/1949 |
|
BR |
E873 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60873 |
|
|
17/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
861 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60861 |
|
|
20/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
812 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60812 |
|
|
23/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
878 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60878 |
|
|
24/06/1949 |
|
BR |
E815 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60815 |
|
|
11/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
858 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60858 |
|
|
13/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
890 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60890 |
|
|
13/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
855 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60855 |
|
|
15/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
879 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60879 |
|
|
26/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
939 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60939 |
|
|
29/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
968 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60968 |
|
|
29/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
916 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60916 |
|
|
17/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
949 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60949 |
|
|
19/08/1949 |
|
BR |
E875 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60875 |
|
|
31/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
899 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60899 |
|
|
31/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
829 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60829 |
|
|
21/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
845 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60845 |
|
|
22/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
963 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60963 |
|
|
22/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
828 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60828 |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
|
BR |
E957 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60957 |
|
|
30/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
857 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60857 |
|
|
21/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
938 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60938 |
|
|
27/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
900 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60900 |
|
|
04/11/1949 |
|
BR |
E891 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60891 |
|
|
09/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
844 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60844 |
|
on |
17/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
936 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60936 |
|
|
17/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
947 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60947 |
|
|
18/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
921 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60921 |
|
|
24/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
978 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60978 |
|
|
24/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
977 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60977 |
|
|
02/12/1949 |
|
BR |
E823 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60823 |
|
|
07/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
935 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60935 |
|
|
09/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
901 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60901 |
|
|
16/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
874 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60874 |
|
|
30/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
904 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60904 |
|
|
30/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
976 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60976 |
|
|
04/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
905 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60905 |
|
|
06/01/1950 |
|
BR |
E851 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60851 |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
929 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60929 |
|
|
11/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
906 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60906 |
|
|
13/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
950 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60950 |
|
|
18/01/1950 |
|
BR |
E924 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60924 |
|
|
20/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
907 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60907 |
|
|
25/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
945 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60945 |
|
|
03/02/1950 |
|
LNER |
943 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60943 |
|
|
03/03/1950 |
|
BR |
E958 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60958 |
|
on |
08/03/1950 |
|
LNER |
803 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60803 |
|
|
09/03/1950 |
|
BR |
E983 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60983 |
|
|
10/03/1950 |
|
BR |
E937 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60937 |
|
on |
18/03/1950 |
|
BR |
E903 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60903 |
|
|
22/03/1950 |
|
BR |
E865 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60865 |
|
|
21/04/1950 |
|
BR |
E867 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60867 |
|
|
27/04/1950 |
|
LNER |
897 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60897 |
|
|
03/05/1950 |
|
LNER |
842 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60842 |
|
|
12/05/1950 |
|
LNER |
843 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60843 |
|
|
12/05/1950 |
|
BR |
E872 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60872 |
|
|
02/06/1950 |
|
LNER |
852 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60852 |
|
|
22/06/1950 |
|
LNER |
864 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60864 |
|
|
17/08/1950 |
|