Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 30 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5933 Week
» 26896 Month
» 63649 Year
» 574751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
V2 4771 13/06/1936 GREEN ARROW 13/06/1936   21/08/1962
V2 4780 31/08/1937 THE SNAPPER 11/09/1937   06/07/1964
V2 4806 23/09/1938 THE GREEN HOWARD 24/09/1938   19/10/1965
V2 4818 06/03/1939 ST. PETER'S SCHOOL 03/04/1939   29/06/1965
V2 4831 26/05/1939 DURHAM SCHOOL 15/06/1939   22/10/1962
V2 4843 22/04/1939 KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY 20/05/1939   22/09/1963
V2 4844 18/05/1939 COLDSTREAMER 20/06/1939   29/12/1962
V2 60964 26/01/1943 THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY 29/04/1958   08/05/1964