V2 |
4771
|
(700)
|
800
|
60800
|
|
13/06/1936 |
21/08/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
16/04/1959 |
V2 |
4772
|
701
|
801
|
60801
|
|
08/08/1936 |
01/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
23/06/1959 |
V2 |
4773
|
(702)
|
802
|
60802
|
|
03/10/1936 |
05/03/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
17/08/1961 |
V2 |
4774
|
(703)
|
803
|
60803
|
|
30/10/1936 |
16/06/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
19/08/1961 |
V2 |
4775
|
(704)
|
804
|
60804
|
804
|
28/11/1936 |
05/12/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
18/05/1962 |
V2 |
4776
|
(705)
|
805
|
60805
|
|
16/07/1937 |
23/12/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
10/02/1959 |
V2 |
4777
|
(706)
|
806
|
60806
|
|
06/08/1937 |
04/09/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
27/11/1961 |
V2 |
4778
|
(707)
|
807
|
60807
|
|
24/08/1937 |
19/11/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
06/03/1959 |
V2 |
4779
|
(708)
|
808
|
60808
|
|
09/09/1937 |
05/10/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
30/09/1961 |
V2 |
4780
|
709
|
809
|
60809
|
|
31/08/1937 |
06/07/1964 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
16/01/1962 |
V2 |
4781
|
710
|
810
|
60810
|
810
|
03/09/1937 |
21/11/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
26/10/1962 |
V2 |
4782
|
711
|
811
|
60811
|
|
10/09/1937 |
23/04/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
04/02/1959 |
V2 |
4783
|
(712)
|
812
|
60812
|
|
18/09/1937 |
09/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
19/01/1962 |
V2 |
4784
|
(713)
|
813
|
60813
|
|
27/09/1937 |
26/09/1966 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
17/11/1960 |
V2 |
4785
|
714
|
814
|
60814
|
|
08/10/1937 |
19/04/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
28/09/1961 |
V2 |
4787
|
(716)
|
816
|
60816
|
|
26/10/1937 |
22/10/1965 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
08/06/1961 |
V2 |
4788
|
(717)
|
817
|
60817
|
|
01/11/1937 |
16/06/1963 |
Double Chimney fitted |
09/03/1960 |
V2 |
4789
|
718
|
818
|
60818
|
|
08/11/1937 |
22/08/1966 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
29/04/1959 |
V2 |
4790
|
719
|
819
|
60819
|
819
|
15/11/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
Modified pony truck |
29/12/1951 |
V2 |
4791
|
720
|
820
|
60820
|
|
23/11/1937 |
20/06/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
20/03/1959 |
V2 |
4792
|
721
|
821
|
60821
|
|
03/12/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
03/05/1960 |
V2 |
4793
|
722
|
822
|
60822
|
|
09/12/1937 |
07/12/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
07/02/1962 |
V2 |
4794
|
(723)
|
823
|
60823
|
823
|
21/12/1937 |
26/03/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
20/05/1961 |
V2 |
4795
|
(724)
|
824
|
60824
|
|
22/12/1937 |
26/09/1966 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
08/02/1961 |
V2 |
4796
|
(725)
|
825
|
60825
|
|
06/01/1938 |
27/04/1964 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
12/07/1960 |
V2 |
4797
|
(726)
|
826
|
60826
|
|
12/01/1938 |
12/04/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
29/06/1959 |
V2 |
4798
|
(727)
|
827
|
60827
|
|
18/01/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
20/10/1960 |
V2 |
4799
|
(728)
|
828
|
60828
|
|
28/03/1938 |
04/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
20/10/1962 |
V2 |
4800
|
729
|
829
|
60829
|
|
01/04/1938 |
31/05/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
18/02/1959 |
V2 |
4801
|
(730)
|
830
|
60830
|
|
13/04/1938 |
16/06/1963 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
29/05/1959 |
V2 |
4802
|
(731)
|
831
|
60831
|
|
30/05/1938 |
06/12/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
11/01/1962 |
V2 |
4803
|
(732)
|
832
|
60832
|
|
22/07/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
20/03/1959 |
V2 |
4804
|
733
|
833
|
60833
|
|
31/08/1938 |
25/05/1964 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
14/04/1961 |
V2 |
4806
|
(735)
|
835
|
60835
|
|
23/09/1938 |
19/10/1965 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
03/03/1962 |
V2 |
4807
|
(736)
|
836
|
60836
|
|
23/09/1938 |
31/12/1966 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
06/10/1960 |
V2 |
4808
|
(737)
|
837
|
60837
|
|
05/10/1938 |
16/11/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
21/02/1961 |
V2 |
4809
|
(738)
|
838
|
60838
|
|
11/10/1938 |
23/01/1964 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
19/05/1961 |
V2 |
4810
|
(739)
|
839
|
60839
|
|
19/10/1938 |
22/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
04/02/1959 |
V2 |
4811
|
(740)
|
840
|
60840
|
|
28/10/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
14/01/1961 |
V2 |
4812
|
(741)
|
841
|
60841
|
|
18/11/1938 |
22/09/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
15/08/1959 |
V2 |
4813
|
(742)
|
842
|
60842
|
|
09/12/1938 |
22/10/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
26/08/1960 |
V2 |
4814
|
(743)
|
843
|
60843
|
|
30/12/1938 |
04/10/1965 |
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
24/09/1959 |
V2 |
4815
|
(744)
|
844
|
60844
|
|
03/02/1939 |
08/11/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
02/05/1962 |
V2 |
4816
|
(745)
|
845
|
60845
|
|
22/02/1939 |
23/09/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
03/07/1959 |
V2 |
4817
|
(746)
|
846
|
60846
|
|
17/02/1939 |
19/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
10/05/1962 |
V2 |
4818
|
(747)
|
847
|
60847
|
|
06/03/1939 |
29/06/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
11/11/1961 |
V2 |
4819
|
(748)
|
848
|
60848
|
|
03/03/1939 |
16/07/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
12/03/1959 |
V2 |
4820
|
(749)
|
849
|
60849
|
|
10/03/1939 |
12/04/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
21/04/1959 |
V2 |
4821
|
750
|
850
|
60850
|
|
17/03/1939 |
26/02/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
19/02/1959 |
V2 |
4822
|
(751)
|
851
|
60851
|
851
|
24/03/1939 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
18/08/1960 |
V2 |
4823
|
(752)
|
852
|
60852
|
|
31/03/1939 |
22/09/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
21/10/1961 |
V2 |
4824
|
(753)
|
853
|
60853
|
|
11/04/1939 |
22/09/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
08/05/1959 |
V2 |
4825
|
(754)
|
854
|
60854
|
|
19/04/1939 |
16/06/1963 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
16/04/1959 |
V2 |
4826
|
(755)
|
855
|
60855
|
|
21/04/1939 |
13/04/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
25/04/1962 |
V2 |
4827
|
(756)
|
856
|
60856
|
|
02/05/1939 |
25/05/1964 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
24/02/1959 |
V2 |
4828
|
(757)
|
857
|
60857
|
|
10/05/1939 |
17/04/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
21/10/1959 |
V2 |
4829
|
(758)
|
858
|
60858
|
|
16/05/1939 |
06/10/1963 |
Double Chimney fitted |
14/10/1961 |
V2 |
4830
|
(759)
|
859
|
60859
|
|
18/05/1939 |
20/09/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
28/10/1961 |
V2 |
4831
|
(760)
|
860
|
60860
|
860
|
26/05/1939 |
22/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
19/02/1959 |
V2 |
4832
|
(761)
|
861
|
60861
|
|
06/06/1939 |
12/08/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
10/03/1959 |
V2 |
4833
|
762
|
862
|
60862
|
862
|
13/06/1939 |
16/06/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
07/10/1961 |
V2 |
4834
|
(763)
|
863
|
60863
|
|
19/06/1939 |
28/04/1962 |
Modified pony truck |
21/05/1947 |
V2 |
4835
|
(764)
|
864
|
60864
|
|
26/06/1939 |
16/03/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
24/11/1961 |
V2 |
4836
|
(765)
|
865
|
60865
|
865
|
29/06/1939 |
14/06/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
07/06/1962 |
V2 |
4837
|
(766)
|
866
|
60866
|
|
06/07/1939 |
29/12/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
15/10/1960 |
V2 |
4838
|
(767)
|
867
|
60867
|
867
|
20/07/1939 |
01/05/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
17/03/1959 |
V2 |
4839
|
(768)
|
868
|
60868
|
|
31/07/1939 |
26/09/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
27/09/1962 |
V2 |
4840
|
(769)
|
869
|
60869
|
|
10/08/1939 |
16/06/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
14/07/1961 |
V2 |
4841
|
(770)
|
870
|
60870
|
|
12/08/1939 |
16/07/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
23/09/1959 |
V2 |
4842
|
771
|
871
|
60871
|
|
01/09/1939 |
22/09/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
01/08/1959 |
V2 |
4843
|
(772)
|
872
|
60872
|
872
|
22/04/1939 |
22/09/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
11/06/1959 |
V2 |
4844
|
(773)
|
873
|
60873
|
873
|
18/05/1939 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
30/12/1961 |
V2 |
4845
|
(774)
|
874
|
60874
|
|
27/06/1939 |
22/08/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
17/09/1959 |
V2 |
4846
|
(775)
|
875
|
60875
|
875
|
28/07/1939 |
05/03/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
22/05/1959 |
V2 |
4847
|
(776)
|
876
|
60876
|
|
30/05/1940 |
19/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
17/08/1962 |
V2 |
4848
|
(777)
|
877
|
60877
|
|
26/06/1940 |
13/02/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
28/10/1961 |
V2 |
4849
|
(778)
|
878
|
60878
|
|
12/07/1940 |
22/10/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
11/12/1959 |
V2 |
4850
|
(779)
|
879
|
60879
|
|
06/08/1940 |
03/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
13/01/1961 |
V2 |
4851
|
(780)
|
880
|
60880
|
|
04/09/1940 |
22/09/1963 |
Double blastpipe fitted |
10/08/1961 |
V2 |
4852
|
(781)
|
881
|
60881
|
|
12/10/1940 |
16/06/1963 |
Double blastpipe fitted |
08/10/1960 |
V2 |
4853
|
(782)
|
882
|
60882
|
|
07/10/1939 |
13/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
30/03/1962 |
V2 |
4854
|
(783)
|
883
|
60883
|
|
20/10/1939 |
24/02/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
23/09/1961 |
V2 |
4855
|
(784)
|
884
|
60884
|
|
27/10/1939 |
06/09/1965 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
11/02/1959 |
V2 |
4856
|
(785)
|
885
|
60885
|
|
10/11/1939 |
06/09/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
13/04/1962 |
V2 |
4857
|
(786)
|
886
|
60886
|
|
18/11/1939 |
10/04/1966 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
27/02/1959 |
V2 |
4858
|
(787)
|
887
|
60887
|
887
|
30/11/1939 |
06/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
29/09/1961 |
V2 |
4859
|
(788)
|
888
|
60888
|
|
07/12/1939 |
29/12/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
05/11/1960 |
V2 |
4860
|
(789)
|
889
|
60889
|
889
|
17/12/1939 |
11/06/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
04/03/1961 |
V2 |
4862
|
(791)
|
891
|
60891
|
891
|
29/12/1939 |
12/10/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
17/11/1961 |
V2 |
4863
|
(792)
|
892
|
60892
|
|
11/01/1940 |
21/11/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
23/03/1961 |
V2 |
4864
|
(793)
|
893
|
60893
|
893
|
20/01/1940 |
23/09/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
19/05/1960 |
V2 |
4865
|
(794)
|
894
|
60894
|
|
20/01/1940 |
29/12/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
05/04/1961 |
V2 |
4866
|
795
|
895
|
60895
|
|
26/01/1940 |
04/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
19/06/1962 |
V2 |
4867
|
(796)
|
896
|
60896
|
|
03/02/1940 |
23/09/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
08/10/1959 |
V2 |
4868
|
(797)
|
897
|
60897
|
|
10/02/1940 |
11/06/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
22/04/1959 |
V2 |
4869
|
(798)
|
898
|
60898
|
|
22/02/1940 |
28/11/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
02/02/1962 |
V2 |
4870
|
799
|
899
|
60899
|
|
23/02/1940 |
22/09/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
12/08/1961 |
V2 |
4871
|
(800)
|
900
|
60900
|
|
02/03/1940 |
11/04/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
17/06/1961 |
V2 |
4872
|
(801)
|
901
|
60901
|
|
09/03/1940 |
14/06/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
10/04/1962 |
V2 |
4873
|
(802)
|
902
|
60902
|
|
15/03/1940 |
22/09/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
13/10/1961 |
V2 |
4874
|
(803)
|
903
|
60903
|
903
|
20/03/1940 |
10/02/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
17/08/1961 |
V2 |
4875
|
(804)
|
904
|
60904
|
|
03/04/1940 |
09/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
20/10/1961 |
V2 |
4876
|
805
|
905
|
60905
|
|
10/04/1940 |
22/09/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
15/10/1959 |
V2 |
4877
|
(806)
|
906
|
60906
|
|
17/04/1940 |
28/05/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
31/12/1960 |
V2 |
4878
|
(807)
|
907
|
60907
|
|
19/04/1940 |
28/05/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
25/02/1959 |
V2 |
4879
|
(808)
|
908
|
60908
|
|
29/04/1940 |
04/06/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
02/09/1959 |
V2 |
4880
|
809
|
909
|
60909
|
|
04/05/1940 |
08/06/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
29/05/1959 |
V2 |
4881
|
(810)
|
910
|
60910
|
|
10/05/1940 |
15/04/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
13/01/1962 |
V2 |
4882
|
(811)
|
911
|
60911
|
|
15/05/1940 |
03/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
29/03/1960 |
V2 |
4883
|
(812)
|
912
|
60912
|
912
|
24/05/1940 |
29/04/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
25/10/1961 |
V2 |
4884
|
(813)
|
913
|
60913
|
|
06/06/1940 |
12/10/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
03/03/1962 |
V2 |
4885
|
(814)
|
914
|
60914
|
|
14/06/1940 |
23/09/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
10/03/1959 |
V2 |
4887
|
(816)
|
916
|
60916
|
|
24/07/1940 |
26/06/1964 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
12/06/1959 |
V2 |
4888
|
(817)
|
917
|
60917
|
|
10/08/1940 |
13/04/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
03/07/1959 |
V2 |
4889
|
(818)
|
918
|
60918
|
|
28/08/1941 |
08/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
11/03/1959 |
V2 |
4890
|
(819)
|
919
|
60919
|
|
07/09/1941 |
02/09/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
13/01/1961 |
V2 |
4891
|
(820)
|
920
|
60920
|
|
04/10/1941 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
06/11/1959 |
V2 |
4892
|
(821)
|
921
|
60921
|
|
16/10/1941 |
11/06/1963 |
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
12/07/1958 |
V2 |
4893
|
(822)
|
922
|
60922
|
|
31/10/1941 |
09/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
28/12/1961 |
V2 |
4894
|
(823)
|
923
|
60923
|
|
15/11/1941 |
04/10/1965 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
19/03/1959 |
V2 |
4895
|
(824)
|
924
|
60924
|
924
|
22/11/1941 |
22/09/1963 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
01/02/1961 |
V2 |
4896
|
(825)
|
925
|
60925
|
|
04/12/1941 |
25/05/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
23/09/1961 |
V2 |
4897
|
(826)
|
926
|
60926
|
|
17/12/1941 |
01/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
24/04/1959 |
V2 |
4898
|
(827)
|
927
|
60927
|
|
20/12/1941 |
03/12/1962 |
Steam |
15/02/1947 |
V2 |
3655
|
(828)
|
928
|
60928
|
|
24/06/1941 |
05/03/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
08/04/1959 |
V2 |
3656
|
(829)
|
929
|
60929
|
|
25/06/1941 |
21/06/1965 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
19/11/1960 |
V2 |
3657
|
(830)
|
930
|
60930
|
|
26/07/1941 |
23/09/1962 |
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
18/06/1958 |
V2 |
3658
|
(831)
|
931
|
60931
|
|
23/08/1941 |
03/09/1965 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
25/11/1959 |
V2 |
3659
|
(832)
|
932
|
60932
|
|
22/10/1941 |
25/05/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
02/03/1961 |
V2 |
3660
|
(833)
|
933
|
60933
|
|
23/10/1941 |
29/12/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
18/02/1961 |
V2 |
3661
|
(834)
|
934
|
60934
|
|
07/01/1942 |
22/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
07/04/1959 |
V2 |
3662
|
(835)
|
935
|
60935
|
|
17/02/1942 |
07/06/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
02/09/1961 |
V2 |
3663
|
(836)
|
936
|
60936
|
|
03/03/1942 |
23/09/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
12/03/1960 |
V2 |
3664
|
(837)
|
937
|
60937
|
937
|
09/03/1942 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
08/09/1960 |
V2 |
4899
|
(838)
|
938
|
60938
|
|
29/01/1942 |
01/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
10/07/1959 |
V2 |
3641
|
(839)
|
939
|
60939
|
|
12/02/1942 |
12/10/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
09/12/1961 |
V2 |
3642
|
(840)
|
940
|
60940
|
|
21/02/1942 |
11/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
06/11/1962 |
V2 |
3643
|
(841)
|
941
|
60941
|
|
04/03/1942 |
06/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
27/05/1961 |
V2 |
3644
|
(842)
|
942
|
60942
|
|
13/03/1942 |
25/05/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
08/07/1961 |
V2 |
3645
|
(843)
|
943
|
60943
|
|
26/03/1942 |
23/09/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
24/09/1960 |
V2 |
3646
|
(844)
|
944
|
60944
|
|
17/04/1942 |
20/09/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
04/07/1962 |
V2 |
3647
|
(845)
|
945
|
60945
|
|
15/05/1942 |
06/07/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
29/04/1961 |
V2 |
3648
|
(846)
|
946
|
60946
|
|
21/05/1942 |
11/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
02/09/1961 |
V2 |
3649
|
(847)
|
947
|
60947
|
|
03/06/1942 |
01/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
08/04/1959 |
V2 |
3650
|
(848)
|
948
|
60948
|
|
11/06/1942 |
22/09/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
22/12/1961 |
V2 |
3651
|
(849)
|
949
|
60949
|
|
18/06/1942 |
26/11/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
04/03/1961 |
V2 |
3652
|
(850)
|
950
|
60950
|
|
26/06/1942 |
22/09/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
09/12/1961 |
V2 |
3653
|
(851)
|
951
|
60951
|
|
07/07/1942 |
29/12/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
18/05/1961 |
V2 |
3654
|
(852)
|
952
|
60952
|
|
18/07/1942 |
11/10/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
25/11/1961 |
V2 |
3665
|
(853)
|
953
|
60953
|
|
26/08/1942 |
28/05/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
20/04/1959 |
V2 |
3666
|
(854)
|
954
|
60954
|
|
05/09/1942 |
18/11/1963 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
15/04/1959 |
V2 |
3667
|
(855)
|
955
|
60955
|
|
22/09/1942 |
26/09/1966 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
11/02/1960 |
V2 |
3668
|
(856)
|
956
|
60956
|
|
30/09/1942 |
23/09/1962 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
18/09/1959 |
V2 |
3669
|
(857)
|
957
|
60957
|
957
|
07/10/1942 |
17/12/1964 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
06/05/1959 |
V2 |
3670
|
(858)
|
958
|
60958
|
958
|
15/10/1942 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
31/12/1959 |
V2 |
3671
|
(859)
|
959
|
60959
|
|
02/11/1942 |
01/07/1963 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
09/07/1959 |
V2 |
3672
|
(860)
|
960
|
60960
|
|
11/11/1942 |
26/02/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
08/11/1961 |
V2 |
3673
|
(861)
|
961
|
60961
|
|
02/12/1942 |
05/04/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
18/09/1962 |
V2 |
3674
|
(862)
|
962
|
60962
|
|
23/12/1942 |
20/09/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
07/09/1962 |
V2 |
3675
|
(863)
|
963
|
60963
|
|
12/01/1943 |
29/06/1965 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
11/10/1962 |
V2 |
3676
|
(864)
|
964
|
60964
|
964
|
26/01/1943 |
08/05/1964 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
15/01/1960 |
V2 |
3677
|
(865)
|
965
|
60965
|
|
25/02/1943 |
29/12/1962 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
16/09/1961 |
V2 |
3678
|
(866)
|
966
|
60966
|
|
15/03/1943 |
11/06/1963 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
11/11/1960 |
V2 |
3679
|
(867)
|
967
|
60967
|
|
26/03/1943 |
10/02/1964 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
18/03/1959 |
V2 |
3680
|
(868)
|
968
|
60968
|
|
15/04/1943 |
20/05/1963 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
28/04/1961 |
V2 |
3681
|
(869)
|
969
|
60969
|
|
29/04/1943 |
18/05/1964 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
24/06/1960 |
V2 |
3682
|
(870)
|
970
|
60970
|
|
12/05/1943 |
07/02/1966 |
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
12/04/1960 |
V2 |
3683
|
871
|
971
|
60971
|
|
02/06/1943 |
29/12/1962 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
12/05/1959 |
V2 |
3684
|
(872)
|
972
|
60972
|
|
01/07/1943 |
28/11/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
27/05/1961 |
V2 |
3685
|
(873)
|
973
|
60973
|
|
27/04/1943 |
24/01/1966 |
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
14/08/1959 |
V2 |
3686
|
(874)
|
974
|
60974
|
|
19/08/1943 |
09/12/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
30/06/1961 |
V2 |
3687
|
(875)
|
975
|
60975
|
|
20/09/1943 |
25/05/1964 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
25/03/1959 |
V2 |
3688
|
(876)
|
976
|
60976
|
|
07/10/1943 |
26/09/1966 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
18/05/1962 |
V2 |
3689
|
(877)
|
977
|
60977
|
|
27/10/1943 |
26/02/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
21/04/1959 |
V2 |
3690
|
(878)
|
978
|
60978
|
|
09/12/1943 |
19/11/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
05/03/1959 |
V2 |
3691
|
(879)
|
979
|
60979
|
|
20/01/1944 |
01/10/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
16/03/1959 |
V2 |
3692
|
(880)
|
980
|
60980
|
|
10/03/1944 |
29/12/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
25/11/1960 |
V2 |
3693
|
(881)
|
981
|
60981
|
|
20/04/1944 |
15/04/1963 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
08/09/1962 |
V2 |
3694
|
(882)
|
982
|
60982
|
|
21/06/1944 |
05/10/1964 |
Smith speedometer fitted |
19/08/1961 |
V2 |
3695
|
(883)
|
983
|
60983
|
983
|
13/07/1944 |
23/09/1962 |
Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
18/05/1960 |