Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 322 Today
» 799 Yesterday
» 5387 Week
» 17165 Month
» 306557 Year
» 817659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2


V2 at Wakefield Kirkgate (22/07/1965)
Copyright: BarkingBill
V2 in lined green livery at St Margarets (Edinburgh) (16/07/1965)
Copyright: BarkingBill
V2 at York (24/07/1965)
Copyright: BarkingBill
Copyright: Gerald Robinson
 
V2 with inside steam pipes retained, seen at the ex Great Central shed at Leicester (18/05/1959)
Copyright: Gerald Robinson