Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 322 Today
» 799 Yesterday
» 5387 Week
» 17165 Month
» 306557 Year
» 817659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Wed 21/07/1954 60886,
60949
52B,
52A
  Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Under repair.
Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 11/02/1961 60807,
60835,
60837,
60931,
60954,
60959,
60977,
60981
52B,
52B,
50A,
64A,
50A,
64A,
50A,
50A
  Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
   
Sun 26/02/1961 60850,
60870,
60871,
60875,
60905,
60928
36A,
36A,
34A,
36A,
36A,
36A
  Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
   
Sat 11/11/1961 60806,
60856,
60859,
60864,
60891,
60916,
60923,
60939,
60948,
60952
51L,
50A,
51L,
50A,
52B,
51L,
52A,
50A,
31B,
52A
  Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Crossing.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Outside stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 60804,
60811,
60816,
60835,
60844,
60855,
60882,
60885,
60901,
60939,
60954,
60957,
60960,
60977
62B,
52B,
64A,
52B,
62B,
50A,
64A,
51L,
51L,
50A,
50A,
64A,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut.
SLS 5/1962  
Thu 29/04/1965 60877,
60886
50A,
50A
  An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station - hauling an Up express-passenger John Thickitt - station visit