LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13/06/1936 | To Service | 4771 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
08/08/1936 | To Service | 4772 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
03/10/1936 | To Service | 4773 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
30/10/1936 | To Service | 4774 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
28/11/1936 | To Service | 4775 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
16/07/1937 | To Service | 4776 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
06/08/1937 | To Service | 4777 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
24/08/1937 | To Service | 4778 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
31/08/1937 | To Service | 4780 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
03/09/1937 | To Service | 4781 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
09/09/1937 | To Service | 4779 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
10/09/1937 | To Service | 4782 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
18/09/1937 | To Service | 4783 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
27/09/1937 | To Service | 4784 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
08/10/1937 | To Service | 4785 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
20/10/1937 | To Service | 4786 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
26/10/1937 | To Service | 4787 | NEW | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
01/11/1937 | To Service | 4788 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
08/11/1937 | To Service | 4789 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
15/11/1937 | To Service | 4790 | NEW | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
23/11/1937 | To Service | 4791 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
03/12/1937 | To Service | 4792 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
09/12/1937 | To Service | 4793 | NEW | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
21/12/1937 | To Service | 4794 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
22/12/1937 | To Service | 4795 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
06/01/1938 | To Service | 4796 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
12/01/1938 | To Service | 4797 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
18/01/1938 | To Service | 4798 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
28/03/1938 | To Service | 4799 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
01/04/1938 | To Service | 4800 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
13/04/1938 | To Service | 4801 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
30/05/1938 | To Service | 4802 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
22/07/1938 | To Service | 4803 | NEW | STM | St Margarets | ||
31/08/1938 | To Service | 4804 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
06/09/1938 | Reallocation | 4799 | YK | York (North) | DON | Doncaster | |
09/09/1938 | To Service | 4805 | NEW | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
23/09/1938 | To Service | 4806 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
23/09/1938 | To Service | 4807 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
27/09/1938 | Reallocation | 4804 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
30/09/1938 | Reallocation | 4802 | HTN | Heaton | DON | Doncaster | |
01/10/1938 | Reallocation | 4798 | NWE | New England | GOR | Gorton | |
05/10/1938 | To Service | 4808 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
11/10/1938 | To Service | 4809 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
19/10/1938 | To Service | 4810 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
26/10/1938 | Reallocation | 4800 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | NWE | New England | |
28/10/1938 | To Service | 4811 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
03/11/1938 | Reallocation | 4803 | STM | St Margarets | KX | Kings Cross | |
18/11/1938 | To Service | 4812 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
09/12/1938 | To Service | 4813 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
30/12/1938 | To Service | 4814 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
03/02/1939 | To Service | 4815 | NEW | STM | St Margarets | ||
17/02/1939 | To Service | 4817 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
22/02/1939 | To Service | 4816 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
03/03/1939 | To Service | 4819 | NEW | STM | St Margarets | ||
06/03/1939 | To Service | 4818 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
07/03/1939 | Reallocation | 4803 | KX | Kings Cross | GRA | Grantham | |
10/03/1939 | To Service | 4820 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
17/03/1939 | To Service | 4821 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
24/03/1939 | To Service | 4822 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
31/03/1939 | To Service | 4823 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
01/04/1939 | Reallocation | 4822 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
11/04/1939 | To Service | 4824 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
19/04/1939 | To Service | 4825 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
21/04/1939 | To Service | 4826 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
22/04/1939 | To Service | 4843 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
02/05/1939 | To Service | 4827 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
10/05/1939 | To Service | 4828 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
16/05/1939 | To Service | 4829 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
18/05/1939 | To Service | 4830 | NEW | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
18/05/1939 | To Service | 4844 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
26/05/1939 | To Service | 4831 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
06/06/1939 | To Service | 4832 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
13/06/1939 | To Service | 4833 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
19/06/1939 | To Service | 4834 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
20/06/1939 | Reallocation | 4829 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
20/06/1939 | Reallocation | 4844 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
26/06/1939 | To Service | 4835 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
27/06/1939 | To Service | 4845 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
29/06/1939 | To Service | 4836 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
06/07/1939 | To Service | 4837 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
20/07/1939 | To Service | 4838 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
28/07/1939 | To Service | 4846 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
31/07/1939 | To Service | 4839 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
10/08/1939 | To Service | 4840 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
12/08/1939 | To Service | 4841 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
14/08/1939 | Reallocation | 4841 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
15/08/1939 | Reallocation | 4845 | DON | Doncaster | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
19/08/1939 | Reallocation | 4839 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
01/09/1939 | To Service | 4842 | NEW | GRA | Grantham | ||
11/09/1939 | Reallocation | 4842 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
30/09/1939 | Reallocation | 4831 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
07/10/1939 | To Service | 4853 | NEW | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
20/10/1939 | To Service | 4854 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
27/10/1939 | To Service | 4855 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
11/1939 | Reallocation | 4807 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | STM | St Margarets | |
11/1939 | Reallocation | 4853 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | STM | St Margarets | |
10/11/1939 | To Service | 4856 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
16/11/1939 | Reallocation | 4833 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
18/11/1939 | To Service | 4857 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
30/11/1939 | To Service | 4858 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
07/12/1939 | To Service | 4859 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
09/12/1939 | Reallocation | 4784 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
11/12/1939 | Reallocation | 4788 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
16/12/1939 | Reallocation | 4830 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | NEA | Neasden | |
16/12/1939 | Reallocation | 4845 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | NEA | Neasden | |
17/12/1939 | To Service | 4860 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
28/12/1939 | To Service | 4861 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
29/12/1939 | To Service | 4862 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
11/01/1940 | To Service | 4863 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
17/01/1940 | Reallocation | 4832 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
20/01/1940 | To Service | 4864 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
20/01/1940 | To Service | 4865 | NEW | STM | St Margarets | ||
26/01/1940 | Reallocation | 4798 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
26/01/1940 | Reallocation | 4828 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
26/01/1940 | To Service | 4866 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
03/02/1940 | To Service | 4867 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
10/02/1940 | To Service | 4868 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
22/02/1940 | To Service | 4869 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
23/02/1940 | To Service | 4870 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
03/1940 | Reallocation | 4787 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | STM | St Margarets | |
01/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4828 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
01/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4860 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
02/03/1940 | To Service | 4871 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
09/03/1940 | To Service | 4872 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
15/03/1940 | To Service | 4873 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4803 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 4841 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
20/03/1940 | To Service | 4874 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
03/04/1940 | To Service | 4875 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
10/04/1940 | To Service | 4876 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
17/04/1940 | To Service | 4877 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
19/04/1940 | To Service | 4878 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
29/04/1940 | To Service | 4879 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
04/05/1940 | To Service | 4880 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
10/05/1940 | To Service | 4881 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
15/05/1940 | To Service | 4882 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
24/05/1940 | To Service | 4883 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
30/05/1940 | To Service | 4847 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
06/06/1940 | To Service | 4884 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
14/06/1940 | To Service | 4885 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
15/06/1940 | To Service | 4886 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
26/06/1940 | To Service | 4848 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
12/07/1940 | To Service | 4849 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
18/07/1940 | Reallocation | 4821 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
18/07/1940 | Reallocation | 4826 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
24/07/1940 | To Service | 4887 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
02/08/1940 | Reallocation | 4816 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
06/08/1940 | To Service | 4850 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
10/08/1940 | To Service | 4888 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
17/08/1940 | Reallocation | 4888 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
04/09/1940 | To Service | 4851 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
12/10/1940 | To Service | 4852 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
03/11/1940 | Reallocation | 4812 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
03/11/1940 | Reallocation | 4877 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
11/02/1941 | Reallocation | 4820 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
11/02/1941 | Reallocation | 4852 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4787 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4807 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4815 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4819 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4853 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
05/1941 | Reallocation | 4865 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
24/06/1941 | To Service | 3655 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
25/06/1941 | To Service | 3656 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
26/07/1941 | Reallocation | 3656 | DON | Doncaster | YK | York (North) | |
26/07/1941 | To Service | 3657 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
23/08/1941 | To Service | 3658 | NEW | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
28/08/1941 | To Service | 4889 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
07/09/1941 | To Service | 4890 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
10/1941 | Reallocation | 4807 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
04/10/1941 | To Service | 4891 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
16/10/1941 | To Service | 4892 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
22/10/1941 | To Service | 3659 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
23/10/1941 | To Service | 3660 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
31/10/1941 | To Service | 4893 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
11/1941 | Reallocation | 4787 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
11/1941 | Reallocation | 4807 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | HAY | Haymarket | |
15/11/1941 | To Service | 4894 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
22/11/1941 | To Service | 4895 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
29/11/1941 | Reallocation | 4792 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/1941 | Reallocation | 3658 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | HAY | Haymarket | |
04/12/1941 | To Service | 4896 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
17/12/1941 | To Service | 4897 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
20/12/1941 | Reallocation | 4888 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
20/12/1941 | To Service | 4898 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
07/01/1942 | To Service | 3661 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
29/01/1942 | To Service | 4899 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
12/02/1942 | To Service | 3641 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
17/02/1942 | To Service | 3662 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
21/02/1942 | To Service | 3642 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
03/03/1942 | To Service | 3663 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
04/03/1942 | To Service | 3643 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
09/03/1942 | To Service | 3664 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
13/03/1942 | To Service | 3644 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
26/03/1942 | To Service | 3645 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
17/04/1942 | To Service | 3646 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
15/05/1942 | To Service | 3647 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
21/05/1942 | To Service | 3648 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
29/05/1942 | Reallocation | 4845 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
01/06/1942 | Reallocation | 4830 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
03/06/1942 | To Service | 3649 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
11/06/1942 | To Service | 3650 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
18/06/1942 | To Service | 3651 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
26/06/1942 | To Service | 3652 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
07/07/1942 | To Service | 3653 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
18/07/1942 | To Service | 3654 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
08/1942 | Reallocation | 4807 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
26/08/1942 | To Service | 3665 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
05/09/1942 | To Service | 3666 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
22/09/1942 | To Service | 3667 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
30/09/1942 | To Service | 3668 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
07/10/1942 | To Service | 3669 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
15/10/1942 | To Service | 3670 | NEW | STM | St Margarets | ||
23/10/1942 | Reallocation | 4805 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | STM | St Margarets | |
02/11/1942 | To Service | 3671 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
11/11/1942 | To Service | 3672 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4788 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4789 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4792 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4797 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4801 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4837 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4840 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4868 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4895 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
28/11/1942 | Reallocation | 4787 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | STM | St Margarets | |
12/1942 | Reallocation | 4807 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | STM | St Margarets | |
02/12/1942 | To Service | 3673 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
23/12/1942 | To Service | 3674 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
12/01/1943 | To Service | 3675 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
26/01/1943 | To Service | 3676 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 4874 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 4880 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 3647 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/02/1943 | To Service | 3677 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
15/03/1943 | To Service | 3678 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
26/03/1943 | To Service | 3679 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4772 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4773 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4776 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4777 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4778 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4779 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4780 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4781 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4782 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4783 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4804 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4806 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4831 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4839 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4854 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4855 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4856 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4857 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4858 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4859 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4862 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4866 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4869 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4881 | YK | York (North) | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4890 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 4894 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3642 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3646 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3651 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3675 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 3676 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4820 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4828 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4852 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4860 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/04/1943 | To Service | 3680 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
17/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4787 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
17/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4805 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
17/04/1943 | Reallocation | 4807 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
17/04/1943 | Reallocation | 3670 | STM | St Margarets | HAY | Haymarket | |
27/04/1943 | To Service | 3685 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
29/04/1943 | To Service | 3681 | NEW | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
02/05/1943 | Reallocation | 4819 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
12/05/1943 | To Service | 3682 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
02/06/1943 | To Service | 3683 | NEW | EFD | Eastfield | ||
07/1943 | Reallocation | 3685 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
01/07/1943 | To Service | 3684 | NEW | EFD | Eastfield | ||
19/07/1943 | Reallocation | 4830 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
19/07/1943 | Reallocation | 4845 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
19/08/1943 | To Service | 3686 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
20/09/1943 | To Service | 3687 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
10/1943 | Reallocation | 3684 | EFD | Eastfield | EFD | Eastfield | |
10/1943 | Reallocation | 3685 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
07/10/1943 | To Service | 3688 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
27/10/1943 | To Service | 3689 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4774 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4786 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4788 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4789 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4791 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
28/11/1943 | Reallocation | 4792 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
09/12/1943 | To Service | 3690 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 4815 | HAY | Haymarket | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
20/01/1944 | To Service | 3691 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
14/02/1944 | Reallocation | 4890 | GHD | Gateshead | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
01/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4800 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
09/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4795 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
10/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4813 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
10/03/1944 | To Service | 3692 | NEW | HAY | Haymarket | ||
11/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4797 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
11/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4801 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
11/03/1944 | Reallocation | 4816 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
20/04/1944 | To Service | 3693 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
24/04/1944 | Reallocation | 4890 | TWD | Tweedmouth | GHD | Gateshead | |
21/06/1944 | To Service | 3694 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
07/1944 | Reallocation | 4787 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
07/1944 | Reallocation | 3658 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/07/1944 | To Service | 3695 | NEW | DON | Doncaster | ||
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4787 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | HAY | Haymarket | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4797 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4819 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | HAY | Haymarket | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4845 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4879 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4887 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 4893 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 3655 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 3658 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | HAY | Haymarket | |
29/10/1944 | Reallocation | 3650 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
05/11/1944 | Reallocation | 3682 | HAY | Haymarket | EFD | Eastfield | |
11/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4800 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4837 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4876 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4886 | NWE | New England | KX | Kings Cross | |
24/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4835 | YK | York (North) | DAR | Darlington | |
24/11/1944 | Reallocation | 3675 | GHD | Gateshead | DAR | Darlington | |
25/11/1944 | Reallocation | 4799 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 4830 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 4861 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 3663 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 3652 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
22/01/1945 | Reallocation | 4816 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
22/01/1945 | Reallocation | 4824 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
22/01/1945 | Reallocation | 4832 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
22/01/1945 | Reallocation | 4848 | NWE | New England | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
22/01/1945 | Reallocation | 4885 | NWE | New England | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
25/03/1945 | Reallocation | 4888 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/03/1945 | Reallocation | 3695 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
11/04/1945 | Reallocation | 3685 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 4803 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
18/07/1945 | Reallocation | 3668 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
19/08/1945 | Reallocation | 4812 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
19/08/1945 | Reallocation | 4877 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/08/1945 | Reallocation | 3682 | EFD | Eastfield | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
20/08/1945 | Reallocation | 3683 | EFD | Eastfield | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
20/08/1945 | Reallocation | 3684 | EFD | Eastfield | HAY | Haymarket | |
26/08/1945 | Reallocation | 3668 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4795 | DON | Doncaster | STM | St Margarets | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4796 | DON | Doncaster | STM | St Margarets | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4798 | DON | Doncaster | STM | St Margarets | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4859 | GHD | Gateshead | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4869 | GHD | Gateshead | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4890 | GHD | Gateshead | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4891 | DON | Doncaster | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
13/10/1945 | Reallocation | 4898 | DON | Doncaster | HAY | Haymarket | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 4783 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 4866 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 3659 | GHD | Gateshead | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 3641 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 3649 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
26/11/1945 | Reallocation | 4851 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
17/02/1946 | Reallocation | 752 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
07/03/1946 | Reallocation | 752 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
18/04/1946 | Reallocation | 802 | DON | Doncaster | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 708 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 739 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 743 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 747 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 756 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 786 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 791 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/05/1946 | Reallocation | 857 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
09/05/1946 | Reallocation | 802 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 732 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 745 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 761 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 877 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 780 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
28/05/1946 | Reallocation | 814 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | DON | Doncaster | |
14/07/1946 | Reallocation | 790 | NWE | New England | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
22/09/1946 | Reallocation | 857 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
22/09/1946 | Reallocation | 890 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
29/09/1946 | Reallocation | 739 | NEV | Neville Hill | YK | York (North) | |
29/09/1946 | Reallocation | 843 | NEV | Neville Hill | YK | York (North) | |
29/09/1946 | Reallocation | 747 | NEV | Neville Hill | YK | York (North) | |
29/09/1946 | Reallocation | 756 | NEV | Neville Hill | YK | York (North) | |
06/10/1946 | Reallocation | 983 | GOR | Gorton | KX | Kings Cross | |
10/10/1946 | Reallocation | 822 | GOR | Gorton | KX | Kings Cross | |
13/10/1946 | Reallocation | 702 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
13/10/1946 | Reallocation | 844 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
13/10/1946 | Reallocation | 949 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
13/10/1946 | Reallocation | 866 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
23/10/1946 | Reallocation | 828 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
23/10/1946 | Reallocation | 874 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 741 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 742 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 763 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 811 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 835 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 838 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
24/10/1946 | Reallocation | 843 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 703 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 766 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 905 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 845 | KX | Kings Cross | NWE | New England | |
11/11/1946 | Reallocation | 715 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
11/11/1946 | Reallocation | 814 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
14/11/1946 | Reallocation | 908 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
14/11/1946 | Reallocation | 816 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
27/01/1947 | Reallocation | 824 | STM | St Margarets | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
27/01/1947 | Reallocation | 825 | STM | St Margarets | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
27/01/1947 | Reallocation | 827 | STM | St Margarets | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
02/02/1947 | Reallocation | 943 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1947 | Reallocation | 935 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
27/03/1947 | Reallocation | 849 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 948 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
22/04/1947 | Reallocation | 845 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
23/04/1947 | Reallocation | 928 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
26/04/1947 | Reallocation | 917 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 881 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 889 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | DON | Doncaster | |
05/06/1947 | Reallocation | 826 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
08/03/1948 | Reallocation | 955 | HAY | Haymarket | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 955 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 924 | NWE | New England | 32A | Inverness | |
07/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60817 | KX | Kings Cross | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60818 | KX | Kings Cross | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60820 | KX | Kings Cross | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60817 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60818 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 60820 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
12/12/1948 | Reallocation | 864 | DAR | Darlington | YK | York (North) | |
12/12/1948 | Reallocation | 958 | HAY | Haymarket | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
16/12/1948 | Reallocation | 853 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 853 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 864 | YK | York (North) | YK | York (North) | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 958 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/12/1948 | Reallocation | 963 | DAR | Darlington | YK | York (North) | |
01/01/1949 | Reallocation | 963 | YK | York (North) | YK | York (North) | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60801 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60805 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60806 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60807 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60809 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60810 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60811 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60833 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60835 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60860 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60868 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60887 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60910 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60952 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60801 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60805 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60806 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60807 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60809 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60810 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60811 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60833 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60835 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60860 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60868 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60887 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60910 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60952 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
13/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | HTN | Heaton | 64A | St Margarets | |
19/02/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
06/03/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | STM | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 60959 | 64B | Haymarket | HAY | Haymarket | |
19/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60830 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
19/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60831 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
19/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60832 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60830 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60831 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60832 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
26/06/1949 | Reallocation | 60826 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
02/07/1949 | Reallocation | 60826 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/09/1949 | Reallocation | 60836 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
25/09/1949 | Reallocation | 60953 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 60953 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
20/11/1949 | Reallocation | 60825 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
26/11/1949 | Reallocation | 60825 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
11/12/1949 | Reallocation | 60848 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/12/1949 | Reallocation | 60894 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 60848 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 60894 | 64A | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60931 | HAY | Haymarket | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60980 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60980 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60906 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
22/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60921 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60906 | NWE | New England | NWE | New England | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60921 | DON | Doncaster | DON | Doncaster | |
29/01/1950 | Reallocation | 60966 | HTN | Heaton | NWE | New England | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 60945 | NWE | New England | 52B | Heaton | |
19/03/1950 | Reallocation | 60829 | KX | Kings Cross | 35A | New England | |
19/03/1950 | Reallocation | 60862 | NWE | New England | 34A | Kings Cross | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 60829 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 60862 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34A | Kings Cross | |
09/04/1950 | Reallocation | 60815 | DON | Doncaster | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
09/04/1950 | Reallocation | 60845 | DON | Doncaster | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
05/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60822 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
12/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60834 | HAY | Haymarket | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
19/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60884 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
19/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60885 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
19/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60926 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
19/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60942 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60822 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60834 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60884 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60926 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
14/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60836 | STM | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
14/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60894 | STM | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
14/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60972 | HAY | Haymarket | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
14/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60980 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60818 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 34A | Kings Cross | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60820 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60871 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60915 | KX | Kings Cross | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60818 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34A | Kings Cross | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60820 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60894 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60915 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60972 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 60980 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
11/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60832 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
11/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60859 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60813 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60823 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60892 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 60922 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
04/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
04/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60863 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
04/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
05/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
10/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60882 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60894 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60980 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60813 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60823 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60863 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60882 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60892 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60894 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60922 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 60980 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
15/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60873 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60873 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60821 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60821 | 64A | St Margarets | 91X | To Scottish Region | |
29/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60884 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
29/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
29/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60886 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
29/04/1951 | Reallocation | 60887 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 60884 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 60821 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 64A | St Margarets | |
03/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60814 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
05/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60814 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
09/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60814 | 64A | St Margarets | 91X | To Scottish Region | |
10/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60815 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60890 | DON | Doncaster | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60815 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60890 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
24/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | 35A | New England | 31B | March | |
24/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60830 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
24/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60865 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
24/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60879 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
24/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60913 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60830 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60865 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60879 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 60913 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60802 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60809 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60810 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60860 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60944 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60949 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60802 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60809 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60810 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60944 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 60949 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60845 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60853 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60878 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60966 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60853 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60876 | NWE | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60966 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60810 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60846 | DON | Doncaster | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60861 | DON | Doncaster | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60944 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60810 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60846 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60861 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 60944 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
14/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | 31B | March | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60865 | 31B | March | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60913 | 31B | March | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60826 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60865 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 60913 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
06/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
06/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
06/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
05/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | To Western Region / GWR | |
18/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60803 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
18/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60830 | 35A | New England | 31B | March | |
18/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60858 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
18/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60899 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
18/05/1952 | Reallocation | 60938 | NWE | New England | 31B | March | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 60803 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 60830 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 60858 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 60899 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 60938 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60868 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60901 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60907 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60929 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60945 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60947 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60952 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60957 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60868 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60901 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60907 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60929 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60945 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60947 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60952 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 60957 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
10/08/1952 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
14/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
14/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60901 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
14/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60907 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
14/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60929 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60901 | 50A | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60907 | 50A | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60929 | 50A | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
19/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60840 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/10/1952 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | To Western Region / GWR | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60840 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60801 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60806 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60811 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60835 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60926 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60933 | YK | York (North) | 64A | St Margarets | |
30/11/1952 | Reallocation | 60965 | GHD | Gateshead | 64A | St Margarets | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 60801 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 60806 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 60811 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 60835 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 60926 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
25/01/1953 | Reallocation | 60814 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 34A | Kings Cross | |
25/01/1953 | Reallocation | 60818 | 34A | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
25/01/1953 | Reallocation | 60821 | 64A | St Margarets | 34A | Kings Cross | |
25/01/1953 | Reallocation | 60900 | KX | Kings Cross | 64A | St Margarets | |
08/02/1953 | Reallocation | 60820 | 35A | New England | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
08/02/1953 | Reallocation | 60966 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 35A | New England | |
01/03/1953 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/03/1953 | Reallocation | 60831 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/03/1953 | Reallocation | 60890 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
05/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60806 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60807 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60808 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60811 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60835 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
12/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
26/04/1953 | Reallocation | 60890 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60893 | NWE | New England | 35A | Nine Elms | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60896 | DON | Doncaster | 36A | Nine Elms | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60908 | NWE | New England | 35A | Nine Elms | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60916 | NWE | New England | 35A | Nine Elms | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60917 | DON | Doncaster | 36A | Nine Elms | |
14/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60928 | DON | Doncaster | 36A | Nine Elms | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60800 | KX | Kings Cross | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60803 | 31B | March | 35A | New England | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60820 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60831 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 34A | Kings Cross | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60863 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60902 | DON | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60909 | KX | Kings Cross | 36A | Doncaster | |
17/05/1953 | Reallocation | 60938 | 31B | March | 36A | Doncaster | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60801 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60807 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60846 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60861 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60800 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 34A | Kings Cross | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60803 | 35A | New England | 31B | March | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60831 | 34A | Kings Cross | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60893 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60896 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60908 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60916 | 35A | New England | 35A | New England | |
28/06/1953 | Reallocation | 60917 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
09/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60928 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
12/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60902 | 34A | Kings Cross | 36A | Doncaster | |
12/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60909 | 36A | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
19/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60895 | HTN | Heaton | 51A | Darlington | |
19/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60981 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
19/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60982 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
26/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60938 | 36A | Doncaster | 31B | March | |
29/07/1953 | Reallocation | 60895 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
30/08/1953 | Reallocation | 60876 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 37A | Ardsley | |
30/08/1953 | Reallocation | 60896 | 36A | Doncaster | 37A | Ardsley | |
30/08/1953 | Reallocation | 60902 | 36A | Doncaster | 37A | Ardsley | |
30/08/1953 | Reallocation | 60948 | DON | Doncaster | 31B | March | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 60876 | 37A | Ardsley | 35A | New England | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 60896 | 37A | Ardsley | 36A | Doncaster | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 60902 | 37A | Ardsley | 36A | Doncaster | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 60981 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 60982 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
18/10/1953 | Reallocation | 60826 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
01/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60855 | NWE | New England | 34A | Kings Cross | |
01/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60876 | 35A | New England | 34A | Kings Cross | |
15/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60801 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60945 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/11/1953 | Reallocation | 60952 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
27/12/1953 | Reallocation | 60805 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
03/01/1954 | Reallocation | 60859 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
28/02/1954 | Reallocation | 60878 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
20/06/1954 | Reallocation | 60828 | NWE | New England | 34A | Kings Cross | |
03/04/1955 | Reallocation | 60826 | 37A | Ardsley | 35A | New England | |
03/04/1955 | Reallocation | 60916 | 35A | New England | 37A | Ardsley | |
03/05/1955 | Reallocation | 60801 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
08/05/1955 | Reallocation | 60884 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
29/05/1955 | Reallocation | 60833 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/05/1955 | Reallocation | 60837 | YK | York (North) | 50A | York (North) | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60837 | 50A | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60881 | DON | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60941 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60943 | DON | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60946 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
26/06/1955 | Reallocation | 60982 | 50A | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
03/07/1955 | Reallocation | 60902 | 36A | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
03/07/1955 | Reallocation | 60909 | 34A | Kings Cross | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/07/1955 | Reallocation | 60828 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
10/07/1955 | Reallocation | 60855 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
28/08/1955 | Reallocation | 60841 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
28/08/1955 | Reallocation | 60867 | DON | Doncaster | 35A | New England | |
18/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35A | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
18/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60966 | 35A | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60941 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60946 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 60982 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
02/10/1955 | Reallocation | 60828 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
02/10/1955 | Reallocation | 60855 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
09/10/1955 | Reallocation | 60815 | 36A | Doncaster | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
09/10/1955 | Reallocation | 60871 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/10/1955 | Reallocation | 60881 | 34A | Kings Cross | 36A | Doncaster | |
27/11/1955 | Reallocation | 60875 | DON | Doncaster | 35A | New England | |
27/11/1955 | Reallocation | 60905 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/12/1955 | Reallocation | 60804 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
02/01/1956 | Reallocation | 60804 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
02/01/1956 | Reallocation | 60972 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
15/04/1956 | Reallocation | 60802 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/04/1956 | Reallocation | 60809 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/04/1956 | Reallocation | 60883 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
15/04/1956 | Reallocation | 60957 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
06/05/1956 | Reallocation | 60883 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60820 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 34A | Kings Cross | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60877 | DON | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60901 | 50A | York (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60962 | YK | York (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60978 | YK | York (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
10/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60979 | YK | York (North) | 52B | Heaton | |
24/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60820 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
24/06/1956 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
29/07/1956 | Reallocation | 60821 | 34A | Kings Cross | 35A | New England | |
29/07/1956 | Reallocation | 60950 | NWE | New England | 34A | Kings Cross | |
05/08/1956 | Reallocation | 60871 | 36A | Doncaster | 34A | Kings Cross | |
09/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60848 | STM | St Margarets | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60883 | 52A | Gateshead | 64A | St Margarets | |
09/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60922 | 64A | St Margarets | 52B | Heaton | |
09/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60957 | 52B | Heaton | 64A | St Margarets | |
16/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60845 | 35B | Grantham | 35A | New England | |
16/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60966 | 35B | Grantham | 35A | New England | |
23/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60884 | 52B | Heaton | 56B | Ardsley | |
23/09/1956 | Reallocation | 60885 | 52B | Heaton | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
10/03/1957 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
05/05/1957 | Reallocation | 60817 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/05/1957 | Reallocation | 60863 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 35B | Grantham | |
19/05/1957 | Reallocation | 60820 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
19/05/1957 | Reallocation | 60876 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
19/05/1957 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60805 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60809 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60854 | NWE | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60879 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60899 | 31B | March | 34A | Kings Cross | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60911 | NWE | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
28/07/1957 | Reallocation | 60876 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
28/07/1957 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
11/08/1957 | Reallocation | 60821 | 35A | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
11/08/1957 | Reallocation | 60842 | NWE | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
01/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60831 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60842 | 35B | Grantham | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60848 | 52A | Gateshead | 50A | York (North) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60854 | 35B | Grantham | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60863 | 35B | Grantham | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60887 | 52A | Gateshead | 50A | York (North) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60899 | 34A | Kings Cross | 36A | Doncaster | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60911 | 35B | Grantham | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60939 | HTN | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 60952 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
13/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60893 | 35A | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
13/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60966 | 35A | New England | 35B | Grantham | |
20/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60855 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
20/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60876 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
20/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
20/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60943 | 34A | Kings Cross | 35A | New England | |
28/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60816 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60927 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60951 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/10/1957 | Reallocation | 60959 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1957 | Reallocation | 60943 | 35A | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
17/11/1957 | Reallocation | 60815 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
08/12/1957 | Reallocation | 60815 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 38E | Woodford Halse | |
11/03/1958 | Reallocation | 60828 | 34A | Kings Cross | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
11/03/1958 | Reallocation | 60854 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 34A | Kings Cross | |
21/04/1958 | Reallocation | 60816 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/04/1958 | Reallocation | 60927 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/04/1958 | Reallocation | 60951 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/04/1958 | Reallocation | 60959 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60808 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60843 | YK | York (North) | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60848 | 50A | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60904 | YK | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60929 | 50A | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60932 | TWD | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60934 | YK | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60952 | 50A | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 60976 | YK | York (North) | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
06/07/1958 | Reallocation | 60979 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
14/09/1958 | Reallocation | 60843 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/09/1958 | Reallocation | 60846 | 37A | Ardsley | 52B | Heaton | |
14/09/1958 | Reallocation | 60865 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/09/1958 | Reallocation | 60913 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/09/1958 | Reallocation | 60976 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 52B | Heaton | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 60931 | 62B | 64A | St Margarets | ||
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 60937 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 60971 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/10/1958 | Reallocation | 60958 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
20/10/1958 | Reallocation | 60969 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
02/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60828 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 50A | York (North) | |
02/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60855 | 34E | Neasden | 50A | York (North) | |
02/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60876 | 34E | Neasden | 50A | York (North) | |
02/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60877 | 34E | Neasden | 50A | York (North) | |
02/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60878 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 50A | York (North) | |
16/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60866 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/11/1958 | Reallocation | 60936 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
14/12/1958 | Reallocation | 60821 | 35B | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
14/12/1958 | Reallocation | 60893 | 35B | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
14/12/1958 | Reallocation | 60966 | 35B | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
01/01/1959 | Reallocation | 819 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64B | Haymarket | |
01/01/1959 | Reallocation | 60819 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64B | Haymarket | |
01/01/1959 | Reallocation | 60824 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64B | Haymarket | |
01/01/1959 | Reallocation | 60827 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64B | Haymarket | |
22/01/1959 | Reallocation | 60920 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64B | Haymarket | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60837 | 51A | Darlington | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60864 | YK | York (North) | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60875 | 35A | New England | 34F | Grantham | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60877 | 50A | York (North) | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60908 | 35A | New England | 34F | Grantham | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60912 | NWE | New England | 34F | Grantham | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60939 | 50A | York (North) | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60946 | 50A | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 60960 | YK | York (North) | 51A | Darlington | |
25/07/1959 | Reallocation | 60815 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
25/07/1959 | Reallocation | 60915 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
15/08/1959 | Reallocation | 60890 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
06/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60831 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 50A | York (North) | |
06/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60842 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 50A | York (North) | |
06/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60879 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 50A | York (North) | |
06/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60911 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 51L | Thornaby | |
06/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60915 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 51L | Thornaby | |
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60875 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60908 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60912 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60946 | 51A | Darlington | 51L | Thornaby | |
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60960 | 51A | Darlington | 51L | Thornaby | |
20/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60820 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
20/09/1959 | Reallocation | 60914 | KX | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
01/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60837 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 50A | York (North) | |
01/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60864 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 50A | York (North) | |
01/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60877 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 50A | York (North) | |
01/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60939 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 50A | York (North) | |
08/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60826 | 35A | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60850 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60885 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 51L | Thornaby | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60816 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 819 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60819 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60824 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60827 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/11/1959 | Reallocation | 60920 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
13/12/1959 | Reallocation | 60809 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
13/12/1959 | Reallocation | 60940 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60805 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60807 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60833 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60860 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60868 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 60904 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
11/04/1960 | Reallocation | 60927 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/04/1960 | Reallocation | 60951 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/04/1960 | Reallocation | 60959 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
16/05/1960 | Reallocation | 60823 | 64A | St Margarets | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |
30/05/1960 | Reallocation | 60973 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60806 | 52B | Heaton | 51L | Thornaby | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60810 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60841 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60857 | DON | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60896 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60901 | 52B | Heaton | 51A | Darlington | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60909 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60936 | 36A | Doncaster | 34E | New England | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60956 | DON | Doncaster | 34E | New England | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60967 | GHD | Gateshead | 51L | Thornaby | |
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60970 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |
19/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60846 | 52B | Heaton | 51L | Thornaby | |
26/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60808 | 52B | Heaton | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
26/06/1960 | Reallocation | 60809 | 52B | Heaton | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
11/07/1960 | Reallocation | 60818 | 64A | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/07/1960 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64A | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/07/1960 | Reallocation | 60931 | 64A | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/07/1960 | Reallocation | 60933 | 64A | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/09/1960 | Reallocation | 60808 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/09/1960 | Reallocation | 60809 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/09/1960 | Reallocation | 60859 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/09/1960 | Reallocation | 60901 | 51A | Darlington | 51L | Thornaby | |
11/09/1960 | Reallocation | 60916 | 37A | Ardsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
09/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60841 | 34F | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
09/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60857 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
09/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60896 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
09/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60909 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
09/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60936 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
24/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60836 | 65A | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
24/10/1960 | Reallocation | 60931 | 65A | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
17/11/1960 | Reallocation | 60818 | 65A | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/11/1960 | Reallocation | 60836 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/11/1960 | Reallocation | 60931 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/11/1960 | Reallocation | 60933 | 65A | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/01/1961 | Reallocation | 60817 | 36A | Doncaster | 34E | New England | |
22/01/1961 | Reallocation | 60881 | 36A | Doncaster | 34E | New England | |
07/05/1961 | Reallocation | 60854 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34F | Grantham | |
07/05/1961 | Reallocation | 60871 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34F | Grantham | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60809 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60854 | 34F | Grantham | 34A | Kings Cross | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60866 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60871 | 34F | Grantham | 34A | Kings Cross | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60889 | DON | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60905 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60912 | 36A | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 60921 | DON | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
16/07/1961 | Reallocation | 60872 | DON | Doncaster | 34F | Grantham | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60848 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60861 | 37A | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60866 | 34F | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60872 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60884 | 56B | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60889 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60905 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60911 | 51L | Thornaby | 50A | York (North) | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60912 | 34F | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60921 | 34F | Grantham | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60929 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60934 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60947 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60949 | 52A | Gateshead | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
10/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60967 | 51L | Thornaby | 50A | York (North) | |
17/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60880 | DON | Doncaster | 34E | New England | |
17/09/1961 | Reallocation | 60897 | NWE | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
29/10/1961 | Reallocation | 60803 | 31B | March | 34E | New England | |
29/10/1961 | Reallocation | 60830 | 31B | March | 34E | New England | |
29/10/1961 | Reallocation | 60858 | 31B | March | 34E | New England | |
29/10/1961 | Reallocation | 60938 | 31B | March | 34E | New England | |
24/12/1961 | Reallocation | 60948 | 31B | March | 34E | New England | |
26/02/1962 | Condemned | 60850 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
26/02/1962 | Condemned | 60960 | 51L | Thornaby | COND | ||
26/02/1962 | Condemned | 60977 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 60875 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 60928 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
25/03/1962 | Reallocation | 60938 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
25/03/1962 | Reallocation | 60966 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
26/03/1962 | Condemned | 60823 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | COND | ||
12/04/1962 | Condemned | 60826 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
12/04/1962 | Condemned | 60849 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
13/04/1962 | Condemned | 60917 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/04/1962 | Condemned | 60857 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
23/04/1962 | Condemned | 60811 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
28/04/1962 | Condemned | 60863 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/04/1962 | Reallocation | 60853 | 35A | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
29/04/1962 | Reallocation | 60924 | 32A | Inverness | 36A | Doncaster | |
01/05/1962 | Condemned | 60867 | 35A | New England | COND | ||
05/05/1962 | Condemned | 60815 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
05/05/1962 | Condemned | 60890 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
28/05/1962 | Condemned | 60907 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
28/05/1962 | Condemned | 60953 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
31/05/1962 | Condemned | 60829 | 35A | New England | COND | ||
04/06/1962 | Condemned | 60908 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
08/06/1962 | Condemned | 60909 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/06/1962 | Reallocation | 60814 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34F | Grantham | |
17/06/1962 | Reallocation | 60830 | 34E | New England | 34F | Grantham | |
17/06/1962 | Reallocation | 60948 | 34E | New England | 34F | Grantham | |
17/06/1962 | Reallocation | 60950 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34F | Grantham | |
17/06/1962 | Reallocation | 60983 | KX | Kings Cross | 34F | Grantham | |
20/06/1962 | Condemned | 60820 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
01/07/1962 | Reallocation | 60808 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
01/07/1962 | Reallocation | 60915 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
09/07/1962 | Reallocation | 60973 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
16/07/1962 | Condemned | 60848 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
21/08/1962 | Condemned | 60800 | 34A | Kings Cross | COND | ||
22/08/1962 | Condemned | 60874 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60845 | 35A | New England | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60893 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60896 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60914 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60930 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60936 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60943 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60956 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 60983 | 34F | Grantham | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 60801 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 60926 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 60938 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 60947 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 60979 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 60918 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 60839 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 60842 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 60860 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 60878 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 60934 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 60807 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 60978 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
25/11/1962 | Reallocation | 60861 | 56A | Wakefield | 56B | Ardsley | |
25/11/1962 | Reallocation | 60884 | 56A | Wakefield | 56B | Ardsley | |
25/11/1962 | Reallocation | 60916 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
25/11/1962 | Reallocation | 60948 | 34F | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
25/11/1962 | Reallocation | 60950 | 34F | Grantham | 34E | New England | |
26/11/1962 | Condemned | 60915 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
26/11/1962 | Condemned | 60949 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60805 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60833 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60843 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 56B | Ardsley | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60886 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60923 | GHD | Gateshead | 56B | Ardsley | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60929 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60932 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60942 | 52A | Gateshead | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60945 | 52B | Heaton | 50A | York (North) | |
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60952 | 52A | Gateshead | 56B | Ardsley | |
03/12/1962 | Condemned | 60879 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
03/12/1962 | Condemned | 60911 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
03/12/1962 | Condemned | 60927 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 819 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60819 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60821 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60827 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60832 | 35A | New England | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60840 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60851 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60866 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60873 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60888 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60894 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60920 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60933 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60937 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60951 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60958 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60965 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60970 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60971 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 60980 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60865 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
31/12/1962 | Reallocation | 60959 | 64A | St Margarets | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
13/01/1963 | Reallocation | 60913 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
27/01/1963 | Reallocation | 60871 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
27/01/1963 | Reallocation | 60902 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
27/01/1963 | Reallocation | 60903 | KX | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
10/02/1963 | Condemned | 60903 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
24/02/1963 | Reallocation | 60846 | 51L | Thornaby | 64A | St Margarets | |
24/02/1963 | Condemned | 60883 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 60812 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
11/04/1963 | Condemned | 60900 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
15/04/1963 | Condemned | 60981 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
19/04/1963 | Condemned | 60814 | 34F | Grantham | COND | ||
21/04/1963 | Reallocation | 60802 | 52B | Heaton | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/04/1963 | Reallocation | 60854 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
21/04/1963 | Reallocation | 60862 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | New England | |
29/04/1963 | Condemned | 60912 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
20/05/1963 | Condemned | 60968 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
28/05/1963 | Condemned | 60906 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
07/06/1963 | Condemned | 60935 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
11/06/1963 | Condemned | 60889 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
11/06/1963 | Condemned | 60897 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
11/06/1963 | Condemned | 60921 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
11/06/1963 | Condemned | 60966 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60803 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60806 | 51L | Thornaby | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60817 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60830 | 34F | Grantham | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60835 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60841 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60854 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60858 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60862 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60865 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60868 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60869 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60871 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60880 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 60881 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60885 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60891 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60901 | 51L | Thornaby | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60902 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60904 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60910 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60913 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60922 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60940 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60944 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60948 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60950 | 34E | New England | 36A | Doncaster | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60962 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60976 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/06/1963 | Reallocation | 60835 | 52A | Gateshead | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
01/07/1963 | Condemned | 60959 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
16/07/1963 | Condemned | 60870 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
12/08/1963 | Condemned | 60861 | 56B | Ardsley | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60841 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60852 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60853 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60871 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60872 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60880 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60899 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60902 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60905 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60924 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60948 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Condemned | 60950 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
06/10/1963 | Condemned | 60858 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
18/11/1963 | Condemned | 60954 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
21/11/1963 | Condemned | 60892 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
24/11/1963 | Reallocation | 60818 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
24/11/1963 | Reallocation | 60836 | 64A | St Margarets | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
28/11/1963 | Condemned | 60898 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
28/11/1963 | Condemned | 60972 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
05/12/1963 | Condemned | 60804 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
09/12/1963 | Condemned | 60974 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
23/12/1963 | Condemned | 60805 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
23/01/1964 | Condemned | 60838 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
26/01/1964 | Reallocation | 60884 | 56B | Ardsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
26/01/1964 | Reallocation | 60952 | 56B | Ardsley | 51L | Thornaby | |
10/02/1964 | Condemned | 60967 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
05/03/1964 | Condemned | 60802 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
16/03/1964 | Condemned | 60864 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
19/03/1964 | Condemned | 60834 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 60836 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
13/04/1964 | Condemned | 60855 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
15/04/1964 | Condemned | 60910 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
27/04/1964 | Reallocation | 60825 | STM | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
27/04/1964 | Condemned | 60825 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
08/05/1964 | Condemned | 60964 | GHD | Gateshead | COND | ||
11/05/1964 | Reallocation | 60919 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
18/05/1964 | Reallocation | 60955 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/05/1964 | Condemned | 60969 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60833 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60856 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60925 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60932 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60942 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
25/05/1964 | Condemned | 60975 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
26/06/1964 | Condemned | 60916 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
05/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60806 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
05/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60859 | 51L | Thornaby | 52A | Gateshead | |
05/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60884 | 51L | Thornaby | 51A | Darlington | |
05/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60946 | 51L | Thornaby | 52A | Gateshead | |
05/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60952 | 51L | Thornaby | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 60809 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 60887 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 60941 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 60945 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
09/07/1964 | Condemned | 60812 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
09/07/1964 | Condemned | 60904 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
09/07/1964 | Condemned | 60922 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 60882 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60835 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
19/07/1964 | Reallocation | 60970 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
05/10/1964 | Condemned | 60808 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
05/10/1964 | Condemned | 60982 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 60891 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 60913 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 60939 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
07/12/1964 | Condemned | 60822 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
13/12/1964 | Reallocation | 60901 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 52A | Gateshead | |
17/12/1964 | Condemned | 60957 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
05/04/1965 | Condemned | 60961 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
14/06/1965 | Condemned | 60865 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
14/06/1965 | Condemned | 60901 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
21/06/1965 | Condemned | 60929 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
29/06/1965 | Condemned | 60847 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
29/06/1965 | Condemned | 60963 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
03/09/1965 | Condemned | 60931 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/09/1965 | Condemned | 60884 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
06/09/1965 | Condemned | 60885 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 60859 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 60944 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 60962 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
04/10/1965 | Condemned | 60828 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
04/10/1965 | Condemned | 60843 | 56B | Ardsley | COND | ||
04/10/1965 | Condemned | 60895 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
04/10/1965 | Condemned | 60923 | 56B | Ardsley | COND | ||
10/10/1965 | Reallocation | 60868 | 52A | Gateshead | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/10/1965 | Reallocation | 60976 | 52A | Gateshead | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/10/1965 | Condemned | 60940 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
11/10/1965 | Condemned | 60946 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
11/10/1965 | Condemned | 60952 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
19/10/1965 | Condemned | 60835 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/10/1965 | Condemned | 60846 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/10/1965 | Condemned | 60876 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
22/10/1965 | Condemned | 60816 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
08/11/1965 | Condemned | 60844 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
16/11/1965 | Condemned | 60837 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
21/11/1965 | Condemned | 60810 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
02/01/1966 | Reallocation | 60806 | 51A | Darlington | 50A | York (North) | |
24/01/1966 | Condemned | 60973 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
07/02/1966 | Condemned | 60970 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
13/02/1966 | Condemned | 60877 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
10/04/1966 | Condemned | 60886 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
24/04/1966 | Reallocation | 60813 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
22/08/1966 | Condemned | 60818 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
02/09/1966 | Condemned | 60919 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
04/09/1966 | Condemned | 60806 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 60813 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 60824 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 60868 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 60955 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 60976 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/12/1966 | Condemned | 60831 | 50A | York (North) | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 60836 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND |