LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2
Class | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946 2nd) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
V2 | 4771 | 700 | 800 | 60800 | 13/06/1936 | KX 38E 34A W |
Kings Cross Woodford Halse Kings Cross Withdrawn |
13/06/1936 17/05/1953 28/06/1953 21/08/1962 |
21/08/1962 | |
V2 | 4772 | 701 | 801 | 60801 | 08/08/1936 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52D 52D 52A 52B 52D W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
08/08/1936 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 30/11/1952 27/12/1952 07/06/1953 15/11/1953 03/05/1955 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4773 | 702 | 802 | 60802 | 03/10/1936 | YK GHD HTN 52A 52A 52B 64A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Withdrawn |
03/10/1936 28/03/1943 13/10/1946 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 15/04/1956 21/04/1963 05/03/1964 |
05/03/1964 | |
V2 | 4774 | 703 | 803 | 60803 | 30/10/1936 | NWE KX NWE 31B 31B 35A 31B 34E W |
New England Kings Cross New England March March New England March New England Withdrawn |
30/10/1936 28/11/1943 27/10/1946 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 17/05/1953 28/06/1953 29/10/1961 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4775 | 704 | 804 | 804 | 60804 | 28/11/1936 | DEE 61B 62B W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
28/11/1936 23/12/1955 02/01/1956 05/12/1963 |
05/12/1963 |
V2 | 4776 | 705 | 805 | 60805 | 16/07/1937 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52D 52A 52B 50A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
16/07/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 27/12/1953 16/06/1957 03/01/1960 02/12/1962 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 | |
V2 | 4777 | 706 | 806 | 60806 | 06/08/1937 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52D 52D 52B 51L 51C 51A 50A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Thornaby West Hartlepool Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
06/08/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 30/11/1952 27/12/1952 12/04/1953 12/06/1960 16/06/1963 05/07/1964 02/01/1966 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | |
V2 | 4778 | 707 | 807 | 60807 | 24/08/1937 | HTN GHD HTN HTN 52D 52A 52B W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Heaton Withdrawn |
24/08/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 12/04/1953 07/06/1953 03/01/1960 19/11/1962 |
19/11/1962 | |
V2 | 4779 | 708 | 808 | 60808 | 09/09/1937 | HTN GHD HTN 52D 52B 56C 51L 51A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Heaton Copley Hill (Leeds) Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
09/09/1937 28/03/1943 06/05/1946 12/04/1953 08/06/1958 26/06/1960 11/09/1960 01/07/1962 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | |
V2 | 4780 | 709 | 809 | 60809 | 31/08/1937 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52A 52A 52B 52A 52B 56C 51L 51A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Heaton Copley Hill (Leeds) Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
31/08/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 15/04/1956 16/06/1957 13/12/1959 26/06/1960 11/09/1960 11/06/1961 06/07/1964 |
06/07/1964 | |
V2 | 4781 | 710 | 810 | 810 | 60810 | 03/09/1937 | HTN GHD HTN HTN 52A 52A 52B 52B 50A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
03/09/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 12/06/1960 21/11/1965 |
21/11/1965 |
V2 | 4782 | 711 | 811 | 60811 | 10/09/1937 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52D 52D 52B W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Withdrawn |
10/09/1937 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 30/11/1952 27/12/1952 12/04/1953 23/04/1962 |
23/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4783 | 712 | 812 | 60812 | 18/09/1937 | HTN GHD HTN 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
18/09/1937 28/03/1943 03/11/1945 16/03/1963 09/07/1964 |
09/07/1964 | |
V2 | 4784 | 713 | 813 | 60813 | 27/09/1937 | DON KX 64A 64A 62B W |
Doncaster Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
27/09/1937 09/12/1939 25/02/1951 31/03/1951 24/04/1966 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
V2 | 4785 | 714 | 814 | 60814 | 08/10/1937 | KX 64A 64A 91X 34A 34F W |
Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets To Scottish Region Kings Cross Grantham Withdrawn |
08/10/1937 03/06/1951 05/06/1951 09/06/1951 25/01/1953 17/06/1962 19/04/1963 |
19/04/1963 | |
V2 | 4786 | 715 | 815 | 815 | 60815 | 20/10/1937 | NWE KX DON 38E 36A 36A 38E 38C 38E 15E W |
New England Kings Cross Doncaster Woodford Halse Doncaster Doncaster Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Withdrawn |
20/10/1937 28/11/1943 11/11/1946 09/04/1950 10/06/1951 16/06/1951 09/10/1955 17/11/1957 08/12/1957 25/07/1959 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
V2 | 4787 | 716 | 816 | 60816 | 26/10/1937 | ABD STM HAY ABD STM HAY ABD HAY 64A 64B 64A W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
26/10/1937 03/1940 05/1941 11/1941 28/11/1942 17/04/1943 07/1944 29/10/1944 28/10/1957 21/04/1958 10/11/1959 22/10/1965 |
22/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4788 | 717 | 817 | 60817 | 01/11/1937 | DON KX NWE KX WFD WFD 36A 34E W |
Doncaster Kings Cross New England Kings Cross Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
01/11/1937 11/12/1939 21/11/1942 28/11/1943 07/11/1948 13/11/1948 05/05/1957 22/01/1961 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4789 | 718 | 818 | 60818 | 08/11/1937 | KX NWE KX WFD WFD 34A 34A 64A 65A 64A 62B W |
Kings Cross New England Kings Cross Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Kings Cross Kings Cross St Margarets Eastfield St Margarets Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
08/11/1937 21/11/1942 28/11/1943 07/11/1948 13/11/1948 28/01/1951 31/01/1951 25/01/1953 11/07/1960 17/11/1960 24/11/1963 22/08/1966 |
22/08/1966 | |
V2 | 4790 | 719 | 819 | 819 | 60819 | 15/11/1937 | ABD 64B 64A W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
15/11/1937 01/01/1959 10/11/1959 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V2 | 4791 | 720 | 820 | 60820 | 23/11/1937 | NWE KX WFD WFD 35A 35A 38E 38C 34A 34E 34A 34E W |
New England Kings Cross Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England New England Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
23/11/1937 28/11/1943 11/11/1948 13/11/1948 28/01/1951 31/01/1951 08/02/1953 17/05/1953 10/06/1956 24/06/1956 19/05/1957 20/09/1959 20/06/1962 |
20/06/1962 | |
V2 | 4792 | 721 | 821 | 60821 | 03/12/1937 | DON KX NWE KX 64A 91X 64A 34A 35A 35B 34E W |
Doncaster Kings Cross New England Kings Cross St Margarets To Scottish Region St Margarets Kings Cross New England Grantham New England Withdrawn |
03/12/1937 29/11/1941 21/11/1942 28/11/1943 22/04/1951 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 25/01/1953 29/07/1956 11/08/1957 14/12/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4793 | 722 | 822 | 60822 | 09/12/1937 | ABD 62B 62B W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
09/12/1937 05/11/1950 30/11/1950 07/12/1964 |
07/12/1964 | |
V2 | 4794 | 723 | 823 | 823 | 60823 | 21/12/1937 | KX 64A 64A PTH W |
Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets Perth (LNER) Withdrawn |
21/12/1937 25/02/1951 31/03/1951 16/05/1960 26/03/1962 |
26/03/1962 |
V2 | 4795 | 724 | 824 | 60824 | 22/12/1937 | NWE DON STM ABD 64B 64A W |
New England Doncaster St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
22/12/1937 09/03/1944 13/10/1945 27/01/1947 01/01/1959 10/11/1959 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
V2 | 4796 | 725 | 825 | 60825 | 06/01/1938 | DON STM ABD 64A STM 62B W |
Doncaster St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets St Margarets Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
06/01/1938 13/10/1945 27/01/1947 20/11/1949 26/11/1949 27/04/1964 27/04/1964 |
27/04/1964 | |
V2 | 4797 | 726 | 826 | 60826 | 12/01/1938 | KX NWE DON GOR DON WFD WFD 35A 35A 31B 31B 37B 37B 37A 35A 36A W |
Kings Cross New England Doncaster Gorton Doncaster Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England New England March March Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
12/01/1938 21/11/1942 11/03/1944 29/10/1944 05/06/1947 26/06/1949 02/07/1949 05/03/1951 31/03/1951 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 14/10/1951 20/10/1951 18/10/1953 03/04/1955 08/11/1959 12/04/1962 |
12/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4798 | 727 | 827 | 60827 | 18/01/1938 | NWE GOR DON STM ABD 64B 64A W |
New England Gorton Doncaster St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
18/01/1938 01/10/1938 26/01/1940 13/10/1945 27/01/1947 01/01/1959 10/11/1959 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4799 | 728 | 828 | 60828 | 28/03/1938 | YK DON GOR NWE 34A 34E 34A 15E 50A W |
York (North) Doncaster Gorton New England Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross Leicester (G.C.) York (North) Withdrawn |
28/03/1938 06/09/1938 25/11/1944 23/10/1946 20/06/1954 10/07/1955 02/10/1955 11/03/1958 02/11/1958 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4800 | 729 | 829 | 60829 | 01/04/1938 | DEE NWE DON KX 35A 35A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge New England Doncaster Kings Cross New England New England Withdrawn |
01/04/1938 26/10/1938 01/03/1944 11/11/1944 19/03/1950 25/03/1950 31/05/1962 |
31/05/1962 | |
V2 | 4801 | 730 | 830 | 60830 | 13/04/1938 | KX NWE DON WFD WFD 35A 35A 31B 31B 34E 34F W |
Kings Cross New England Doncaster Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England New England March March New England Grantham Withdrawn |
13/04/1938 21/11/1942 11/03/1944 19/06/1949 25/06/1949 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 29/10/1961 17/06/1962 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4802 | 731 | 831 | 60831 | 30/05/1938 | HTN DON WFD WFD 38C 34A 38E 38C 50A W |
Heaton Doncaster Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Kings Cross Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) York (North) Withdrawn |
30/05/1938 30/09/1938 19/06/1949 25/06/1949 15/03/1953 17/05/1953 28/06/1953 01/09/1957 06/09/1959 06/12/1966 |
06/12/1966 | |
V2 | 4803 | 732 | 832 | 60832 | 22/07/1938 | STM KX GRA DON COP DON WFD WFD 35A W |
St Margarets Kings Cross Grantham Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England Withdrawn |
22/07/1938 03/11/1938 07/03/1939 18/03/1940 25/06/1945 28/05/1946 19/06/1949 25/06/1949 11/02/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4804 | 733 | 833 | 60833 | 31/08/1938 | YK HTN GHD HTN HTN 52A 52B 50A W |
York (North) Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
31/08/1938 27/09/1938 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 29/05/1955 03/01/1960 02/12/1962 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 4805 | 734 | 834 | 60834 | 09/09/1938 | ABD STM HAY 62B 62B W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Haymarket Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
09/09/1938 23/10/1942 17/04/1943 12/11/1950 30/11/1950 19/03/1964 |
19/03/1964 | |
V2 | 4806 | 735 | 835 | 60835 | 23/09/1938 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52D 52D 52B 52A 61B 64A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Gateshead Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Withdrawn |
23/09/1938 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 30/11/1952 27/12/1952 12/04/1953 16/06/1963 30/06/1963 19/07/1964 19/10/1965 |
19/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4807 | 736 | 836 | 60836 | 23/09/1938 | DEE STM HAY ABD HAY ABD STM HAY 64A STM 64B 64B 64A 64A 65A 65B 64A 61B 62B W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
23/09/1938 11/1939 05/1941 10/1941 11/1941 08/1942 12/1942 17/04/1943 25/09/1949 01/10/1949 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 04/03/1951 31/03/1951 11/07/1960 24/10/1960 17/11/1960 24/11/1963 13/04/1964 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
V2 | 4808 | 737 | 837 | 60837 | 05/10/1938 | YK 50A 51A 56C 50A W |
York (North) York (North) Darlington Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
05/10/1938 29/05/1955 26/06/1955 14/06/1959 01/11/1959 16/11/1965 |
16/11/1965 | |
V2 | 4809 | 738 | 838 | 60838 | 11/10/1938 | DEE W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
11/10/1938 23/01/1964 |
23/01/1964 | |
V2 | 4810 | 739 | 839 | 60839 | 19/10/1938 | YK NEV YK W |
York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
19/10/1938 06/05/1946 29/09/1946 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4811 | 740 | 840 | 60840 | 28/10/1938 | DEE 64A 64A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
28/10/1938 19/10/1952 01/11/1952 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4812 | 741 | 841 | 60841 | 18/11/1938 | DON MEX DON NWE 36A 34F 34E 36A W |
Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster New England Doncaster Grantham New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
18/11/1938 03/11/1940 19/08/1945 24/10/1946 28/08/1955 12/06/1960 09/10/1960 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4813 | 742 | 842 | 60842 | 09/12/1938 | NWE DON NWE 35B 38C 50A W |
New England Doncaster New England Grantham Leicester (G.C.) York (North) Withdrawn |
09/12/1938 10/03/1944 24/10/1946 11/08/1957 15/09/1957 06/09/1959 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4814 | 743 | 843 | 60843 | 30/12/1938 | YK NEV YK 56C 52D 56B W |
York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Copley Hill (Leeds) Tweedmouth Ardsley Withdrawn |
30/12/1938 06/05/1946 29/09/1946 08/06/1958 14/09/1958 02/12/1962 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4815 | 744 | 844 | 60844 | 03/02/1939 | STM HAY DEE W |
St Margarets Haymarket Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
03/02/1939 05/1941 12/12/1943 08/11/1965 |
08/11/1965 | |
V2 | 4816 | 745 | 845 | 60845 | 22/02/1939 | KX NWE DON COP SHF DON 38E 35A 35A 91W 35A 35A 91W 35A 35B 35A W |
Kings Cross New England Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Woodford Halse New England New England To Western Region / GWR (on loan) New England New England To Western Region / GWR (on loan) New England Grantham New England Withdrawn |
22/02/1939 02/08/1940 11/03/1944 22/01/1945 28/05/1946 22/04/1947 09/04/1950 02/09/1951 08/09/1951 05/05/1952 22/09/1952 04/10/1952 20/10/1952 05/04/1953 18/09/1955 16/09/1956 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 4817 | 746 | 846 | 60846 | 17/02/1939 | DON 37B 37B 37A 52B 51L 64A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Heaton Thornaby St Margarets Withdrawn |
17/02/1939 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 07/06/1953 14/09/1958 19/06/1960 24/02/1963 19/10/1965 |
19/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4818 | 747 | 847 | 60847 | 06/03/1939 | YK NEV YK W |
York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
06/03/1939 06/05/1946 29/09/1946 29/06/1965 |
29/06/1965 | |
V2 | 4819 | 748 | 848 | 60848 | 03/03/1939 | STM HAY ABD HAY 64A STM 52A 50A 51A 50A W |
St Margarets Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Gateshead York (North) Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
03/03/1939 05/1941 02/05/1943 29/10/1944 11/12/1949 17/12/1949 09/09/1956 15/09/1957 08/06/1958 10/09/1961 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 | |
V2 | 4820 | 749 | 849 | 60849 | 10/03/1939 | DON SHF SHF DON W |
Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/03/1939 11/02/1941 11/04/1943 27/03/1947 12/04/1962 |
12/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4821 | 750 | 850 | 60850 | 17/03/1939 | KX NWE 36A W |
Kings Cross New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/03/1939 18/07/1940 08/11/1959 26/02/1962 |
26/02/1962 | |
V2 | 4822 | 751 | 851 | 851 | 60851 | 24/03/1939 | DEE ABD W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
24/03/1939 01/04/1939 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V2 | 4823 | 752 | 852 | 60852 | 31/03/1939 | DON COP DON W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Withdrawn |
31/03/1939 17/02/1946 07/03/1946 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4824 | 753 | 853 | 60853 | 11/04/1939 | DON COP WFD WFD 35A 35A 36A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
11/04/1939 22/01/1945 16/12/1948 18/12/1948 02/09/1951 08/09/1951 29/04/1962 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4825 | 754 | 854 | 60854 | 19/04/1939 | NWE 35B 38C 34A 34F 34A 34E W |
New England Grantham Leicester (G.C.) Kings Cross Grantham Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
19/04/1939 16/06/1957 15/09/1957 11/03/1958 07/05/1961 11/06/1961 21/04/1963 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4826 | 755 | 855 | 60855 | 21/04/1939 | KX NWE 34A 34E 34A 34E 50A W |
Kings Cross New England Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross Neasden York (North) Withdrawn |
21/04/1939 18/07/1940 01/11/1953 10/07/1955 02/10/1955 20/10/1957 02/11/1958 13/04/1964 |
13/04/1964 | |
V2 | 4827 | 756 | 856 | 60856 | 02/05/1939 | YK NEV YK W |
York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
02/05/1939 06/05/1946 29/09/1946 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 4828 | 757 | 857 | 60857 | 10/05/1939 | GOR DON SHF SHF DON 34F 36A W |
Gorton Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/05/1939 26/01/1940 01/03/1940 11/04/1943 22/09/1946 12/06/1960 09/10/1960 17/04/1962 |
17/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4829 | 758 | 858 | 60858 | 16/05/1939 | KX NWE 31B 31B 34E 36A W |
Kings Cross New England March March New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
16/05/1939 20/06/1939 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 29/10/1961 16/06/1963 06/10/1963 |
06/10/1963 | |
V2 | 4830 | 759 | 859 | 60859 | 18/05/1939 | LEI NEA GOR DON NWE 38E 37B 51L 52A W |
Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Gorton Doncaster New England Woodford Halse Copley Hill (Leeds) Thornaby Gateshead Withdrawn |
18/05/1939 16/12/1939 01/06/1942 19/07/1943 24/12/1944 11/02/1951 03/01/1954 11/09/1960 05/07/1964 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
V2 | 4831 | 760 | 860 | 860 | 60860 | 26/05/1939 | GHD HTN GHD HTN HTN 52A 52A 52B 52B 52D 52A 52B W |
Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Heaton Withdrawn |
26/05/1939 30/09/1939 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 12/04/1953 16/06/1957 03/01/1960 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 |
V2 | 4832 | 761 | 861 | 60861 | 06/06/1939 | GOR DON COP DON 37B 37B 37A 56A 56B W |
Gorton Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Wakefield Ardsley Withdrawn |
06/06/1939 17/01/1940 22/01/1945 28/05/1946 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 07/06/1953 10/09/1961 25/11/1962 12/08/1963 |
12/08/1963 | |
V2 | 4833 | 762 | 862 | 862 | 60862 | 13/06/1939 | GOR NWE 34A 34A 34E W |
Gorton New England Kings Cross Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
13/06/1939 16/11/1939 19/03/1950 25/03/1950 21/04/1963 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 |
V2 | 4834 | 763 | 863 | 60863 | 19/06/1939 | DON NWE 38E 38E 38C 35B 38C W |
Doncaster New England Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Grantham Leicester (G.C.) Withdrawn |
19/06/1939 24/10/1946 04/03/1951 31/03/1951 17/05/1953 16/05/1957 15/09/1957 28/04/1962 |
28/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4835 | 764 | 864 | 60864 | 26/06/1939 | YK DAR YK YK 56C 50A W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) York (North) Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
26/06/1939 24/11/1944 12/12/1948 18/12/1948 14/06/1959 01/11/1959 16/03/1964 |
16/03/1964 | |
V2 | 4836 | 765 | 865 | 865 | 60865 | 29/06/1939 | NWE 31B 31B 37B 37B 52D 52B 52A W |
New England March March Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Tweedmouth Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
29/06/1939 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 14/10/1951 20/10/1951 14/09/1958 30/12/1962 16/06/1963 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 |
V2 | 4837 | 766 | 866 | 60866 | 06/07/1939 | KX NWE KX NWE 36A 34F 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Kings Cross New England Doncaster Grantham New England Withdrawn |
06/07/1939 21/11/1942 12/11/1944 27/10/1946 16/11/1958 11/06/1961 10/09/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4838 | 767 | 867 | 867 | 60867 | 20/07/1939 | DON 35A W |
Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
20/07/1939 28/08/1955 01/05/1962 |
01/05/1962 |
V2 | 4839 | 768 | 868 | 60868 | 31/07/1939 | YK HTN GHD HTN HTN 52A 52A 52B 52A 64A W |
York (North) Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Gateshead St Margarets Withdrawn |
31/07/1939 19/08/1939 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 03/01/1960 16/06/1963 10/10/1965 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
V2 | 4840 | 769 | 869 | 60869 | 10/08/1939 | KX NWE W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
10/08/1939 21/11/1942 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4841 | 770 | 870 | 60870 | 12/08/1939 | NWE GRA DON W |
New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
12/08/1939 14/08/1939 18/03/1940 16/07/1963 |
16/07/1963 | |
V2 | 4842 | 771 | 871 | 60871 | 01/09/1939 | GRA NWE 38E 38E 38C 38C 38E 38E 36A 34A 34F 34A 34E 36A W |
Grantham New England Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Doncaster Kings Cross Grantham Kings Cross New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/09/1939 11/09/1939 28/01/1951 31/01/1951 10/08/1952 06/09/1952 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 09/10/1955 05/08/1956 07/05/1961 11/06/1961 27/01/1963 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4843 | 772 | 872 | 872 | 60872 | 22/04/1939 | DON 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
22/04/1939 16/07/1961 10/09/1961 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 |
V2 | 4844 | 773 | 873 | 873 | 60873 | 18/05/1939 | NWE KX 64A 64A W |
New England Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
18/05/1939 20/06/1939 15/04/1951 21/04/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V2 | 4845 | 774 | 874 | 60874 | 27/06/1939 | DON LEI NEA GOR DON GOR NWE W |
Doncaster Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Gorton Doncaster Gorton New England Withdrawn |
27/06/1939 15/08/1939 16/12/1939 29/05/1942 19/07/1943 29/10/1944 23/10/1946 22/08/1962 |
22/08/1962 | |
V2 | 4846 | 775 | 875 | 875 | 60875 | 28/07/1939 | DON 35A 34F 36A W |
Doncaster New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
28/07/1939 27/11/1955 14/06/1959 13/09/1959 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
V2 | 4847 | 776 | 876 | 60876 | 30/05/1940 | NWE 38E 37A 35A 34A 34E 34A 34E 50A W |
New England Woodford Halse Ardsley New England Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross Neasden York (North) Withdrawn |
30/05/1940 08/09/1951 30/08/1953 20/09/1953 01/11/1953 19/05/1957 28/07/1957 20/10/1957 02/11/1958 19/10/1965 |
19/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4848 | 777 | 877 | 60877 | 26/06/1940 | NWE COP DON 34A 34E 34A 34E 34A 34E 50A 56C 50A W |
New England Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross Neasden Kings Cross Neasden York (North) Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
26/06/1940 22/01/1945 28/05/1946 10/06/1956 24/06/1956 10/03/1957 19/05/1957 28/07/1957 20/10/1957 02/11/1958 14/06/1959 01/11/1959 13/02/1966 |
13/02/1966 | |
V2 | 4849 | 778 | 878 | 60878 | 12/07/1940 | NWE 38E 38C 50A W |
New England Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) York (North) Withdrawn |
12/07/1940 02/09/1951 28/02/1954 02/11/1958 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4850 | 779 | 879 | 60879 | 06/08/1940 | NWE 38E 38E 38C 50A W |
New England Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) York (North) Withdrawn |
06/08/1940 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 16/06/1957 06/09/1959 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4851 | 780 | 880 | 60880 | 04/09/1940 | DON COP DON 34E 36A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/09/1940 26/11/1945 28/05/1946 17/09/1961 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4852 | 781 | 881 | 60881 | 12/10/1940 | DON SHF SHF DON 34A 36A 34E W |
Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
12/10/1940 11/02/1941 11/04/1943 27/04/1947 26/06/1955 23/10/1955 22/01/1961 16/06/1963 |
16/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4853 | 782 | 882 | 60882 | 07/10/1939 | CAR STM HAY 64A 64A W |
Carlisle Canal St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
07/10/1939 11/1939 05/1941 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 13/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 | |
V2 | 4854 | 783 | 883 | 60883 | 20/10/1939 | HTN GHD 52B 52A 64A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead St Margarets Withdrawn |
20/10/1939 28/03/1943 15/04/1956 06/05/1956 09/09/1956 24/02/1963 |
24/02/1963 | |
V2 | 4855 | 784 | 884 | 60884 | 27/10/1939 | HTN GHD 52B 52B 52D 52D 52B 56B 56A 56B 51L 51A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Ardsley Wakefield Ardsley Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
27/10/1939 28/03/1943 19/11/1950 30/11/1950 29/04/1951 05/05/1951 08/05/1955 23/09/1956 10/09/1961 25/11/1962 26/01/1964 05/07/1964 06/09/1965 |
06/09/1965 | |
V2 | 4856 | 785 | 885 | 60885 | 10/11/1939 | HTN GHD 52B 52B 52D 52D 52B 52B 52A 52A 52B 56C 51L 51A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Copley Hill (Leeds) Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
10/11/1939 28/03/1943 19/11/1950 30/11/1950 29/04/1951 05/05/1951 06/01/1952 26/01/1952 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 15/11/1953 23/09/1956 08/11/1959 16/06/1963 06/09/1965 |
06/09/1965 | |
V2 | 4857 | 786 | 886 | 60886 | 18/11/1939 | HTN GHD HTN 52D 52D 52B 52B 52A 52A 52B 50A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
18/11/1939 28/03/1943 06/05/1946 29/04/1951 05/05/1951 06/01/1952 26/01/1952 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 15/11/1953 02/12/1962 10/04/1966 |
10/04/1966 | |
V2 | 4858 | 787 | 887 | 887 | 60887 | 30/11/1939 | HTN GHD HTN HTN 52D 52D 52B 52B 52A 52A 52B 52A 50A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
30/11/1939 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 29/04/1951 05/05/1951 06/01/1952 26/01/1952 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 01/03/1953 25/09/1955 15/09/1957 06/07/1964 |
06/07/1964 |
V2 | 4859 | 788 | 888 | 60888 | 07/12/1939 | HTN GHD ABD W |
Heaton Gateshead Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
07/12/1939 28/03/1943 13/10/1945 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4860 | 789 | 889 | 889 | 60889 | 17/12/1939 | DON SHF SHF DON 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/12/1939 01/03/1940 11/04/1943 27/04/1947 11/06/1961 10/09/1961 11/06/1963 |
11/06/1963 |
V2 | 4861 | 790 | 890 | 60890 | 28/12/1939 | DON NWE SHF DON 38E 38E 38C 38E 15E W |
Doncaster New England Sheffield Darnall Doncaster Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Withdrawn |
28/12/1939 24/12/1944 14/07/1946 22/09/1946 10/06/1951 16/06/1951 15/03/1953 26/04/1953 15/08/1959 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 | |
V2 | 4862 | 791 | 891 | 891 | 60891 | 29/12/1939 | HTN GHD HTN 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
29/12/1939 28/03/1943 06/05/1946 16/06/1963 12/10/1964 |
12/10/1964 |
V2 | 4863 | 792 | 892 | 60892 | 11/01/1940 | KX 64A 64A W |
Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
11/01/1940 25/02/1951 31/03/1951 21/11/1963 |
21/11/1963 | |
V2 | 4864 | 793 | 893 | 893 | 60893 | 20/01/1940 | NWE 70A 35A 35B 34E W |
New England Nine Elms (on loan) New England Grantham New England Withdrawn |
20/01/1940 14/05/1953 28/06/1953 13/10/1957 14/12/1958 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
V2 | 4865 | 794 | 894 | 60894 | 20/01/1940 | STM HAY 64A STM 64B 64B 64A 64A W |
St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
20/01/1940 05/1941 11/12/1949 17/12/1949 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4866 | 795 | 895 | 60895 | 26/01/1940 | HTN GHD HTN 51A 50A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
26/01/1940 28/03/1943 03/11/1945 19/07/1953 29/07/1953 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4867 | 796 | 896 | 60896 | 03/02/1940 | DON 70A 36A 37A 36A 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Nine Elms (on loan) Doncaster Ardsley Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/02/1940 14/05/1953 28/06/1953 30/08/1953 20/09/1953 12/06/1960 09/10/1960 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 4868 | 797 | 897 | 60897 | 10/02/1940 | KX NWE 36A W |
Kings Cross New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/02/1940 21/11/1942 17/09/1961 11/06/1963 |
11/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4869 | 798 | 898 | 60898 | 22/02/1940 | HTN GHD ABD W |
Heaton Gateshead Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
22/02/1940 28/03/1943 13/10/1945 28/11/1963 |
28/11/1963 | |
V2 | 4870 | 799 | 899 | 60899 | 23/02/1940 | NWE 31B 31B 34A 36A W |
New England March March Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
23/02/1940 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 16/06/1957 15/09/1957 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4871 | 800 | 900 | 60900 | 02/03/1940 | KX 64A W |
Kings Cross St Margarets Withdrawn |
02/03/1940 25/01/1953 11/04/1963 |
11/04/1963 | |
V2 | 4872 | 801 | 901 | 60901 | 09/03/1940 | YK 51A 51A 50A 50A 52B 51A 51L 51C 52A W |
York (North) Darlington Darlington York (North) York (North) Heaton Darlington Thornaby West Hartlepool Gateshead Withdrawn |
09/03/1940 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 10/06/1956 12/06/1960 11/09/1960 16/06/1963 13/12/1964 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 | |
V2 | 4873 | 802 | 902 | 60902 | 15/03/1940 | DON COP DON 34A 36A 37A 36A 34A 34E 36A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster Ardsley Doncaster Kings Cross New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
15/03/1940 18/04/1946 09/05/1946 17/05/1953 12/07/1953 30/08/1953 20/09/1953 03/07/1955 27/01/1963 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4874 | 803 | 903 | 903 | 60903 | 20/03/1940 | DON KX 34E W |
Doncaster Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
20/03/1940 15/02/1943 27/01/1963 10/02/1963 |
10/02/1963 |
V2 | 4875 | 804 | 904 | 60904 | 03/04/1940 | YK 52A 52B 52A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
03/04/1940 08/06/1958 03/01/1960 16/06/1963 09/07/1964 |
09/07/1964 | |
V2 | 4876 | 805 | 905 | 60905 | 10/04/1940 | NWE KX NWE 36A 34F 36A W |
New England Kings Cross New England Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/04/1940 12/11/1944 27/10/1946 27/11/1955 11/06/1961 10/09/1961 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 4877 | 806 | 906 | 60906 | 17/04/1940 | DON MEX DON NWE NWE W |
Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster New England New England Withdrawn |
17/04/1940 03/11/1940 19/08/1945 22/01/1950 28/01/1950 28/05/1963 |
28/05/1963 | |
V2 | 4878 | 807 | 907 | 60907 | 19/04/1940 | YK 51A 51A 50A 50A W |
York (North) Darlington Darlington York (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
19/04/1940 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 28/05/1962 |
28/05/1962 | |
V2 | 4879 | 808 | 908 | 60908 | 29/04/1940 | DON GOR NWE 70A 35A 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Gorton New England Nine Elms (on loan) New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/04/1940 29/10/1944 14/11/1946 14/05/1953 28/06/1953 14/06/1959 13/09/1959 04/06/1962 |
04/06/1962 | |
V2 | 4880 | 809 | 909 | 60909 | 04/05/1940 | DON KX 36A 34A 36A 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/05/1940 15/02/1943 17/05/1953 12/07/1953 03/07/1955 12/06/1960 09/10/1960 08/06/1962 |
08/06/1962 | |
V2 | 4881 | 810 | 910 | 60910 | 10/05/1940 | YK GHD HTN HTN 52A W |
York (North) Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
10/05/1940 28/03/1943 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 16/06/1963 15/04/1964 |
15/04/1964 | |
V2 | 4882 | 811 | 911 | 60911 | 15/05/1940 | DON NWE 35B 38C 51L 50A W |
Doncaster New England Grantham Leicester (G.C.) Thornaby York (North) Withdrawn |
15/05/1940 24/10/1946 16/06/1957 15/09/1957 06/09/1959 10/09/1961 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4883 | 812 | 912 | 912 | 60912 | 24/05/1940 | NWE 34F 36A 34F 34E W |
New England Grantham Doncaster Grantham New England Withdrawn |
24/05/1940 14/06/1959 13/09/1959 11/06/1961 10/09/1961 29/04/1963 |
29/04/1963 |
V2 | 4884 | 813 | 913 | 60913 | 06/06/1940 | NWE 31B 31B 37B 37B 52D 52B 52A W |
New England March March Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Tweedmouth Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
06/06/1940 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 14/10/1951 20/10/1951 14/09/1958 13/01/1963 16/06/1963 12/10/1964 |
12/10/1964 | |
V2 | 4885 | 814 | 914 | 60914 | 14/06/1940 | NWE COP DON KX 34E W |
New England Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
14/06/1940 22/01/1945 28/05/1946 11/11/1946 20/09/1959 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 4886 | 815 | 915 | 60915 | 15/06/1940 | NWE KX 38E 38E 15E 51L 51A W |
New England Kings Cross Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
15/06/1940 12/11/1944 28/01/1951 31/01/1951 25/07/1959 06/09/1959 01/07/1962 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |
V2 | 4887 | 816 | 916 | 60916 | 24/07/1940 | DON GOR NWE 70A 35A 37A 51L 51A W |
Doncaster Gorton New England Nine Elms (on loan) New England Ardsley Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
24/07/1940 29/10/1944 14/11/1946 14/05/1953 28/06/1953 03/04/1955 11/09/1960 25/11/1962 26/06/1964 |
26/06/1964 | |
V2 | 4888 | 817 | 917 | 60917 | 10/08/1940 | DON KX DON GOR DON 70A 36A W |
Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster Gorton Doncaster Nine Elms (on loan) Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/08/1940 17/08/1940 20/12/1941 25/03/1945 26/04/1947 14/05/1953 28/06/1953 13/04/1962 |
13/04/1962 | |
V2 | 4889 | 818 | 918 | 60918 | 28/08/1941 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
28/08/1941 08/10/1962 |
08/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4890 | 819 | 919 | 60919 | 07/09/1941 | HTN GHD TWD GHD ABD 62B W |
Heaton Gateshead Tweedmouth Gateshead Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
07/09/1941 28/03/1943 14/02/1944 24/04/1944 13/10/1945 11/05/1964 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
V2 | 4891 | 820 | 920 | 60920 | 04/10/1941 | DON DEE 64B 64A W |
Doncaster Dundee Tay Bridge Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
04/10/1941 13/10/1945 22/01/1959 10/11/1959 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 4892 | 821 | 921 | 60921 | 16/10/1941 | NWE DON DON 34F 36A W |
New England Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
16/10/1941 22/01/1950 28/01/1950 11/06/1961 10/09/1961 11/06/1963 |
11/06/1963 | |
V2 | 4893 | 822 | 922 | 60922 | 31/10/1941 | DON GOR KX 64A 64A 52B 52A W |
Doncaster Gorton Kings Cross St Margarets St Margarets Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
31/10/1941 29/10/1944 10/10/1946 25/02/1951 31/03/1951 09/09/1956 16/06/1963 09/07/1964 |
09/07/1964 | |
V2 | 4894 | 823 | 923 | 60923 | 15/11/1941 | HTN GHD 56B W |
Heaton Gateshead Ardsley Withdrawn |
15/11/1941 28/03/1943 02/12/1962 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
V2 | 4895 | 824 | 924 | 924 | 60924 | 22/11/1941 | KX NWE 32A 36A W |
Kings Cross New England Inverness Doncaster Withdrawn |
22/11/1941 21/11/1942 30/10/1948 29/04/1962 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 |
V2 | 4896 | 825 | 925 | 60925 | 04/12/1941 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
04/12/1941 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 4897 | 826 | 926 | 60926 | 17/12/1941 | GHD 52B 52B 52D 52D W |
Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
17/12/1941 19/11/1950 30/11/1950 30/11/1952 27/12/1952 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
V2 | 4898 | 827 | 927 | 60927 | 20/12/1941 | DON HAY 64A 64B 64A W |
Doncaster Haymarket St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
20/12/1941 13/10/1945 28/10/1957 21/04/1958 11/04/1960 03/12/1962 |
03/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3655 | 828 | 928 | 60928 | 24/06/1941 | DON GOR DON 70A 36A W |
Doncaster Gorton Doncaster Nine Elms (on loan) Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/06/1941 29/10/1944 23/04/1947 14/05/1953 09/07/1953 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 | |
V2 | 3656 | 829 | 929 | 60929 | 25/06/1941 | DON YK 51A 51A 50A 50A 52A 52D 50A W |
Doncaster York (North) Darlington Darlington York (North) York (North) Gateshead Tweedmouth York (North) Withdrawn |
25/06/1941 26/07/1941 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 08/06/1958 10/09/1961 02/12/1962 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | |
V2 | 3657 | 830 | 930 | 60930 | 26/07/1941 | DON W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/07/1941 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 3658 | 831 | 931 | 60931 | 23/08/1941 | ABD HAY ABD HAY DEE 64A 65A 65B 64A W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) St Margarets Withdrawn |
23/08/1941 12/1941 07/1944 29/10/1944 08/01/1950 14/01/1950 13/10/1958 11/07/1960 24/10/1960 17/11/1960 03/09/1965 |
03/09/1965 | |
V2 | 3659 | 832 | 932 | 60932 | 22/10/1941 | GHD TWD 52B 50A W |
Gateshead Tweedmouth Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
22/10/1941 03/11/1945 08/06/1958 02/12/1962 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 3660 | 833 | 933 | 60933 | 23/10/1941 | YK 64A 65A 64A W |
York (North) St Margarets Eastfield St Margarets Withdrawn |
23/10/1941 30/11/1952 11/07/1960 17/11/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3661 | 834 | 934 | 60934 | 07/01/1942 | YK 52A 52D W |
York (North) Gateshead Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
07/01/1942 08/06/1958 10/09/1961 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 | |
V2 | 3662 | 835 | 935 | 60935 | 17/02/1942 | DON NWE DON W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/02/1942 24/10/1946 03/02/1947 07/06/1963 |
07/06/1963 | |
V2 | 3663 | 836 | 936 | 60936 | 03/03/1942 | DON NWE 36A 34E 36A W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/03/1942 24/12/1944 16/11/1958 12/06/1960 09/10/1960 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 3664 | 837 | 937 | 937 | 60937 | 09/03/1942 | DEE 64A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Withdrawn |
09/03/1942 13/10/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V2 | 4899 | 838 | 938 | 60938 | 29/01/1942 | DON NWE 31B 31B 36A 31B 34E 36A W |
Doncaster New England March March Doncaster March New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/01/1942 24/10/1946 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 17/05/1953 26/07/1953 29/10/1961 25/03/1962 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
V2 | 3641 | 839 | 939 | 60939 | 12/02/1942 | GHD HTN 50A 56C 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton York (North) Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
12/02/1942 03/11/1945 15/09/1957 14/06/1959 01/11/1959 12/10/1964 |
12/10/1964 | |
V2 | 3642 | 840 | 940 | 60940 | 21/02/1942 | HTN GHD 52B 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
21/02/1942 28/03/1943 13/12/1959 16/06/1963 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 | |
V2 | 3643 | 841 | 941 | 60941 | 04/03/1942 | YK 51A 50A W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
04/03/1942 26/06/1955 25/09/1955 06/07/1964 |
06/07/1964 | |
V2 | 3644 | 842 | 942 | 60942 | 13/03/1942 | GHD 52B 52B 52A 52A 52B 52B 52A 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
13/03/1942 19/11/1950 30/11/1950 04/03/1951 10/03/1951 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 16/06/1957 02/12/1962 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 3645 | 843 | 943 | 60943 | 26/03/1942 | DON NWE DON 34A 35A 36A W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster Kings Cross New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/03/1942 24/10/1946 02/02/1947 26/06/1955 20/10/1957 10/11/1957 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 3646 | 844 | 944 | 60944 | 17/04/1942 | HTN GHD HTN 52A 52A 52B 52B 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
17/04/1942 28/03/1943 13/10/1946 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 16/06/1963 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
V2 | 3647 | 845 | 945 | 60945 | 15/05/1942 | DON KX NWE 52B 52A 52A 52B 50A W |
Doncaster Kings Cross New England Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
15/05/1942 15/02/1943 27/10/1946 04/02/1950 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 15/11/1953 02/12/1962 06/07/1964 |
06/07/1964 | |
V2 | 3648 | 846 | 946 | 60946 | 21/05/1942 | YK 51A 50A 51A 51L 52A W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) Darlington Thornaby Gateshead Withdrawn |
21/05/1942 26/06/1955 25/09/1955 14/06/1959 13/09/1959 05/07/1964 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 | |
V2 | 3649 | 847 | 947 | 60947 | 03/06/1942 | GHD HTN 52A 52A 52D W |
Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
03/06/1942 03/11/1945 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 10/09/1961 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
V2 | 3650 | 848 | 948 | 60948 | 11/06/1942 | DON GOR DON 31B 34E 34F 34E 36A W |
Doncaster Gorton Doncaster March New England Grantham New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
11/06/1942 29/10/1944 30/03/1947 30/08/1953 24/12/1961 17/06/1962 25/11/1962 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 3651 | 849 | 949 | 60949 | 18/06/1942 | HTN GHD HTN 52A 52A 52D W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
18/06/1942 28/03/1943 13/10/1946 01/07/1951 07/07/1951 10/09/1961 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |
V2 | 3652 | 850 | 950 | 60950 | 26/06/1942 | DON NWE 34A 34F 34E 36A W |
Doncaster New England Kings Cross Grantham New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/06/1942 24/12/1944 29/07/1956 17/06/1962 25/11/1962 16/06/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
V2 | 3653 | 851 | 951 | 60951 | 07/07/1942 | HAY 64A 64B 64A W |
Haymarket St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
07/07/1942 28/10/1957 21/04/1958 11/04/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3654 | 852 | 952 | 60952 | 18/07/1942 | GHD HTN HTN 52A 52A 52B 50A 52A 56B 51L 52A W |
Gateshead Heaton Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton York (North) Gateshead Ardsley Thornaby Gateshead Withdrawn |
18/07/1942 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 15/11/1953 15/09/1957 08/06/1958 02/12/1962 26/01/1964 05/07/1964 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 | |
V2 | 3665 | 853 | 953 | 60953 | 26/08/1942 | HAY 64A STM W |
Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
26/08/1942 25/09/1949 01/10/1949 28/05/1962 |
28/05/1962 | |
V2 | 3666 | 854 | 954 | 60954 | 05/09/1942 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
05/09/1942 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | |
V2 | 3667 | 855 | 955 | 60955 | 22/09/1942 | HAY ABD ABD 64A W |
Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Withdrawn |
22/09/1942 08/03/1948 13/03/1948 18/05/1964 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
V2 | 3668 | 856 | 956 | 60956 | 30/09/1942 | DON COP DON 34E W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
30/09/1942 18/07/1945 26/08/1945 12/06/1960 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 | |
V2 | 3669 | 857 | 957 | 957 | 60957 | 07/10/1942 | GHD HTN 52A 52A 52B 64A W |
Gateshead Heaton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton St Margarets Withdrawn |
07/10/1942 06/05/1946 06/07/1952 12/07/1952 15/04/1956 09/09/1956 17/12/1964 |
17/12/1964 |
V2 | 3670 | 858 | 958 | 958 | 60958 | 15/10/1942 | STM HAY DEE DEE 64A W |
St Margarets Haymarket Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Withdrawn |
15/10/1942 17/04/1943 12/12/1948 18/12/1948 20/10/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V2 | 3671 | 859 | 959 | 60959 | 02/11/1942 | GHD HTN HTN 64A STM 64B HAY 64A 64B 64A 61B W |
Gateshead Heaton Heaton St Margarets St Margarets Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
02/11/1942 06/02/1949 12/02/1949 13/02/1949 19/02/1949 06/03/1949 12/03/1949 28/10/1957 21/04/1958 11/04/1960 31/12/1962 01/07/1963 |
01/07/1963 | |
V2 | 3672 | 860 | 960 | 60960 | 11/11/1942 | YK 51A 51L W |
York (North) Darlington Thornaby Withdrawn |
11/11/1942 14/06/1959 13/09/1959 26/02/1962 |
26/02/1962 | |
V2 | 3673 | 861 | 961 | 60961 | 02/12/1942 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
02/12/1942 05/04/1965 |
05/04/1965 | |
V2 | 3674 | 862 | 962 | 60962 | 23/12/1942 | YK 52B 52A W |
York (North) Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
23/12/1942 10/06/1956 16/06/1963 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
V2 | 3675 | 863 | 963 | 60963 | 12/01/1943 | HTN GHD DAR YK YK W |
Heaton Gateshead Darlington York (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
12/01/1943 28/03/1943 24/11/1944 26/12/1948 01/01/1949 29/06/1965 |
29/06/1965 | |
V2 | 3676 | 864 | 964 | 964 | 60964 | 26/01/1943 | HTN GHD W |
Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/01/1943 28/03/1943 08/05/1964 |
08/05/1964 |
V2 | 3677 | 865 | 965 | 60965 | 25/02/1943 | GHD 64A W |
Gateshead St Margarets Withdrawn |
25/02/1943 30/11/1952 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3678 | 866 | 966 | 60966 | 15/03/1943 | GHD HTN NWE 38E 38E 35A 35B 35A 35B 34E 36A W |
Gateshead Heaton New England Woodford Halse Woodford Halse New England Grantham New England Grantham New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
15/03/1943 13/10/1946 29/01/1950 02/09/1951 08/09/1951 08/02/1953 18/09/1955 16/09/1956 13/10/1957 14/12/1958 25/03/1962 11/06/1963 |
11/06/1963 | |
V2 | 3679 | 867 | 967 | 60967 | 26/03/1943 | GHD 51L 50A W |
Gateshead Thornaby York (North) Withdrawn |
26/03/1943 12/06/1960 10/09/1961 10/02/1964 |
10/02/1964 | |
V2 | 3680 | 868 | 968 | 60968 | 15/04/1943 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
15/04/1943 20/05/1963 |
20/05/1963 | |
V2 | 3681 | 869 | 969 | 60969 | 29/04/1943 | DEE 64A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Withdrawn |
29/04/1943 20/10/1958 18/05/1964 |
18/05/1964 | |
V2 | 3682 | 870 | 970 | 60970 | 12/05/1943 | HAY EFD ABD PTH 61B 64A W |
Haymarket Eastfield Aberdeen Ferryhill Perth (LNER) Aberdeen Ferryhill St Margarets Withdrawn |
12/05/1943 05/11/1944 20/08/1945 12/06/1960 29/12/1962 19/07/1964 07/02/1966 |
07/02/1966 | |
V2 | 3683 | 871 | 971 | 60971 | 02/06/1943 | EFD DEE 64A W |
Eastfield Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Withdrawn |
02/06/1943 20/08/1945 13/10/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3684 | 872 | 972 | 60972 | 01/07/1943 | ABD EFD EFD HAY 62B 62B 61B W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill Eastfield Eastfield Haymarket Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
07/1943 01/07/1943 10/1943 20/08/1945 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 02/01/1956 28/11/1963 |
28/11/1963 | |
V2 | 3685 | 873 | 973 | 60973 | 27/04/1943 | HAY ABD DEE ABD PTH 62B W |
Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Perth (LNER) Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
27/04/1943 07/1943 10/1943 11/04/1945 30/05/1960 09/07/1962 24/01/1966 |
24/01/1966 | |
V2 | 3686 | 874 | 974 | 60974 | 19/08/1943 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
19/08/1943 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | |
V2 | 3687 | 875 | 975 | 60975 | 20/09/1943 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
20/09/1943 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 | |
V2 | 3688 | 876 | 976 | 60976 | 07/10/1943 | YK 56C 52B 52A 64A W |
York (North) Copley Hill (Leeds) Heaton Gateshead St Margarets Withdrawn |
07/10/1943 08/06/1958 14/09/1958 16/06/1963 10/10/1965 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
V2 | 3689 | 877 | 977 | 60977 | 27/10/1943 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
27/10/1943 26/02/1962 |
26/02/1962 | |
V2 | 3690 | 878 | 978 | 60978 | 09/12/1943 | YK 52B W |
York (North) Heaton Withdrawn |
09/12/1943 10/06/1956 19/11/1962 |
19/11/1962 | |
V2 | 3691 | 879 | 979 | 60979 | 20/01/1944 | YK 52B 52A W |
York (North) Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
20/01/1944 10/06/1956 06/07/1958 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
V2 | 3692 | 880 | 980 | 60980 | 10/03/1944 | HAY 64A 64A 64B 64B 64A 64A W |
Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
10/03/1944 08/01/1950 14/01/1950 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
V2 | 3693 | 881 | 981 | 60981 | 20/04/1944 | YK 51A 50A W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
20/04/1944 19/07/1953 27/09/1953 15/04/1963 |
15/04/1963 | |
V2 | 3694 | 882 | 982 | 60982 | 21/06/1944 | YK 51A 50A 51A 50A W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
21/06/1944 19/07/1953 27/09/1953 26/06/1955 25/09/1955 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | |
V2 | 3695 | 883 | 983 | 983 | 60983 | 13/07/1944 | DON GOR KX 34F W |
Doncaster Gorton Kings Cross Grantham Withdrawn |
13/07/1944 25/03/1945 06/10/1946 17/06/1962 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |