GNR/LNER Ivatt "Q2" Class 0-8-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13/09/1927 | Condemned | 3402 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
10/08/1932 | Reallocation | 3410 | CLK | Colwick | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/1933 | Condemned | 3453 | COND | ||||
15/06/1933 | Condemned | 3450 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
08/1933 | Condemned | 3455 | COND | ||||
09/1933 | Condemned | 3451 | COND | ||||
02/1934 | Condemned | 3452 | COND | ||||
02/1934 | Condemned | 3454 | COND | ||||
03/02/1934 | Condemned | 3406 | ARD | Ardsley | COND | ||
19/05/1934 | Condemned | 3421 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
16/06/1934 | Condemned | 3407 | ARD | Ardsley | COND | ||
26/06/1935 | Condemned | 3405 | ARD | Ardsley | COND | ||
18/10/1935 | Condemned | 3410 | ARD | Ardsley | COND | ||
17/12/1935 | Condemned | 3416 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
17/12/1935 | Condemned | 3417 | CLK | Colwick | COND |