LNER Robinson "O1" Class 2-8-0
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
333 | 5333 3506 3594 |
63594 | 11/1911 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 22/11/1947 | |
408 | 5408 3529 3678 |
63678 | 05/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 23/12/1944 | |
1195 | 6195 3542 3711 |
63711 | 09/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 10/10/1944 | |
1213 | 6213 3560 3773 |
63773 | 08/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 06/04/1946 | |
1214 | 6214 3561 3777 |
63777 | 09/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 02/11/1946 | |
1216 | 6216 3563 3789 |
63789 | 09/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 19/01/1946 | |
1220 | 6220 3567 3803 |
63803 | 10/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 09/06/1945 | |
1224 | 6224 3571 |
63571 | 10/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 27/08/1949 | |
1231 | 6231 3578 |
63578 | 11/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 13/10/1945 | |
1232 1232 |
6232 6232 3579 3579 |
3579 3579 63579 63579 |
11/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 13/03/1948 | |
1242 1242 |
6242 6242 3589 3589 |
63589 63589 |
12/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 28/04/1949 | |
1243 | 6243 3590 |
63590 | 12/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 16/12/1944 | |
1244 | 6244 3591 |
63591 | 12/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 15/04/1944 | |
1245 | 6245 3592 |
63592 | 12/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 05/10/1946 | |
1249 1249 |
6249 6249 3596 3596 |
63596 63596 |
12/1912 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 30/07/1949 | |
385 | 5385 3610 |
63610 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 29/07/1944 | |
394 | 5394 3619 |
63619 | 04/1914 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 17/03/1945 | |
6566 3740 |
63740 | 10/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 04/08/1945 | ||
2963 | 6571 3746 |
3746 63746 |
10/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 27/11/1948 | |
6575 3752 |
3752 63752 |
12/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 17/11/1945 | ||
2966 | 6578 3755 |
63755 | 12/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 21/10/1944 | |
2903 | 6356 3670 |
63670 | 09/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 16/03/1946 | |
2907 | 6350 3676 |
63676 | 11/1917 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 27/01/1945 | |
6324 3687 |
63687 | 02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 29/12/1945 | ||
6555 3630 |
63630 | 02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 30/06/1945 | ||
2870 | 6374 3646 |
3646 63646 |
02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 15/09/1945 | |
6545 3650 |
63650 | 03/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 26/05/1945 | ||
2901 2901 |
6371 6371 3652 3652 |
63652 63652 |
03/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 15/12/1945 | |
6359 3663 |
63663 | 08/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 16/06/1945 | ||
2971 | 6341 3689 |
63689 | 03/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 11/08/1945 | |
2933 | 6579 3760 |
63760 | 02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 31/08/1946 | |
6513 3768 |
63768 | 03/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 01/12/1945 | ||
6505 3780 |
63780 | 05/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 28/04/1945 | ||
6507 3784 |
3784 63784 |
05/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 24/06/1944 | ||
2894 | 6515 3786 |
63786 | 06/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 18/11/1944 | |
1283 | 6283 3792 |
63792 | 02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 16/09/1944 | |
2941 | 6595 3795 |
63795 | 02/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 12/02/1944 | |
6596 3796 |
63796 | 03/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 27/04/1946 | ||
2884 | 6601 3806 |
63806 | 05/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 12/08/1944 | |
2892 | 6519 3808 |
63808 | 05/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 10/02/1945 | |
6263 3817 |
63817 | 07/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 14/04/1945 | ||
2917 1334 |
6334 3712 |
63712 | 01/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 13/05/1944 | |
6261 3838 |
63838 | 11/1918 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 04/06/1949 | ||
2850 | 6526 3854 |
63854 | 06/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 07/06/1946 | |
2835 | 6617 3856 |
3856 63856 |
06/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 22/10/1949 | |
6533 3863 |
63863 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 01/09/1945 | ||
6535 3865 |
3865 63865 |
08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 09/02/1946 | ||
6624 3867 |
63867 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 02/09/1944 | ||
6625 3868 |
63868 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 24/02/1945 | ||
6626 3869 |
63869 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 02/12/1944 | ||
2845 | 6525 3872 |
63872 | 05/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 18/05/1946 | |
6630 3874 |
63874 | 06/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 10/06/1944 | ||
6288 6288 3879 3879 |
63879 63879 |
07/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 04/11/1944 | ||
6635 3886 |
63886 | 09/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 03/08/1946 | ||
6636 3887 |
63887 | 09/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 02/03/1946 | ||
2846 | 6639 3890 |
63890 | 05/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 06/07/1946 | |
6642 3901 |
63901 | 12/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 27/10/1945 | ||
2832 | 6328 3725 |
63725 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O4 to O1 | 31/03/1945 |