Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 381 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5889 Week
» 26791 Month
» 26791 Year
» 1248356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "N15" Class 0-6-2T


Class NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N15/2 7 9007 9126 69126 06/1910 EFD
65B
65D
W
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
18/01/1958
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/2 154 9154 9127 69127 06/1910 EFD
65B
61B
W
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
10/05/1958
16/06/1959
16/06/1959
N15/2 209 9209 9128 69128 06/1910 ABD
64A
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/07/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/2 210 9210 9129 69129 06/1910 ABD
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1958
02/12/1958
N15/2 251 9251 9130 69130 06/1910 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/12/1957
27/12/1957
N15/2 282 9282 9131 69131 07/1910 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/1 386 9386 9132 69132 06/1910 THJ
66B
W
Thornton Junction
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
18/11/1960
18/11/1960
N15/1 387 9387 9133 69133 06/1910 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/08/1960
03/08/1960
N15/1 388 9388 9134 69134 07/1910 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1961
02/03/1961
N15/1 389 9389 9135 69135 07/1910 DFU
62B
64A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
05/07/1958
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 390 9390 9136 69136 07/1910 DFU
62B
62A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
19/12/1959
11/05/1961
11/05/1961
N15/1 391 9391 9137 69137 07/1910 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
N15/1 392 9392 9138 69138 07/1910 EFD
65B
61B
64A
W
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
28/09/1957
01/07/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 393 9393 9139 69139 07/1910 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/04/1958
26/04/1958
N15/1 396 9396 9140 69140 08/1910 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1958
13/06/1958
N15/1 397 9397 9141 69141 08/1910 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/09/1960
02/09/1960
N15/1 398 9398 9142 69142 08/1910 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1958
24/01/1958
N15/1 399 9399 9143 69143 08/1910 PKD
62A
66B
W
Parkhead
Thornton Junction
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
19/12/1959
16/09/1960
16/09/1960
N15/1 907 9907 9144 69144 07/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1960
25/02/1960
N15/1 908 9908 9145 69145 07/1912 PKD
66A
W
Parkhead
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
11/03/1960
11/03/1960
N15/1 909 9909 9146 69146 07/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1959
07/07/1959
N15/1 910 9910 9147 69147 08/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
06/06/1958
N15/1 911 9911 9148 69148 08/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1958
06/06/1958
N15/1 912 9912 9149 69149 08/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1960
22/03/1960
N15/1 913 9913 9150 69150 08/1912 THJ
62B
64A
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
10/05/1958
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 914 9914 9151 69151 08/1912 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1959
23/02/1959
N15/1 915 9915 9152 69152 08/1912 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/12/1958
30/12/1958
N15/1 916 9916 9153 69153 08/1912 THJ
W
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1958
22/09/1958
N15/1 917 9917 9154 69154 08/1912 DFU
62B
64A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
05/07/1958
18/11/1959
18/11/1959
N15/1 918 9918 9155 69155 08/1912 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
N15/1 919 9919 9156 69156 08/1912 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/1 920 9920 9157 69157 08/1912 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1958
09/04/1958
N15/1 921 9921 9158 69158 08/1912 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1958
18/05/1958
N15/1 922 9922 9159 69159 08/1912 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/10/1961
30/10/1961
N15/1 923 9923 9160 69160 08/1912 DFU
65A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/04/1958
14/08/1958
14/08/1958
N15/1 924 9924 9161 69161 08/1912 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/08/1960
16/08/1960
N15/1 925 9925 9162 69162 08/1912 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1959
02/03/1959
N15/1 926 9926 9163 69163 08/1912 EFD
65D
65A
65B
65A
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
12/06/1954
06/07/1957
31/08/1957
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/1 219 9219 9185 69185 05/1913 CAR
65A
64A
W
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1951
29/12/1951
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
N15/1 223 9223 9164 69164 05/1913 DFU
62B
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/08/1958
15/04/1959
15/04/1959
N15/1 224 9224 9165 69165 05/1913 EFD
65C
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
19/05/1960
19/05/1960
N15/1 229 9229 9166 69166 05/1913 EFD
65C
W
Eastfield
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
07/12/1959
07/12/1959
N15/1 230 9230 9167 69167 05/1913 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1957
20/12/1957
N15/1 246 9246 9168 69168 05/1913 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/02/1960
05/02/1960
N15/1 252 9252 9169 69169 05/1913 HAY
W
Haymarket
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/02/1959
09/02/1959
N15/1 257 9257 9170 69170 05/1913 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/01/1960
06/01/1960
N15/1 264 9264 9171 69171 05/1913 PKD
65A
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
16/06/1960
16/06/1960
N15/1 47 9047 9172 69172 08/1916 STM
64A
W
St Margarets
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1955
13/11/1958
13/11/1958
N15/1 54 9054 9173 69173 08/1916 STM
64B
64A
W
St Margarets
Haymarket
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/05/1955
06/08/1955
12/01/1961
12/01/1961
N15/1 61 9061 9174 69174 09/1916 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
15/11/1958
N15/1 65 9065 9175 69175 09/1916 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1958
07/10/1958
N15/1 69 9069 9176 69176 10/1916 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
12/08/1959
12/08/1959
N15/1 70 9070 9177 69177 12/1916 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
09/08/1960
09/08/1960
N15/1 276 9276 9179 69179 01/1917 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/09/1960
29/09/1960
N15/1 453 9453 9180 69180 01/1917 EFD
65B
65A
61A
W
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
05/07/1958
11/04/1959
20/03/1961
20/03/1961
N15/1 142 9142 9181 69181 02/1917 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/1 165 9165 9182 69182 03/1917 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/09/1959
02/09/1959
N15/1 166 9166 9183 69183 03/1917 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1961
13/11/1961
N15/1 259 9259 9184 69184 03/1917 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
23/11/1960
23/11/1960
N15/1 20 9020 9186 69186 02/1920 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/07/1959
31/07/1959
N15/1 22 9022 9187 69187 02/1920 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/12/1959
08/12/1959
N15/1 29 9029 9188 69188 02/1920 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 49 9049 9189 69189 02/1920 EFD
65B
61B
W
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
31/08/1957
18/04/1958
18/04/1958
N15/1 96 9096 9190 69190 02/1920 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/08/1960
16/08/1960
N15/1 97 9097 9191 69191 02/1920 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 106 9106 9192 69192 02/1920 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1959
02/03/1959
N15/1 107 9107 9193 69193 03/1920 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1958
07/08/1958
N15/1 108 9108 9194 69194 03/1920 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
22/10/1960
N15/1 240 9240 9195 69195 03/1920 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1958
14/03/1958
N15/1 519 9519 9196 69196 01/1923 KPS
66C
W
Kipps
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 520 9520 9197 69197 01/1923 CAR
65A
W
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1951
18/12/1959
18/12/1959
N15/1 521 9521 9198 69198 02/1923 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1960
06/06/1960
N15/1 522 9522 9199 69199 02/1923 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1961
18/05/1961
N15/1 523 9523 9200 69200 03/1923 POL
W
Polmont
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/06/1958
13/06/1958
N15/1 524 9524 9201 69201 03/1923 DFU
61C
W
Dunfermline Upper
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/12/1957
10/01/1958
10/01/1958
N15/1 525 9525 9202 69202 03/1923 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1960
17/05/1960
N15/1 526 9526 9203 69203 03/1923 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
26/06/1958
26/06/1958
N15/1 527 9527 9204 69204 03/1923 DFU
62B
62A
W
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Thornton Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
19/12/1959
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
N15/1 528 9528 9205 69205 03/1923 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
18/02/1960
18/02/1960
N15/1 71 9071 9178 69178 12/1923 EFD
66A
66C
66B
W
Eastfield
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
22/12/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
N15/1 19 9019 9206 69206 10/1923 KPS
W
Kipps
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1960
17/05/1960
N15/1 23 9023 9207 69207 11/1923 KPS
66C
66A
W
Kipps
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
17/02/1960
17/02/1960
N15/1 31 9031 9208 69208 11/1923 EFD
65D
W
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1959
25/11/1959
N15/1 52 9052 9209 69209 11/1923 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
22/10/1960
N15/1 55 9055 9210 69210 11/1923 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/10/1957
29/10/1957
N15/1 60 9060 9211 69211 11/1923 THJ
64B
W
Thornton Junction
Haymarket
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 67 9067 9212 69212 12/1923 PKD
65A
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 74 9074 9213 69213 12/1923 PKD
W
Parkhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1959
19/10/1959
N15/1 75 9075 9214 69214 12/1923 PKD
65A
W
Parkhead
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
07/05/1959
07/05/1959
N15/1 76 9076 9215 69215 12/1923 CAR
W
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
N15/1 77 9077 9216 69216 12/1923 BGT
W
Bathgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1962
12/02/1962
N15/1 78 9078 9217 69217 02/1924 PKD
65D
W
Parkhead
Dawsholm
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1957
16/10/1959
16/10/1959
N15/1 79 9079 9218 69218 02/1924 CAR
65A
65D
65A
W
Carlisle Canal
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1951
26/08/1961
18/11/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
N15/1 99 9099 9219 69219 02/1924 STM
W
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1961
05/12/1961
N15/1 125 9125 9220 69220 03/1924 HAY
W
Haymarket
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1958
18/11/1958
N15/1   9147 9221 69221 03/1924 DFU
W
Dunfermline Upper
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1961
19/07/1961
N15/1   9174 9222 69222 03/1924 EFD
64A
W
Eastfield
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
22/05/1959
22/05/1959
N15/1   9225 9223 69223 03/1924 THJ
66B
W
Thornton Junction
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
13/08/1960
13/08/1960
N15/1   9227 9224 69224 04/1924 THJ
62B
61C
61B
64A
W
Thornton Junction
Dundee Tay Bridge
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
St Margarets
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/08/1957
12/04/1958
11/04/1959
01/07/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962