Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 529 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4341 Week
» 33839 Month
» 370685 Year
» 1592250 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "N14" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/1947 Condemned 9121       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 9122       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 9123       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9120     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9124     EFD Eastfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9125     KIT Kittybrewster  
03/11/1950 Condemned 69124 EFD Eastfield   COND  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 69125 KIT Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
25/03/1954 Condemned 69120 EFD Eastfield   COND  
25/03/1954 Condemned 69125 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND