Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 114 Today
» 1094 Yesterday
» 5845 Week
» 17138 Month
» 281771 Year
» 1503336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "N14" Class 0-6-2T


Class NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N14 858 9858 9120 69120 09/1909 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/03/1954
25/03/1954
N14 859 9859 9121   09/1909 W Withdrawn 09/1947 09/1947
N14 860 9860 9122   09/1909 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
N14 861 9861 9123   09/1909 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
N14 862 9862 9124 69124 09/1909 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1950
03/11/1950
N14 863 9863 9125 69125 09/1909 KIT
61B
W
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
25/03/1954
25/03/1954