HBR/LNER Stirling "N13" Class 0-6-2T
Class | HBR | NER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Date Withdrawn | Modification | Modification Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N13 | 13 | 3013 | 2405 | 9110 | (69110) | 11/1913 | 26/06/1948 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 09/1926 |
N13 | 15 | 3015 | 2407 | 9111 | 69111 | 12/1913 | 21/08/1952 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 01/1931 |
N13 | 18 | 3018 | 2410 | 9112 | 69112 | 12/1913 | 24/11/1952 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 09/1933 |
N13 | 23 | 3023 | 2415 | 9113 | 69113 | 12/1913 | 04/05/1953 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 12/1932 |
N13 | 27 | 3027 | 2419 | 9114 | 69114 | 01/1914 | 22/10/1956 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 12/1930 |
N13 | 152 | 3152 | 2533 | 9115 | 69115 | 01/1914 | 18/05/1955 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 10/1933 |
N13 | 153 | 3153 | 2534 | 9116 | 69116 | 02/1914 | 20/12/1954 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 05/1933 |
N13 | 154 | 3154 | 2535 | 9117 | 69117 | 02/1914 | 05/07/1955 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 10/1933 |
N13 | 155 | 3155 | 2536 | 9118 | 69118 | 03/1914 | 26/05/1952 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 09/1932 |
N13 | 156 | 3156 | 2537 | 9119 | 69119 | 03/1914 | 05/07/1955 | LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted | 08/1934 |