Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 479 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4339 Week
» 6921 Month
» 271554 Year
» 1493119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

HBR/LNER Stirling "N13" Class 0-6-2T


HBR NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
13 3013 2405 9110 69110 11/1913 26/06/1948 Hull Springhead 34.58
15 3015 2407 9111 69111 12/1913 21/08/1952 Hull Springhead 38.67
18 3018 2410 9112 69112 12/1913 24/11/1952 Hull Springhead 38.92
23 3023 2415 9113 69113 12/1913 04/05/1953 Neville Hill 39.42
27 3027 2419 9114 69114 01/1914 22/10/1956 Neville Hill 42.75
152 3152 2533 9115 69115 01/1914 18/05/1955 Neville Hill 41.33
153 3153 2534 9116 69116 02/1914 20/12/1954 Neville Hill 40.83
154 3154 2535 9117 69117 02/1914 05/07/1955 Neville Hill 41.42
155 3155 2536 9118 69118 03/1914 26/05/1952 Neville Hill 38.17
156 3156 2537 9119 69119 03/1914 05/07/1955 Neville Hill 41.33