Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 567 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4427 Week
» 7009 Month
» 271642 Year
» 1493207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

HBR/LNER Stirling "N13" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9110     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9111     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9112     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9113     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9114     NEV Neville Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9115     NEV Neville Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9116     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9117     NEV Neville Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9118     NEV Neville Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9119     HLS Hull Springhead  
26/06/1948 Condemned 9110 HLS Hull Springhead   COND  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 69111 HLS Hull Springhead 53C Hull Springhead  
26/05/1952 Condemned 69118 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
21/08/1952 Condemned 69111 53C Hull Springhead   COND  
24/11/1952 Condemned 69112 HLS Hull Springhead   COND  
17/01/1953 Reallocation 69113 HLS Hull Springhead 50B Neville Hill  
04/05/1953 Condemned 69113 50B Neville Hill   COND  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 69116 HLS Hull Springhead 50B Neville Hill  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69119 HLS Hull Springhead 50B Neville Hill  
20/12/1954 Condemned 69116 50B Neville Hill   COND  
18/05/1955 Condemned 69115 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
05/07/1955 Condemned 69117 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
05/07/1955 Condemned 69119 50B Neville Hill   COND  
22/10/1956 Condemned 69114 NEV Neville Hill   COND