Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 410 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4270 Week
» 6852 Month
» 271485 Year
» 1493050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

HBR/LNER Stirling "N13" Class 0-6-2T


Class HBR NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N13 13 3013 2405 9110 69110 11/1913 HLS
W
Hull Springhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/06/1948
26/06/1948
N13 15 3015 2407 9111 69111 12/1913 HLS
53C
W
Hull Springhead
Hull Springhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
21/08/1952
21/08/1952
N13 18 3018 2410 9112 69112 12/1913 HLS
W
Hull Springhead
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1952
24/11/1952
N13 23 3023 2415 9113 69113 12/1913 HLS
50B
W
Hull Springhead
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1953
04/05/1953
04/05/1953
N13 27 3027 2419 9114 69114 01/1914 NEV
W
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1956
22/10/1956
N13 152 3152 2533 9115 69115 01/1914 NEV
W
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1955
18/05/1955
N13 153 3153 2534 9116 69116 02/1914 HLS
50B
W
Hull Springhead
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
20/12/1954
20/12/1954
N13 154 3154 2535 9117 69117 02/1914 NEV
W
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/07/1955
05/07/1955
N13 155 3155 2536 9118 69118 03/1914 NEV
W
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/05/1952
26/05/1952
N13 156 3156 2537 9119 69119 03/1914 HLS
50B
W
Hull Springhead
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1953
05/07/1955
05/07/1955