Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 110 Today
» 1094 Yesterday
» 5841 Week
» 17134 Month
» 281767 Year
» 1503332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N10" Class 0-6-2T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
1138 NER Pre Grouping 9100 LNER 1946 Big Four on 27/01/1946
1109 NER Pre Grouping 9097 LNER 1946 Big Four on 10/02/1946
1148 NER Pre Grouping 9101 LNER 1946 Big Four on 10/02/1946
1785 NER Pre Grouping 9108 LNER 1946 Big Four on 10/02/1946
1112 NER Pre Grouping 9098 LNER 1946 Big Four on 17/02/1946
1667 NER Pre Grouping 9091 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 03/1946
1132 NER Pre Grouping 9099 LNER 1946 Big Four on 10/03/1946
1321 NER Pre Grouping 9090 LNER 1946 Big Four on 17/03/1946
1317 NER Pre Grouping 9102 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 04/1946
1683 NER Pre Grouping 9092 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 04/1946
1697 NER Pre Grouping 9093 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 05/1946
1716 NER Pre Grouping 9109 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 08/1946
89 NER Pre Grouping 9095 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 08/1946
1699 NER Pre Grouping 9105 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 09/1946
1706 NER Pre Grouping 9103 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 11/1946
1707 NER Pre Grouping 9106 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 11/1946
1710 NER Pre Grouping 9104 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 11/1946
1774 NER Pre Grouping 9094 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 11/1946
429 NER Pre Grouping 9096 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 11/1946
1711 NER Pre Grouping 9107 LNER 1946 Big Four m/e 12/1946
9109 LNER Big Four 69109 BR   British Rail m/e 07/1948
9099 LNER Big Four 69099 BR   British Rail m/e 11/1948
9091 LNER Big Four 69091 BR   British Rail m/e 12/1948
9102 LNER Big Four 69102 BR   British Rail m/e 12/1948
9090 LNER Big Four 69090 BR   British Rail m/e 01/1949
9093 LNER Big Four 69093 BR   British Rail m/e 03/1949
9107 LNER Big Four 69107 BR   British Rail m/e 04/1949
9098 LNER Big Four 69098 BR   British Rail m/e 05/1949
9104 LNER Big Four 69104 BR   British Rail m/e 05/1949
9105 LNER Big Four 69105 BR   British Rail m/e 06/1949
9106 LNER Big Four 69106 BR   British Rail m/e 06/1949
9108 LNER Big Four 69108 BR   British Rail m/e 10/1949
9094 LNER Big Four 69094 BR   British Rail m/e 11/1949
9101 LNER Big Four 69101 BR   British Rail m/e 11/1949
9097 LNER Big Four 69097 BR   British Rail m/e 03/1950
9096 LNER Big Four 69096 BR   British Rail m/e 05/1950
9095 LNER Big Four 69095 BR   British Rail m/e 10/1950
9100 LNER Big Four 69100 BR   British Rail on 25/11/1950
9092 LNER Big Four 69092 BR   British Rail m/e 12/1950