Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 113 Today
» 1094 Yesterday
» 5844 Week
» 17137 Month
» 281770 Year
» 1503335 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N10" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9090     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9091     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9092     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9093     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9094     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9095     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9096     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9097     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9098     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9099     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9100     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9101     NLN Northallerton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9102     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 69103     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9104     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9105     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9106     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9107     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9108     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9109     GHD Gateshead  
11/1948 Condemned 69103 GHD Gateshead   COND  
12/1949 Reallocation 9092 GHD Gateshead BOR Borough Gardens  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 69105 GHD Gateshead 54B Tyne Dock  
17/02/1951 Reallocation 69101 NLN Northallerton 54A Sunderland  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69095 BLA Blaydon 52A Gateshead  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 69098 HLD Hull Dairycoates 50B Neville Hill  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 69093 GHD Gateshead 54B Tyne Dock  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 69102 GHD Gateshead 54B Tyne Dock  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 69106 GHD Gateshead 54B Tyne Dock  
25/10/1955 Condemned 69095 52A Gateshead   COND  
19/11/1956 Condemned 69090 GHD Gateshead   COND  
26/11/1956 Condemned 69091 GHD Gateshead   COND  
01/07/1957 Condemned 69094 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
30/07/1957 Condemned 69108 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
24/09/1957 Condemned 69098 50B Neville Hill   COND  
25/11/1957 Condemned 69100 GHD Gateshead   COND  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69102 54B Tyne Dock 52A Gateshead  
23/12/1957 Condemned 69093 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
27/12/1957 Condemned 69096 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
27/12/1957 Condemned 69107 GHD Gateshead   COND  
10/02/1958 Condemned 69099 GHD Gateshead   COND  
17/03/1958 Condemned 69104 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/03/1958 Condemned 69106 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
19/07/1958 Reallocation 69101 54A Sunderland 54B Tyne Dock  
09/02/1959 Condemned 69102 52A Gateshead   COND  
06/04/1959 Condemned 69092 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 69101 54B Tyne Dock 52A Gateshead  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 69105 54B Tyne Dock 52A Gateshead  
16/06/1961 Condemned 69105 52A Gateshead   COND  
09/04/1962 Condemned 69097 GHD Gateshead   COND  
09/04/1962 Condemned 69101 52A Gateshead   COND  
09/04/1962 Condemned 69109 GHD Gateshead   COND