Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 96 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4733 Week
» 16026 Month
» 280659 Year
» 1502224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N9" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1617     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1618     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1640     EHL East Hartlepool  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1641     DAR.2 Barnard Castle  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1642     DAR.2 Barnard Castle  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1643     DAR Darlington  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1644     EHL East Hartlepool  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1645     BLA Blaydon  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1646     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1647     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1648     AFP Annfield Plain  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1649     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1650     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1651     EHL East Hartlepool  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1652     AFP Annfield Plain  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1653     HLS Hull Springhead  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1654     AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1655     EHL East Hartlepool  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 383     EHL East Hartlepool  
01/01/1923 Reallocation 1705     EHL East Hartlepool  
06/1946 Condemned 1645 BLA Blaydon   COND  
08/1947 Condemned 9412 EHL East Hartlepool   COND  
12/1947 Condemned 9416 EHL East Hartlepool   COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9410 HLS Hull Springhead TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9411 DAR Darlington CON Consett  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9413 DAR.2 Barnard Castle SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9414 DAR.2 Barnard Castle CON Consett  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9415 DAR Darlington DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9418 AUK West Auckland DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9419 HLD Hull Dairycoates HAV Haverton Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9420 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9421 HLS Hull Springhead SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9422 HLS Hull Springhead AUK West Auckland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9423 EHL East Hartlepool NLN Northallerton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9425 HLS Hull Springhead SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9426 AUK West Auckland DAR Darlington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9427 EHL East Hartlepool SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9428 EHL East Hartlepool SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9429 EHL East Hartlepool SUN Sunderland  
02/1948 Condemned 9419 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
07/1949 Condemned 9420 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 9421 SUN Sunderland   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 9415 DAR Darlington   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 9411 CON Consett   COND  
04/1950 Condemned 9422 AUK West Auckland   COND  
07/1950 Condemned 9414 CON Consett   COND  
08/1950 Condemned 9428 SUN Sunderland   COND  
23/09/1950 Reallocation 69418 DAR Darlington 54A Sunderland  
10/1950 Condemned 9410 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
11/1950 Condemned 9425 SUN Sunderland   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 9413 SUN Sunderland   COND  
01/01/1951 Condemned 69418 54A Sunderland   COND  
17/02/1951 Reallocation 69426 DAR Darlington 54A Sunderland  
07/1951 Condemned 9423 NLN Northallerton   COND  
23/02/1953 Condemned 69426 54A Sunderland   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69427 SUN Sunderland 54B Tyne Dock  
27/06/1955 Condemned 69424 PEL     COND  
27/06/1955 Condemned 69427 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
04/07/1955 Condemned 69429 SUN Sunderland   COND