Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 283 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3738 Week
» 15031 Month
» 279664 Year
» 1501229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N9" Class 0-6-2T


Class NER LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N9 1617 9410 69410 05/1893 HLS
TDK
W
Hull Springhead
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
10/1950
10/1950
N9 1618 9411 69411 06/1893 DAR
CON
W
Darlington
Consett
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
N9 1640 9412   06/1893 EHL
W
East Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
08/1947
08/1947
N9 1641 9413 69413 06/1893 Dar
SUN
W
Barnard Castle
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
12/1950
12/1950
N9 1642 9414 69414 07/1893 Dar
CON
W
Barnard Castle
Consett
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
07/1950
07/1950
N9 1643 9415 69415 08/1893 DAR
DAR
W
Darlington
Darlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
N9 1644 9416   08/1893 EHL
W
East Hartlepool
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
12/1947
12/1947
N9 1645 9417   08/1893 BLA
W
Blaydon
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
06/1946
06/1946
N9 1646 9418 69418 09/1893 AUK
DAR
54A
W
West Auckland
Darlington
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
23/09/1950
01/01/1951
01/01/1951
N9 1647 9419 69419 09/1893 HLD
HAV
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
02/1948
02/1948
N9 1648 9420 69420 10/1893 AFP
TDK
W
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
07/1949
07/1949
N9 1649 9421 69421 11/1893 HLS
SUN
W
Hull Springhead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
N9 1650 9422 69422 11/1893 HLS
AUK
W
Hull Springhead
West Auckland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
04/1950
04/1950
N9 1651 9423 69423 12/1893 EHL
NLN
W
East Hartlepool
Northallerton
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
07/1951
07/1951
N9 1652 9424 69424 12/1893 AFP

W
Annfield Plain

Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
27/06/1955
27/06/1955
N9 1653 9425 69425 12/1893 HLS
SUN
W
Hull Springhead
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
11/1950
11/1950
N9 1654 9426 69426 12/1893 AUK
DAR
54A
W
West Auckland
Darlington
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
17/02/1951
23/02/1953
23/02/1953
N9 1655 9427 69427 12/1893 EHL
SUN
54B
W
East Hartlepool
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
27/06/1955
27/06/1955
N9 383 9428 69428 02/1894 EHL
SUN
W
East Hartlepool
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
08/1950
08/1950
N9 1705 9429 69429 02/1894 EHL
SUN
W
East Hartlepool
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1923
01/01/1948
04/07/1955
04/07/1955