Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1068 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4928 Week
» 7510 Month
» 272143 Year
» 1493708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N8" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
07/1929 Condemned 238       COND  
12/1929 Condemned 528       COND  
04/1930 Condemned 428       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 351       COND  
01/1931 Condemned 1168       COND  
05/1931 Condemned 371       COND  
12/1931 Condemned 216       COND  
04/1932 Condemned 14       COND  
12/1932 Condemned 185       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 373       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 959       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 857       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 213       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 858       COND  
10/1936 Condemned 284       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 350       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 1145       COND  
01/1937 Condemned 509       COND  
01/1937 Condemned 215       COND  
01/1937 Condemned 287       COND  
03/1937 Condemned 809       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 523       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 531       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 504       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 860       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 349       COND  
12/1938 Condemned 856       COND  
07/1939 Condemned 1165       COND  
07/1939 Condemned 683       COND  
07/1939 Condemned 1124       COND  
09/1943 Condemned 218       COND  
12/1945 Condemned 445       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9371     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9372     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9373     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9374     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9375     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9376 91NE   HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9377     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9378     TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9379     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9380     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9381     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9382     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9383     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9384     CON Consett  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9385     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9386     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9387     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9389     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9390     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9391     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9392     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9393     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9394     CON Consett  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9395     TDK Tyne Dock  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9396     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9397     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9398     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9399     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9400     SUN Sunderland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9401     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
04/10/1948 Condemned 9399 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/1949 Condemned 69374 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/1949 Condemned 69375 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/1949 Condemned 69384 CON Consett   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 69383 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 69396 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
08/1949 Condemned 69397 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 69376 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 69373 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
25/11/1950 Condemned 69380 HTN Heaton   COND  
27/11/1950 Condemned 69372 HTN Heaton   COND  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 69391 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
28/08/1951 Condemned 69401 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
10/1951 Condemned 69400 SUN Sunderland   COND  
15/10/1951 Condemned 69398 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
10/03/1952 Condemned 69371 HTN Heaton   COND  
07/07/1952 Condemned 69387 HTN Heaton   COND  
07/07/1952 Condemned 69389 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/07/1952 Condemned 69382 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
18/08/1952 Condemned 69395 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69390 HTN Heaton 54D Consett  
20/10/1952 Condemned 69379 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
27/10/1952 Condemned 69393 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
16/02/1953 Condemned 69391 52B Heaton   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69377 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69392 HLD Hull Dairycoates 54A Sunderland  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69378 TDK Tyne Dock 53C Hull Springhead  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 69378 53C Hull Springhead 53D Bridlington  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69390 54D Consett 54A Sunderland  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69394 CON Consett 54B Tyne Dock  
27/10/1954 Condemned 69385 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
28/02/1955 Condemned 69386 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
04/05/1955 Condemned 69392 54A Sunderland   COND  
28/06/1955 Condemned 69377 52B Heaton   COND  
28/06/1955 Condemned 69381 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
26/09/1955 Condemned 69378 53D Bridlington   COND  
03/10/1955 Condemned 69394 54B Tyne Dock   COND  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69390 54A Sunderland 54B Tyne Dock  
18/10/1956 Condemned 69390 54B Tyne Dock   COND