Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 368 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4228 Week
» 6810 Month
» 271443 Year
» 1493008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "N8" Class 0-6-2T


Class NER LNER (Replace) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N8 14       06/1886 W Withdrawn 04/1932 04/1932
N8 531       06/1886 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
N8 185       07/1886 W Withdrawn 12/1932 12/1932
N8 210   9371 69371 07/1886 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/03/1952
10/03/1952
N8 212   9372 69372 08/1886 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1950
27/11/1950
N8 428       08/1886 W Withdrawn 04/1930 04/1930
N8 504       09/1886 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
N8 528       09/1886 W Withdrawn 12/1929 12/1929
N8 535   9373 69373 10/1886 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
N8 1165       11/1886 W Withdrawn 07/1939 07/1939
N8 9   9374 69374 01/1888 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
N8 74   9375 69375 03/1888 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
N8 855 856 9376 69376 10/1888
HLD
W
(Re-instd)
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
12/1938
03/1939
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
N8 856       10/1888 W Withdrawn 12/1938 12/1938
N8 857       10/1888 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
N8 858       10/1888 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
N8 859   9377 69377 10/1888 HLD
52B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
28/06/1955
28/06/1955
N8 860       11/1888 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
N8 861   9378 69378 11/1888 TDK
53C
53D
W
Tyne Dock
Hull Springhead
Bridlington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1953
19/12/1953
26/09/1955
26/09/1955
N8 862   9379 69379 11/1888 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1952
20/10/1952
N8 863   9380 69380 11/1888 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1950
N8 864   9381 69381 12/1888 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/06/1955
28/06/1955
N8 219   9382 69382 12/1888 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1952
17/07/1952
N8 371       12/1888 W Withdrawn 05/1931 05/1931
N8 213       12/1888 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
N8 284       12/1888 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
N8 683       12/1888 W Withdrawn 07/1939 07/1939
N8 346   9383 69383 02/1889 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
N8 348   9384 69384 02/1889 CON
W
Consett
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
N8 349       02/1889 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
N8 350       03/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
N8 351       03/1889 W Withdrawn 09/1930 09/1930
N8 373       04/1889 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
N8 1124       04/1889 W Withdrawn 07/1939 07/1939
N8 1145       04/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
N8 1152   9385 69385 04/1889 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1954
27/10/1954
N8 1127   9386 69386 05/1889 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1955
28/02/1955
N8 136   9387 69387 05/1889 HTN
W
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1952
07/07/1952
N8 445   9388   05/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1945 12/1945
N8 523       05/1889 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
N8 509       06/1889 W Withdrawn 01/1937 01/1937
N8 1105   9389 69389 06/1889 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1952
07/07/1952
N8 215       10/1889 W Withdrawn 01/1937 01/1937
N8 216       10/1889 W Withdrawn 12/1931 12/1931
N8 218       11/1889 W Withdrawn 09/1943 09/1943
N8 238       11/1889 W Withdrawn 07/1929 07/1929
N8 345   9390 69390 11/1889 HTN
54D
54A
54B
W
Heaton
Consett
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
20/02/1954
12/11/1955
18/10/1956
18/10/1956
N8 515   9391 69391 11/1889 HLD
52B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Heaton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/01/1951
16/02/1953
16/02/1953
N8 573   9392 69392 12/1889 HLD
54A
W
Hull Dairycoates
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
04/05/1955
04/05/1955
N8 809       12/1889 W Withdrawn 03/1937 03/1937
N8 1072   9393 69393 12/1889 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1952
27/10/1952
N8 1168       12/1889 W Withdrawn 01/1931 01/1931
N8 76   9394 69394 02/1890 CON
54B
W
Consett
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/02/1954
03/10/1955
03/10/1955
N8 267   9395 69395 02/1890 TDK
W
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1952
18/08/1952
N8 271   9396 69396 03/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
N8 287       03/1890 W Withdrawn 01/1937 01/1937
N8 780   9397 69397 03/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
N8 959       03/1890 W Withdrawn 05/1934 05/1934
N8 961   9398 69398 04/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/10/1951
15/10/1951
N8 1091   9399 69399 04/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1948
04/10/1948
N8 1104   9400 69400 04/1890 SUN
W
Sunderland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1951
10/1951
N8 293   9401 69401 05/1890 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/08/1951
28/08/1951