GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1944) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2632 | 9672 | 69672 | 11/1927 | 05/10/1959 | 31.92 | ||||||||
2633 | 9673 | 69673 | 11/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 33.83 | ||||||||
2634 | 9674 | 69674 | 11/1927 | 12/06/1961 | 33.58 | ||||||||
2635 | 9675 | 69675 | 11/1927 | 26/06/1961 | 33.58 | ||||||||
2636 | 9676 | 69676 | 12/1927 | 16/02/1959 | 31.17 | ||||||||
2637 | 9677 | 69677 | 12/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 32.92 | ||||||||
2638 | 9678 | 69678 | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2639 | 9679 | 69679 | 01/1928 | 17/01/1961 | 33 | ||||||||
2640 | 9680 | 69680 | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2641 | 9681 | 69681 | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | 32.83 | ||||||||
2642 | 9682 | 69682 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2643 | 9683 | 69683 | 07/1927 | 15/02/1960 | 32.58 | ||||||||
2644 | 9684 | 69684 | 07/1927 | 29/08/1960 | 33.08 | ||||||||
2645 | 9685 | 69685 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2646 | 9686 | 69686 | 07/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34.17 | ||||||||
2647 | 9687 | 69687 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2648 | 9688 | 69688 | 07/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.33 | ||||||||
2649 | 9689 | 69689 | 08/1927 | 25/03/1957 | 29.58 | ||||||||
2650 | 9690 | 69690 | 08/1927 | 13/01/1961 | 33.42 | ||||||||
2651 | 9691 | 69691 | 08/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.33 | ||||||||
2652 | 9692 | 69692 | 08/1927 | 16/09/1962 | 35.08 | ||||||||
2653 | 9693 | 69693 | 08/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34.08 | ||||||||
2654 | 9694 | 69694 | 08/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.25 | ||||||||
2655 | 9695 | 69695 | 08/1927 | 01/12/1958 | 31.33 | ||||||||
2656 | 9696 | 69696 | 08/1927 | 27/04/1961 | 33.67 | ||||||||
2657 | 9697 | 69697 | 09/1927 | 16/09/1962 | 35 | ||||||||
2658 | 9698 | 69698 | 09/1927 | 10/09/1961 | 34 | ||||||||
2659 | 9699 | 69699 | 09/1927 | 24/11/1960 | 33.17 | ||||||||
2660 | 9700 | 69700 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.25 | ||||||||
2661 | 9701 | 69701 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | 33.25 |