GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1944) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9622 | 69622 | 08/1925 | 24/11/1959 | 34.25 | ||||||||
421 | 9623 | 69623 | 09/1925 | 12/02/1959 | 33.42 | ||||||||
426 | 9624 | 69624 | 10/1925 | 01/12/1958 | 33.17 | ||||||||
456 | 9625 | 69625 | 10/1925 | 17/04/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
457 | 9626 | 69626 | 10/1925 | 08/06/1959 | 33.67 | ||||||||
460 | 9627 | 69627 | 11/1925 | 23/03/1959 | 33.33 | ||||||||
464 | 9628 | 69628 | 11/1925 | 01/12/1958 | 33.08 | ||||||||
471 | 9629 | 69629 | 11/1925 | 29/08/1960 | 34.75 | ||||||||
473 | 9630 | 69630 | 11/1925 | 24/11/1960 | 35 | ||||||||
475 | 9631 | 69631 | 12/1925 | 23/01/1961 | 35.08 | ||||||||
826 | 9632 | 69632 | 01/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.67 | ||||||||
827 | 9633 | 69633 | 02/1926 | 10/08/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
828 | 9634 | 69634 | 02/1926 | 13/01/1959 | 32.92 | ||||||||
829 | 9635 | 69635 | 02/1926 | 09/03/1959 | 33.08 | ||||||||
830 | 9636 | 69636 | 03/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.67 | ||||||||
832 | 9637 | 69637 | 04/1926 | 31/03/1959 | 32.92 | ||||||||
833 | 9638 | 69638 | 04/1926 | 19/05/1959 | 33.08 | ||||||||
834 | 9639 | 69639 | 05/1926 | 05/01/1959 | 32.67 | ||||||||
837 | 9640 | 69640 | 06/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.25 | ||||||||
838 | 9641 | 69641 | 06/1926 | 01/12/1958 | 32.5 | ||||||||
850 | 9642 | 69642 | 07/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.33 | ||||||||
851 | 9643 | 69643 | 07/1926 | 19/05/1958 | 31.83 | ||||||||
852 | 9644 | 69644 | 09/1926 | 27/01/1959 | 32.33 | ||||||||
853 | 9645 | 69645 | 09/1926 | 01/11/1960 | 34.17 | ||||||||
865 | 9646 | 69646 | 10/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 35.92 | ||||||||
866 | 9647 | 69647 | 10/1926 | 24/11/1960 | 34.08 | ||||||||
867 | 9648 | 69648 | 11/1926 | 29/08/1960 | 33.75 | ||||||||
868 | 9649 | 69649 | 12/1926 | 27/07/1959 | 32.58 | ||||||||
870 | 9650 | 69650 | 12/1926 | 19/05/1959 | 32.42 | ||||||||
873 | 9651 | 69651 | 02/1927 | 13/01/1961 | 33.92 | ||||||||
907 | 9652 | 69652 | 10/1925 | 04/12/1960 | 35.17 | ||||||||
912 | 9653 | 69653 | 10/1925 | 03/05/1962 | 36.58 | ||||||||
913 | 9654 | 69654 | 10/1925 | 04/12/1960 | 35.17 | ||||||||
916 | 9655 | 69655 | 10/1925 | 10/08/1959 | 33.83 | ||||||||
918 | 9656 | 69656 | 10/1925 | 10/04/1961 | 35.5 | ||||||||
919 | 9657 | 69657 | 10/1925 | 08/06/1959 | 33.67 | ||||||||
935 | 9658 | 69658 | 10/1925 | 07/04/1961 | 35.5 | ||||||||
940 | 9659 | 69659 | 11/1925 | 19/01/1959 | 33.17 | ||||||||
941 | 9660 | 69660 | 11/1925 | 18/05/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
947 | 9661 | 69661 | 11/1925 | 19/10/1959 | 33.92 | ||||||||
950 | 9662 | 69662 | 11/1925 | 04/05/1959 | 33.5 | ||||||||
952 | 9663 | 69663 | 12/1925 | 01/11/1960 | 34.92 | ||||||||
964 | 9664 | 69664 | 12/1925 | 30/11/1960 | 34.92 | ||||||||
966 | 9665 | 69665 | 12/1925 | 29/02/1960 | 34.17 | ||||||||
967 | 9666 | 69666 | 12/1925 | 09/03/1959 | 33.25 | ||||||||
968 | 9667 | 69667 | 12/1925 | 03/02/1959 | 33.17 | ||||||||
970 | 9668 | 69668 | 12/1925 | 10/09/1961 | 35.75 | ||||||||
971 | 9669 | 69669 | 12/1925 | 06/04/1959 | 33.33 | ||||||||
987 | 9670 | 69670 | 01/1926 | 10/09/1961 | 35.67 | ||||||||
988 | 9671 | 69671 | 01/1926 | 16/09/1962 | 36.67 |