Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 619 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1746 Week
» 13039 Month
» 277672 Year
» 1499237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9600     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9601     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9602     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9603     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9604     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9605     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9606     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9607     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9608     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9609     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9610     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9611     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9612     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9613     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9614     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9615     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9616     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9617     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9618     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9619     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9620     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9621     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9622     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9623     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9624     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9625     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9626     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9627     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9628     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9629     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9630     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9631     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9632     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9633     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9634     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9635     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9636     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9637     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9638     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9639     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9640     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9641     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9642     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9643     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9644     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9645     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9646     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9647     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9648     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9649     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9650     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9651     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9652     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9653     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9654     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9655     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9656     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9657     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9658     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9659     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9660     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9661     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9662     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9663     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9664     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9665     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9666     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9667     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9668     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9669     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9670     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9671     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9672     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9673     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9674     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9675     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9676     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9677     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9678     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9679     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9680     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9681     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9682     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9683     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9684     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9685     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9686     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9687     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9688     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9689     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9690     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9691     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9692     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9693     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9694     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9695     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9696     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9697     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9698     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9699     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9700     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9701     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9702     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9703     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9704     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9705     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9706     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9707     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9708     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9709     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9710     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9711     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9712     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9713     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9714     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9715     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9716     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9717     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9718     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9719     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9720     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9721     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9722     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9723     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9724     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9725     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9726     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9727     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9728     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9729     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9730     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9731     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9732     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9733     STR Stratford  
07/1949 Reallocation 9672 STR Stratford LIN Lincoln  
07/1949 Reallocation 9674 STR Stratford LIN Lincoln  
07/1949 Reallocation 69689 HAT Hatfield NEA Neasden  
07/1949 Reallocation 69690 HAT Hatfield NEA Neasden  
07/1949 Reallocation 69692 HAT Hatfield NEA Neasden  
07/1949 Reallocation 9717 STR Stratford IPS Ipswich  
07/1949 Reallocation 69719 STR Stratford IPS Ipswich  
06/05/1950 Reallocation 9672 LIN Lincoln 30A Stratford  
06/05/1950 Reallocation 9674 LIN Lincoln 40F Boston  
06/05/1950 Reallocation 69675 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
06/05/1950 Reallocation 69712 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 9674 40F Boston 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 9697 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69699 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 9700 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69711 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69716 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69717 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69719 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69726 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 69727 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
23/09/1950 Reallocation 69679 STR Stratford 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 69642 STR Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 69711 30E Colchester 31C Kings Lynn  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 69712 30A Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 69716 30A Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 69642 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 69711 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 69712 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 69716 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 69708 STR Stratford 32G Melton Constable  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 69703 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 69726 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69613 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69615 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69620 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69638 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69651 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69637 STR Stratford 38D Staveley (G.C.)  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69643 STR Stratford 38D Staveley (G.C.)  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69678 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69689 NEA Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69692 NEA Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69694 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69698 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69701 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69717 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 69720 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
18/08/1951 Reallocation 69698 34A Kings Cross 37A Ardsley  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69614 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69621 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69690 NEA Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69698 37A Ardsley 34A Kings Cross  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 69678 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 69708 32G Melton Constable 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 69717 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 69651 38A Colwick 38B Annesley  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69621 30A Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69654 STR Stratford 38A Colwick  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69716 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69719 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69612 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69635 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69677 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69648 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69678 30A Stratford 34C Hatfield  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69704 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69672 30A Stratford 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69716 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69717 30A Stratford 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69719 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69617 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69672 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69719 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 69621 38A Colwick 38E Woodford Halse  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69673 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69690 34A Kings Cross 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69696 HAT Hatfield 32A Norwich Thorpe  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 69709 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69621 38E Woodford Halse 38A Colwick  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 69719 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 69732 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 69613 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 69617 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 69635 30A Stratford 34C Hatfield  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 69649 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
20/03/1954 Reallocation 69708 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69615 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69620 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69621 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69631 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69637 38D Staveley (G.C.) 34C Hatfield  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69650 STR Stratford 34C Hatfield  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69654 38A Colwick 34C Hatfield  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 69692 34A Kings Cross 38B Annesley  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 69695 HAT Hatfield 37A Ardsley  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 69689 34A Kings Cross 38B Annesley  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 69691 HAT Hatfield 37A Ardsley  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 69694 34A Kings Cross 37A Ardsley  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 69696 32A Norwich Thorpe 37A Ardsley  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 69698 34A Kings Cross 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69638 38A Colwick 34A Kings Cross  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 69638 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69691 37A Ardsley 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69692 38B Annesley 30A Stratford  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69694 37A Ardsley 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69695 37A Ardsley 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69696 37A Ardsley 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 69708 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 69692 30A Stratford 38B Annesley  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 69708 30A Stratford 32D Yarmouth South Town  
19/02/1955 Reallocation 69720 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/03/1955 Reallocation 69689 38B Annesley 32D Yarmouth South Town  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 69720 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 69696 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 37C Bradford Hammerton Street  
17/12/1955 Reallocation 69618 STR Stratford 34B Hornsey  
17/12/1955 Reallocation 69619 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 69629 STR Stratford 34B Hornsey  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 69691 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 33A Plaistow  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 69695 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 33A Plaistow  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 69619 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 69672 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 69696 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 69612 30A Stratford 34B Hornsey  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 69615 30A Stratford 34B Hornsey  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 69690 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 69679 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 69698 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
25/08/1956 Reallocation 69706 STR Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 69691 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 69695 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 69720 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69651 38B Annesley 31A Cambridge  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69690 32C Lowestoft 31A Cambridge  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69692 38B Annesley 31A Cambridge  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69698 32D Yarmouth South Town 33B Tilbury  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69706 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69672 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69675 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69694 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 33B Tilbury  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69696 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 32D Yarmouth South Town  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69721 STR Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69727 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69733 STR Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69616 STR Stratford 31A Cambridge  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69617 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69619 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69620 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69721 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69727 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69733 30F Parkeston Quay 30E Colchester  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 69621 30A Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
25/03/1957 Condemned 69689 32D Yarmouth South Town   COND  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 69679 32C Lowestoft 32D Yarmouth South Town  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 69706 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69612 34B Hornsey 30E Colchester  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69615 34B Hornsey 32C Lowestoft  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69708 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69709 34C Hatfield 30E Colchester  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69613 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69679 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69696 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69708 32C Lowestoft 32D Yarmouth South Town  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69709 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69721 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
09/11/1957 Reallocation 69679 30A Stratford 33B Tilbury  
09/11/1957 Reallocation 69691 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 69617 31A Cambridge 31C Kings Lynn  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 69679 33B Tilbury 32D Yarmouth South Town  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 69694 33B Tilbury 31C Kings Lynn  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 69698 33B Tilbury 31C Kings Lynn  
28/04/1958 Condemned 69609 STR Stratford   COND  
05/05/1958 Condemned 69601 STR Stratford   COND  
19/05/1958 Condemned 69643 38D Staveley (G.C.)   COND  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69619 31A Cambridge 31C Kings Lynn  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69620 31A Cambridge 31C Kings Lynn  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69637 34C Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
22/07/1958 Condemned 69607 STR Stratford   COND  
11/08/1958 Condemned 69606 STR Stratford   COND  
11/08/1958 Condemned 69608 STR Stratford   COND  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 69690 31A Cambridge 32C Lowestoft  
13/09/1958 Reallocation 69651 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
13/09/1958 Reallocation 69692 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
13/09/1958 Reallocation 69695 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
06/10/1958 Condemned 69605 STR Stratford   COND  
01/12/1958 Condemned 69624 STR Stratford   COND  
01/12/1958 Condemned 69628 STR Stratford   COND  
01/12/1958 Condemned 69641 STR Stratford   COND  
01/12/1958 Condemned 69695 30A Stratford   COND  
06/12/1958 Reallocation 69617 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
06/12/1958 Reallocation 69619 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
13/12/1958 Reallocation 69615 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 69617 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 69652 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
01/01/1959 Condemned 69610 STR Stratford   COND  
01/01/1959 Condemned 69616 31A Cambridge   COND  
01/01/1959 Condemned 69703 30A Stratford   COND  
01/01/1959 Condemned 69717 30A Stratford   COND  
05/01/1959 Condemned 69639 STR Stratford   COND  
13/01/1959 Condemned 69634 STR Stratford   COND  
19/01/1959 Condemned 69659 STR Stratford   COND  
27/01/1959 Condemned 69644 STR Stratford   COND  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 69686 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
03/02/1959 Condemned 69600 STR Stratford   COND  
03/02/1959 Condemned 69667 STR Stratford   COND  
03/02/1959 Condemned 69731 STR Stratford   COND  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69618 34B Hornsey 34C Hatfield  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69679 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69708 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
12/02/1959 Condemned 69623 STR Stratford   COND  
12/02/1959 Condemned 69716 30A Stratford   COND  
16/02/1959 Condemned 69619 30A Stratford   COND  
16/02/1959 Condemned 69676 STR Stratford   COND  
07/03/1959 Reallocation 69620 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
07/03/1959 Reallocation 69698 31C Kings Lynn 34C Hatfield  
09/03/1959 Condemned 69635 34C Hatfield   COND  
09/03/1959 Condemned 69666 STR Stratford   COND  
23/03/1959 Condemned 69627 STR Stratford   COND  
28/03/1959 Reallocation 69629 34B Hornsey 34C Hatfield  
31/03/1959 Condemned 69637 34B Hornsey   COND  
04/04/1959 Reallocation 69692 30A Stratford 34C Hatfield  
06/04/1959 Condemned 69669 STR Stratford   COND  
17/04/1959 Condemned 69625 STR Stratford   COND  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 69690 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
04/05/1959 Condemned 69662 STR Stratford   COND  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 69686 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 69727 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
18/05/1959 Condemned 69660 STR Stratford   COND  
19/05/1959 Condemned 69638 34C Hatfield   COND  
19/05/1959 Condemned 69650 34C Hatfield   COND  
08/06/1959 Condemned 69626 STR Stratford   COND  
08/06/1959 Condemned 69657 STR Stratford   COND  
22/06/1959 Condemned 69705 STR Stratford   COND  
27/07/1959 Condemned 69602 STR Stratford   COND  
27/07/1959 Condemned 69603 STR Stratford   COND  
27/07/1959 Condemned 69649 34C Hatfield   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 69615 30A Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 69651 30A Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 69718 STR Stratford 31C Kings Lynn  
03/08/1959 Condemned 69612 30E Colchester   COND  
10/08/1959 Condemned 69604 STR Stratford   COND  
10/08/1959 Condemned 69633 STR Stratford   COND  
10/08/1959 Condemned 69655 STR Stratford   COND  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 69615 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 69718 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 69621 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 69706 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 69651 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
05/10/1959 Condemned 69672 30F Parkeston Quay   COND  
10/10/1959 Reallocation 69707 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
19/10/1959 Condemned 69661 STR Stratford   COND  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 69696 30A Stratford 34C Hatfield  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 69613 30E Colchester 30F Parkeston Quay  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 69673 30E Colchester 30F Parkeston Quay  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 69732 30E Colchester 30F Parkeston Quay  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 69733 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
09/11/1959 Condemned 69613 30F Parkeston Quay   COND  
23/11/1959 Condemned 69711 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1959 Condemned 69622 STR Stratford   COND  
05/12/1959 Reallocation 69730 STR Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 69617 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 69652 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69651 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69673 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69675 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69690 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69691 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69704 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69708 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69730 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69732 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 69654 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
15/02/1960 Condemned 69683 STR Stratford   COND  
29/02/1960 Condemned 69665 STR Stratford   COND  
04/07/1960 Condemned 69617 30A Stratford   COND  
23/07/1960 Reallocation 69694 31C Kings Lynn 30A Stratford  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 69651 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 69686 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 69691 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 69730 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
27/08/1960 Reallocation 69678 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
29/08/1960 Condemned 69629 34C Hatfield   COND  
29/08/1960 Condemned 69648 34C Hatfield   COND  
29/08/1960 Condemned 69684 STR Stratford   COND  
12/09/1960 Condemned 69615 30A Stratford   COND  
17/10/1960 Condemned 69733 30A Stratford   COND  
18/10/1960 Condemned 69704 30A Stratford   COND  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 69651 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 69686 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 69694 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 69730 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
01/11/1960 Condemned 69645 STR Stratford   COND  
01/11/1960 Condemned 69663 STR Stratford   COND  
01/11/1960 Condemned 69709 30A Stratford   COND  
01/11/1960 Condemned 69720 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69611 STR Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69620 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69630 STR Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69636 STR Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69642 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69647 STR Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69677 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69688 STR Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69694 30F Parkeston Quay   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69699 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69719 30A Stratford   COND  
24/11/1960 Condemned 69727 30A Stratford   COND  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 69679 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
30/11/1960 Condemned 69664 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69614 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69652 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69654 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69680 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69681 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69682 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69685 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69687 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69691 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69700 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69701 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69706 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69712 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69715 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69718 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69721 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69722 STR Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69726 30A Stratford   COND  
04/12/1960 Condemned 69729 STR Stratford   COND  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69618 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69631 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69632 STR Stratford 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69640 STR Stratford 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69651 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69679 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69690 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69692 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69696 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69698 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 69708 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
13/01/1961 Condemned 69651 30A Stratford   COND  
13/01/1961 Condemned 69690 30A Stratford   COND  
13/01/1961 Condemned 69708 30A Stratford   COND  
17/01/1961 Condemned 69679 30A Stratford   COND  
23/01/1961 Condemned 69631 34A Kings Cross   COND  
17/03/1961 Condemned 69702 STR Stratford   COND  
07/04/1961 Condemned 69658 STR Stratford   COND  
10/04/1961 Condemned 69656 STR Stratford   COND  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 69640 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 69692 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 69696 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 69698 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
22/04/1961 Reallocation 69618 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
22/04/1961 Reallocation 69632 34A Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
27/04/1961 Condemned 69696 30A Stratford   COND  
27/04/1961 Condemned 69707 30A Stratford   COND  
12/06/1961 Condemned 69674 30A Stratford   COND  
26/06/1961 Condemned 69675 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69618 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69668 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69670 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69673 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69678 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69686 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69693 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69698 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69710 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69713 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69714 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69723 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69724 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69728 STR Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69730 30A Stratford   COND  
10/09/1961 Condemned 69732 30A Stratford   COND  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 69717 98W   51L Thornaby  
03/05/1962 Condemned 69653 STR Stratford   COND  
11/09/1962 Condemned 69621 30A Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69632 30A Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69640 30A Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69646 STR Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69671 STR Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69692 30A Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69697 30A Stratford   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69725 STR Stratford   COND