Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 547 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1674 Week
» 12967 Month
» 277600 Year
» 1499165 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1944) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
N7/4 1000 8000 7978 9600 69600 01/1915 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/02/1959
03/02/1959
N7/4 1001 8001 7979 9601 69601 02/1915 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1958
05/05/1958
N7/4 1002 8002 7980 9602 69602 07/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
N7/4 1003 8003 7981 9603 69603 07/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
N7 1004 8004 7982 9604 69604 09/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1959
10/08/1959
N7 1005 8005 7983 9605 69605 09/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1958
06/10/1958
N7 1006 8006 7984 9606 69606 09/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1958
11/08/1958
N7 1007 8007 7985 9607 69607 10/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1958
22/07/1958
N7 1008 8008 7986 9608 69608 10/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1958
11/08/1958
N7 1009 8009 7987 9609 69609 10/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1958
28/04/1958
N7 1010 8010 7988 9610 69610 11/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
N7/4 1011 8011 7989 9611 69611 11/1921 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/4 990 7990   9612 69612 12/1923 STR
30A
34B
30E
W
Stratford
Stratford
Hornsey
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1952
16/06/1956
20/07/1957
03/08/1959
03/08/1959
N7/4 991 7991   9613 69613 12/1923 STR
38A
30A
30E
30F
W
Stratford
Colwick
Stratford
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
19/12/1953
19/10/1957
07/11/1959
09/11/1959
09/11/1959
N7/4 992 7992   9614 69614 12/1923 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/4 993 7993   9615 69615 01/1924 STR
38A
30A
34B
32C
30A
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Colwick
Stratford
Hornsey
Lowestoft
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
24/04/1954
16/06/1956
20/07/1957
13/12/1958
01/08/1959
15/08/1959
12/09/1960
12/09/1960
N7/4 994 7994   9616 69616 01/1924 STR
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1957
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
N7/4 995 7995   9617 69617 01/1924 STR
34C
30A
31A
31C
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Stratford
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
19/12/1953
16/02/1957
08/03/1958
06/12/1958
20/12/1958
12/12/1959
04/07/1960
04/07/1960
N7/4 996 7996   9618 69618 01/1924 STR
34B
34C
34A
30A
W
Stratford
Hornsey
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
07/02/1959
07/01/1961
22/04/1961
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/4 997 7997   9619 69619 02/1924 STR
30E
30A
31A
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
24/03/1956
16/02/1957
14/06/1958
06/12/1958
16/02/1959
16/02/1959
N7 998 7998   9620 69620 02/1924 STR
38A
30A
31A
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Colwick
Stratford
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
24/04/1954
16/02/1957
14/06/1958
07/03/1959
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7 999 7999   9621 69621 03/1924 STR
30A
38A
38E
38A
30A
32C
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Stratford
Lowestoft
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
19/07/1952
14/02/1953
20/06/1953
24/04/1954
16/03/1957
05/09/1959
11/09/1962
11/09/1962
N7/1   409   9622 69622 08/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1959
24/11/1959
N7/1   421   9623 69623 09/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1959
12/02/1959
N7/1   426   9624 69624 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1958
01/12/1958
N7/1   456   9625 69625 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1959
17/04/1959
N7/1   457   9626 69626 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/06/1959
08/06/1959
N7/5   460   9627 69627 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1959
23/03/1959
N7/5   464   9628 69628 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1958
01/12/1958
N7/5   471   9629 69629 11/1925 STR
34B
34C
W
Stratford
Hornsey
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1956
28/03/1959
29/08/1960
29/08/1960
N7/5   473   9630 69630 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/5   475   9631 69631 12/1925 STR
34C
34A
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
07/01/1961
23/01/1961
23/01/1961
N7/5   826   9632 69632 01/1926 STR
34A
30A
W
Stratford
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/01/1961
22/04/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/5   827   9633 69633 02/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1959
10/08/1959
N7/5   828   9634 69634 02/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/01/1959
13/01/1959
N7/5   829   9635 69635 02/1926 STR
30A
34C
W
Stratford
Stratford
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1952
19/12/1953
09/03/1959
09/03/1959
N7/1   830   9636 69636 03/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/1   832   9637 69637 04/1926 STR
38D
34C
34B
W
Stratford
Staveley (G.C.)
Hatfield
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
24/04/1954
14/06/1958
31/03/1959
31/03/1959
N7/1   833   9638 69638 04/1926 STR
38A
34A
34C
W
Stratford
Colwick
Kings Cross
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
21/08/1954
25/09/1954
19/05/1959
19/05/1959
N7/1   834   9639 69639 05/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/01/1959
05/01/1959
N7/1   837   9640 69640 06/1926 STR
34A
30A
W
Stratford
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/01/1961
15/04/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/1   838   9641 69641 06/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1958
01/12/1958
N7/1   850   9642 69642 07/1926 STR
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
25/11/1950
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/5   851   9643 69643 07/1926 STR
38D
W
Stratford
Staveley (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
19/05/1958
19/05/1958
N7/5   852   9644 69644 09/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1959
27/01/1959
N7/5   853   9645 69645 09/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1960
01/11/1960
N7/5   865   9646 69646 10/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/5   866   9647 69647 10/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/5   867   9648 69648 11/1926 STR
34C
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
29/08/1960
29/08/1960
N7/5   868   9649 69649 12/1926 STR
34C
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1953
27/07/1959
27/07/1959
N7/5   870   9650 69650 12/1926 STR
34C
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
19/05/1959
19/05/1959
N7/5   873   9651 69651 02/1927 STR
38A
38B
31A
30A
31C
30A
30F
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Colwick
Annesley
Cambridge
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
19/01/1952
20/10/1956
13/09/1958
01/08/1959
26/09/1959
30/01/1960
30/07/1960
22/10/1960
07/01/1961
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
N7/1   907   9652 69652 10/1925 STR
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
12/12/1959
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/1   912   9653 69653 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/05/1962
03/05/1962
N7/1   913   9654 69654 10/1925 STR
38A
34C
30A
W
Stratford
Colwick
Hatfield
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
24/04/1954
06/02/1960
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/1   916   9655 69655 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1959
10/08/1959
N7/1   918   9656 69656 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/04/1961
10/04/1961
N7/1   919   9657 69657 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/06/1959
08/06/1959
N7/1   935   9658 69658 10/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/04/1961
07/04/1961
N7/5   940   9659 69659 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1959
19/01/1959
N7/5   941   9660 69660 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
N7/5   947   9661 69661 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1959
19/10/1959
N7/5   950   9662 69662 11/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/05/1959
04/05/1959
N7/5   952   9663 69663 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1960
01/11/1960
N7/5   964   9664 69664 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1960
30/11/1960
N7/5   966   9665 69665 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/02/1960
29/02/1960
N7/5   967   9666 69666 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/03/1959
09/03/1959
N7/5   968   9667 69667 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/02/1959
03/02/1959
N7/1   970   9668 69668 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/1   971   9669 69669 12/1925 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/04/1959
06/04/1959
N7/1   987   9670 69670 01/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/1   988   9671 69671 01/1926 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/2   2632   9672 69672 11/1927 STR
LIN
30A
30A
30E
30A
30F
W
Stratford
Lincoln
Stratford
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
06/05/1950
18/10/1952
15/11/1952
24/03/1956
17/11/1956
05/10/1959
05/10/1959
N7/2   2633   9673 69673 11/1927 STR
30E
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
07/11/1959
30/01/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/2   2634   9674 69674 11/1927 STR
LIN
40F
30A
W
Stratford
Lincoln
Boston
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
06/05/1950
31/05/1950
12/06/1961
12/06/1961
N7/3   2635   9675 69675 11/1927 STR
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/05/1950
17/11/1956
30/01/1960
26/06/1961
26/06/1961
N7/3   2636   9676 69676 12/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1959
16/02/1959
N7/3   2637   9677 69677 12/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1952
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/3   2638   9678 69678 01/1928 STR
30E
30A
34C
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Hatfield
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
20/10/1951
20/09/1952
27/08/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2639   9679 69679 01/1928 STR
32A
32C
32D
30A
33B
32D
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Tilbury
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1950
21/07/1956
15/06/1957
19/10/1957
09/11/1957
08/03/1958
07/02/1959
26/11/1960
07/01/1961
17/01/1961
17/01/1961
N7/3   2640   9680 69680 02/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2641   9681 69681 02/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2642   9682 69682 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2643   9683 69683 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/02/1960
15/02/1960
N7/2   2644   9684 69684 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/08/1960
29/08/1960
N7/2   2645   9685 69685 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/2   2646   9686 69686 07/1927 STR
30E
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
09/05/1959
30/07/1960
22/10/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/2   2647   9687 69687 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/2   2648   9688 69688 07/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/2   2649   9689 69689 08/1927 HAT
NEA
34A
38B
32D
W
Hatfield
Neasden
Kings Cross
Annesley
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
21/07/1951
19/06/1954
19/03/1955
25/03/1957
25/03/1957
N7/3   2650   9690 69690 08/1927 HAT
NEA
34A
32A
32C
31A
32C
30A
30F
30A
W
Hatfield
Neasden
Kings Cross
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Cambridge
Lowestoft
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
22/09/1951
21/03/1953
16/06/1956
20/10/1956
16/08/1958
18/04/1959
30/01/1960
07/01/1961
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
N7/3   2651   9691 69691 08/1927 HAT
37A
37B
33A
33B
30A
30F
30A
W
Hatfield
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
23/10/1954
21/01/1956
22/09/1956
09/11/1957
30/01/1960
30/07/1960
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/2   2652   9692 69692 08/1927 HAT
NEA
34A
38B
30A
38B
31A
30A
34C
34A
30A
W
Hatfield
Neasden
Kings Cross
Annesley
Stratford
Annesley
Cambridge
Stratford
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
21/07/1951
22/05/1954
23/10/1954
25/12/1954
20/10/1956
13/09/1958
04/04/1959
07/01/1961
15/04/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/2   2653   9693 69693 08/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/2   2654   9694 69694 08/1927 HAT
34A
37A
37B
33B
31C
30A
30F
W
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Tilbury
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
19/06/1954
23/10/1954
17/11/1956
08/03/1958
23/07/1960
22/10/1960
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/2   2655   9695 69695 08/1927 HAT
37A
37B
33A
33B
30A
W
Hatfield
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1954
23/10/1954
21/01/1956
22/09/1956
13/09/1958
01/12/1958
01/12/1958
N7/3   2656   9696 69696 08/1927 HAT
32A
37A
37B
37C
37B
32D
30A
34C
34A
30A
W
Hatfield
Norwich Thorpe
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
19/06/1954
23/10/1954
23/07/1955
21/04/1956
17/11/1956
19/10/1957
31/10/1959
07/01/1961
15/04/1961
27/04/1961
27/04/1961
N7/3   2657   9697 69697 09/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/3   2658   9698 69698 09/1927 HAT
34A
37A
34A
32A
32D
33B
31C
34C
34A
30A
W
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Ardsley
Kings Cross
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Tilbury
Kings Lynn
Hatfield
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
18/08/1951
22/09/1951
24/07/1954
21/07/1956
20/10/1956
08/03/1958
07/03/1959
07/01/1961
15/04/1961
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2659   9699 69699 09/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/3   2660   9700 69700 09/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/2   2661   9701 69701 09/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2600   9702 69702 11/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/03/1961
17/03/1961
N7/3   2601   9703 69703 11/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/01/1951
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
N7/3   2602   9704 69704 11/1927 STR
34C
30A
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
30/01/1960
18/10/1960
18/10/1960
N7/3   2603   9705 69705 11/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1959
22/06/1959
N7/3   2604   9706 69706 11/1927 STR
32C
32A
32C
30A
W
Stratford
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/08/1956
20/10/1956
15/06/1957
12/09/1959
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2605   9707 69707 11/1927 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1959
27/04/1961
27/04/1961
N7/3   2606   9708 69708 12/1927 STR
32G
32A
32D
30A
32D
32C
32D
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
20/10/1951
20/03/1954
23/10/1954
25/12/1954
20/07/1957
19/10/1957
07/02/1959
30/01/1960
07/01/1961
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
N7/3   2607   9709 69709 12/1927 STR
34C
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Hatfield
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
20/07/1957
19/10/1957
01/11/1960
01/11/1960
N7/3   2608   9710 69710 12/1927 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2609   9711 69711 12/1927 STR
30E
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
21/10/1950
25/11/1950
23/11/1959
23/11/1959
N7/3   2610   9712 69712 12/1927 STR
30A
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/05/1950
21/10/1950
25/11/1950
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2611   9713 69713 01/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2612   9714 69714 01/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2613   9715 69715 01/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2614   9716 69716 02/1928 STR
30A
31C
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
21/10/1950
25/11/1950
19/07/1952
18/10/1952
12/02/1959
12/02/1959
N7/3   2615   9717 69717 02/1928 STR
IPS
30A
30E
30A
30A
W
51L
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
Thornaby
01/01/1948
07/1949
31/05/1950
21/07/1951
20/10/1951
18/10/1952
01/01/1959
07/10/1961
01/01/1959
N7/3   2616   9718 69718 02/1928 STR
31C
30A
W
Stratford
Kings Lynn
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1959
15/08/1959
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2617   9719 69719 03/1928 STR
IPS
30A
30E
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
31/05/1950
19/07/1952
18/10/1952
15/11/1952
21/11/1953
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/3   2618   9720 69720 04/1928 STR
30E
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
19/02/1955
14/05/1955
22/09/1956
01/11/1960
01/11/1960
N7/3   2619   9721 69721 06/1928 STR
30F
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
16/02/1957
19/10/1957
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2620   9722 69722 06/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2621   9723 69723 07/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2622   9724 69724 07/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2623   9725 69725 07/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
N7/3   2624   9726 69726 09/1928 STR
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
24/03/1951
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2625   9727 69727 09/1928 STR
30A
30F
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
17/11/1956
16/02/1957
16/05/1959
24/11/1960
24/11/1960
N7/3   2626   9728 69728 10/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2627   9729 69729 10/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1960
04/12/1960
N7/3   2628   9730 69730 11/1928 STR
30F
30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1959
30/01/1960
30/07/1960
22/10/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2629   9731 69731 11/1928 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/02/1959
03/02/1959
N7/3   2630   9732 69732 12/1928 STR
30E
30F
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1953
07/11/1959
30/01/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
N7/3   2631   9733 69733 12/1928 STR
30F
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
16/02/1957
07/11/1959
17/10/1960
17/10/1960