MLSR/LNER Parker "N5" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/1914 | Condemned | 1368 | COND | ||||
01/1914 | Condemned | 1369 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 5774 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 5908 | NTH | Northwich | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5518 | GOR | Gorton | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5536 | GOR | Gorton | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5759 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5760 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5761 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5410 | GOR | Gorton | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5902 | NTH | Northwich | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5904 | NTH | Northwich | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5910 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5937 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5530 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5545 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5546 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5761 | LIN | Lincoln | NEA | Neasden | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5763 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5771 | TUX | Tuxford | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5898 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5939 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
02/1936 | Condemned | 5410 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
11/1936 | Condemned | 5521 | COND | ||||
11/1937 | Condemned | 5758 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 5756 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 5531 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 5754 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 5774 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | COND | ||
03/1943 | Condemned | 5251 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9250 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9251 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9252 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9253 | GOR | Gorton | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9254 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9255 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9256 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9257 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9258 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9259 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9260 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9261 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9262 | NTH | Northwich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9263 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9264 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9265 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9266 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9267 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9268 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9271 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9269 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9272 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9273 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9274 | CHRN | Chester Northgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9275 | TUX | Tuxford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9276 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9277 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9278 | GOR | Gorton | BRN | Barnsley | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9279 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9280 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9281 | CHRN | Chester Northgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9282 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9283 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9284 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9285 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9286 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9287 | TUX | Tuxford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9288 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9289 | BID | Bidston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9290 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9291 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9293 | GOR | Gorton | NTH | Northwich | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9292 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9297 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9298 | STP | Heaton Mersey | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9299 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | GOR | Gorton | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9300 | NEA | Neasden | NEA | Neasden | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9301 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9296 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9294 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9295 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9302 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9270 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9303 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | BRN | Barnsley | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9304 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9305 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9306 | LTH | Louth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9307 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9308 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9309 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9310 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9311 | TUX | Tuxford | LIN | Lincoln | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9312 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9313 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9314 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9317 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9315 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9316 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9318 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9319 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9320 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9321 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9322 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9323 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9324 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9325 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9326 | NTH | Northwich | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9327 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9328 | NTH | Northwich | STP | Heaton Mersey | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9329 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9330 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9331 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9332 | NTH | Northwich | STP | Heaton Mersey | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9333 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9334 | BRN | Barnsley | BRN | Barnsley | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9335 | NTH | Northwich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9336 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9337 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9338 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9339 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9340 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9341 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9342 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9343 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9344 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9345 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9346 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9347 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9348 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9349 | NTH | Northwich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9350 | LEL | NEA | Neasden | ||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9351 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9352 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9353 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9354 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9355 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9356 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9357 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9358 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9359 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9360 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9361 | LIN | Lincoln | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9362 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9363 | LNG | Langwith Junction | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9364 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9365 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9366 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9367 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9368 | BRN | Barnsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9369 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9370 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9275 | TUX | Tuxford | LIN | Lincoln | |
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9287 | TUX | Tuxford | LIN | Lincoln | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 9338 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | GOR | Gorton | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9273 | NEA | Neasden | MEX | Mexborough | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9313 | NEA | Neasden | MEX | Mexborough | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9360 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
01/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9273 | MEX | Mexborough | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
01/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9313 | MEX | Mexborough | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9312 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9324 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
19/06/1948 | Reallocation | 9286 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
21/08/1948 | Reallocation | 69354 | NEA | Neasden | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 9326 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
06/11/1948 | Reallocation | 69282 | MEX | Mexborough | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 9250 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 9263 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 69360 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 9263 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 69307 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | Gorton | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 69360 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 69251 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 69277 | BRN | Barnsley | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 69286 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 69308 | GOR | Gorton | NTH | Northwich | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69277 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69286 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
08/04/1950 | Reallocation | 69324 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
09/04/1950 | Reallocation | 69312 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69256 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 40F | Boston | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69261 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 40F | Boston | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69280 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 40F | Boston | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69253 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 40A | Lincoln | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69253 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69256 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69261 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 69280 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 9353 | GOR | Gorton | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69304 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 2B | Bletchley | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 9353 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 27E | Walton on the Hill | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69333 | GOR | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
20/08/1950 | Reallocation | 69337 | LIV | Brunswick | 35A | New England | |
26/08/1950 | Reallocation | 69347 | GOR | Gorton | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
02/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69293 | NTH | Northwich | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69293 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69347 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9C | Macclesfield | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69337 | 35A | New England | 37A | Ardsley | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69337 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
24/09/1950 | Reallocation | 69347 | 9C | Macclesfield | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69288 | LIV | Brunswick | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69339 | LIV | Brunswick | 6F | Bidston | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69342 | LIV | Brunswick | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69280 | 40F | Boston | 40C | Louth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69280 | 40C | Louth | 40C | Louth | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 69257 | NEA | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 9271 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 9314 | MEX | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 69257 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34A | Kings Cross | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 9314 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69312 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69324 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69312 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69324 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/08/1951 | Condemned | 69252 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69285 | BRN | Barnsley | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69358 | NEA | Neasden | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69257 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34E | Neasden | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69257 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69285 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69358 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 69358 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
19/01/1952 | Reallocation | 69287 | LIN | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 69287 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
04/02/1952 | Condemned | 69311 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69253 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69327 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40A | Lincoln | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 69327 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 69285 | 36A | Doncaster | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69285 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69294 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69285 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69287 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69294 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69287 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 69266 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 69266 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 69289 | BID | Bidston | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
07/10/1952 | Reallocation | 69299 | GOR | Gorton | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 69328 | STP | Heaton Mersey | 39A | Gorton | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 69328 | 39A | Gorton | 91E | To Eastern Region | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 69299 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69262 | NTH | Northwich | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69273 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 34E | Neasden | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69283 | NEA | Neasden | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69300 | NEA | Neasden | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69335 | NTH | Northwich | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69354 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 34E | Neasden | |
03/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69262 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
03/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69335 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69273 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69283 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69300 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 69354 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 69266 | 37A | Ardsley | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 69285 | 36A | Doncaster | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 69294 | 36A | Doncaster | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 69292 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 69295 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 69269 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 69332 | STP | Heaton Mersey | 6D | Chester Northgate | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 69271 | 37A | Ardsley | 38A | Colwick | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 69337 | 37A | Ardsley | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 69337 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 36B | Mexborough | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 69280 | 40C | Louth | 36B | Mexborough | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 69306 | LTH | Louth | 36B | Mexborough | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 69309 | IMM | Immingham | 40C | Louth | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 69322 | IMM | Immingham | 40C | Louth | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 69327 | 40A | Lincoln | 40C | Louth | |
22/08/1953 | Reallocation | 69257 | 34E | Neasden | 38B | Annesley | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 69257 | 38B | Annesley | 34E | Neasden | |
21/11/1953 | Reallocation | 69286 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
21/11/1953 | Reallocation | 69360 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 69263 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 69287 | 40A | Lincoln | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 69310 | WFD | Woodford Halse | 38A | Colwick | |
20/02/1954 | Condemned | 69289 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 69357 | BRN | Barnsley | 36B | Mexborough | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 69253 | 40A | Lincoln | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 69348 | BRN | Barnsley | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/08/1954 | Reallocation | 69323 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 69257 | 34E | Neasden | 30A | Stratford | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 69348 | 36A | Doncaster | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
08/11/1954 | Condemned | 69324 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 69257 | 30A | Stratford | 34E | Neasden | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 69263 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/12/1954 | Condemned | 69336 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69259 | NEA | Neasden | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69296 | GOR | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69302 | NEA | Neasden | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69316 | MEX | Mexborough | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69337 | 36B | Mexborough | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 69369 | NEA | Neasden | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/02/1955 | Condemned | 69330 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
14/02/1955 | Condemned | 69264 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
12/03/1955 | Condemned | 69304 | 2B | Bletchley | COND | ||
14/03/1955 | Condemned | 69338 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
21/03/1955 | Condemned | 69313 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 69255 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 9G | Northwich | |
23/04/1955 | Condemned | 69288 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 69308 | NTH | Northwich | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
02/05/1955 | Condemned | 69368 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 69335 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
11/06/1955 | Condemned | 69352 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
13/06/1955 | Condemned | 69279 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
27/06/1955 | Condemned | 69273 | 34E | Neasden | COND | ||
11/07/1955 | Condemned | 69287 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 69255 | 9G | Northwich | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 69281 | CHRN | Chester Northgate | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
25/07/1955 | Condemned | 69282 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
13/08/1955 | Condemned | 69364 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
20/08/1955 | Reallocation | 69260 | GOR | Gorton | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
04/11/1955 | Condemned | 69291 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
04/11/1955 | Condemned | 69367 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
05/11/1955 | Condemned | 69253 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69254 | LIVLMR | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
05/11/1955 | Condemned | 69285 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69343 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
08/11/1955 | Condemned | 69306 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
11/11/1955 | Condemned | 69357 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69261 | 40F | Boston | 40B | Immingham | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69269 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 40B | Immingham | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69297 | MEX | Mexborough | 40B | Immingham | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69305 | IMM | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69309 | 40C | Louth | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69327 | 40C | Louth | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 69369 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40F | Boston | |
14/11/1955 | Condemned | 69353 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
18/11/1955 | Condemned | 69310 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
19/11/1955 | Condemned | 69256 | 40F | Boston | COND | ||
19/11/1955 | Condemned | 69275 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
19/11/1955 | Condemned | 69278 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
19/11/1955 | Condemned | 69303 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
22/11/1955 | Condemned | 69280 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
16/12/1955 | Condemned | 69301 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69271 | 38A | Colwick | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69286 | 38A | Colwick | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69300 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36D | Barnsley | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69308 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36B | Mexborough | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69351 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 39A | Gorton | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69360 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
02/01/1956 | Condemned | 69333 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
11/02/1956 | Condemned | 69317 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
17/03/1956 | Condemned | 69339 | 6F | Bidston | COND | ||
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 69269 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 69369 | 40F | Boston | 40B | Immingham | |
28/04/1956 | Condemned | 69359 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
12/05/1956 | Condemned | 69340 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
26/05/1956 | Condemned | 69254 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
26/05/1956 | Condemned | 69272 | LIVLMR | COND | |||
16/06/1956 | Condemned | 69255 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
09/07/1956 | Condemned | 69334 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
09/07/1956 | Condemned | 69363 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
23/07/1956 | Condemned | 69260 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
06/08/1956 | Condemned | 69337 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
11/08/1956 | Condemned | 69366 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
13/08/1956 | Condemned | 69250 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
25/08/1956 | Reallocation | 69269 | 40F | Boston | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
25/08/1956 | Reallocation | 69284 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40F | Boston | |
25/08/1956 | Reallocation | 69297 | 40B | Immingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
24/09/1956 | Condemned | 69325 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
10/1956 | Condemned | 69270 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
08/10/1956 | Condemned | 69321 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
16/10/1956 | Condemned | 69351 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69322 | 40C | Louth | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69354 | 34E | Neasden | 36D | Barnsley | |
25/10/1956 | Condemned | 69345 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
05/11/1956 | Condemned | 69318 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
10/11/1956 | Condemned | 69358 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 69315 | NEA | Neasden | 36D | Barnsley | |
20/11/1956 | Condemned | 69277 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
26/11/1956 | Condemned | 69323 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69343 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
09/01/1957 | Condemned | 69328 | 91E | To Eastern Region | COND | ||
18/01/1957 | Condemned | 69350 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
25/01/1957 | Condemned | 69348 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
26/01/1957 | Condemned | 69331 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
02/02/1957 | Condemned | 69369 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
09/02/1957 | Condemned | 69365 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
16/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69284 | 40F | Boston | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
16/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69319 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 34E | Neasden | |
23/02/1957 | Condemned | 69356 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
11/03/1957 | Condemned | 69316 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
16/03/1957 | Reallocation | 69261 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
16/03/1957 | Reallocation | 69322 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
09/1957 | Condemned | 69346 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
14/09/1957 | Condemned | 69335 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69267 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 54B | Tyne Dock | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69290 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 54B | Tyne Dock | |
21/09/1957 | Condemned | 69329 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
07/10/1957 | Condemned | 69312 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
14/12/1957 | Condemned | 69326 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
14/12/1957 | Condemned | 69347 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
08/01/1958 | Condemned | 69261 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
08/01/1958 | Condemned | 69302 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/04/1958 | Condemned | 69295 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
21/04/1958 | Condemned | 69355 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69258 | LIV | Brunswick | 34E | New England | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69262 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 34E | New England | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69274 | CHRN | Chester Northgate | 34E | New England | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69276 | STP | Heaton Mersey | 34E | New England | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69293 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 34E | New England | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69299 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69332 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69342 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69343 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69361 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69370 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/06/1958 | Condemned | 69315 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
12/06/1958 | Condemned | 69283 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69267 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 34E | New England | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69290 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 34E | New England | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69299 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69332 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41G | Barnsley | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69342 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41G | Barnsley | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69343 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41G | Barnsley | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69370 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41G | Barnsley | |
03/08/1958 | Condemned | 69271 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
03/08/1958 | Condemned | 69284 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
03/08/1958 | Condemned | 69300 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
03/08/1958 | Condemned | 69305 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
08/08/1958 | Condemned | 69297 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
31/08/1958 | Condemned | 69281 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
31/08/1958 | Condemned | 69349 | WRK | COND | |||
31/08/1958 | Condemned | 69362 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
17/10/1958 | Condemned | 69269 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
14/11/1958 | Condemned | 69259 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 69314 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 34E | New England | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 69322 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 34E | New England | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69258 | 34E | New England | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69266 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69290 | 34E | New England | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69292 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69314 | 34E | New England | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69327 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
11/02/1959 | Condemned | 69332 | 41G | Barnsley | COND | ||
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 69286 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
08/06/1959 | Condemned | 69361 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
24/06/1959 | Condemned | 69322 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
01/08/1959 | Reallocation | 69266 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 34C | Hatfield | |
06/08/1959 | Condemned | 69342 | 41G | Barnsley | COND | ||
17/09/1959 | Condemned | 69327 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
02/10/1959 | Condemned | 69290 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
02/10/1959 | Condemned | 69294 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 69266 | 34C | Hatfield | 34E | New England | |
06/10/1959 | Condemned | 69320 | BRN | Barnsley | COND | ||
17/10/1959 | Reallocation | 69268 | BRN | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 69263 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69257 | 34E | Neasden | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69265 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69298 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69319 | 34E | Neasden | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69341 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Condemned | 69344 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
22/12/1959 | Condemned | 69262 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
22/12/1959 | Condemned | 69276 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 69343 | 41G | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 69354 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 69370 | 41G | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
11/01/1960 | Condemned | 69343 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
20/01/1960 | Condemned | 69314 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
26/01/1960 | Condemned | 69267 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
26/01/1960 | Condemned | 69268 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/01/1960 | Condemned | 69292 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
29/01/1960 | Condemned | 69299 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
12/02/1960 | Condemned | 69354 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
17/02/1960 | Condemned | 69308 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
19/03/1960 | Condemned | 69360 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
10/09/1960 | Condemned | 69258 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/09/1960 | Condemned | 69370 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
17/11/1960 | Condemned | 69263 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
23/11/1960 | Condemned | 69309 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
25/11/1960 | Condemned | 69266 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
26/11/1960 | Condemned | 69274 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
26/11/1960 | Condemned | 69286 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/11/1960 | Condemned | 69293 | 34E | New England | COND | ||
06/12/1960 | Condemned | 69296 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/12/1960 | Condemned | 69307 | GOR | Gorton | COND |