MLSR/LNER Parker "N5" Class 0-6-2T
Class | MSLR | MSLR (Renum) | WLR | WMCQR | LYR | GCR | GCR (Renum) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N5/2 | 7 | 515 | 5515 | 9250 | 69250 | 09/1891 | LIV GOR W |
Brunswick Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 13/08/1956 |
13/08/1956 | |||||
N5/2 | 47 | 516 | 5516 | 9251 | 69251 | 08/1892 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/07/1949 |
18/07/1949 | |||||
N5/2 | 171 | 517 | 5517 | 9252 | 69252 | 11/1892 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1951 |
25/08/1951 | |||||
N5/2 | 518 | 5518 | 9253 | 69253 | 08/1893 | GOR BFD 40A 40A 40A 39B W |
Gorton Bradford Hammerton Street Lincoln Lincoln Lincoln Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 21/05/1950 31/05/1950 16/02/1952 24/04/1954 05/11/1955 |
05/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 519 | 5519 | 9254 | 69254 | 09/1893 | GOR 6E W |
Gorton Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 05/11/1955 26/05/1956 |
26/05/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 520 | 5520 | 9255 | 69255 | 09/1893 | TFD 9G 9E W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Northwich Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1955 16/07/1955 16/06/1956 |
16/06/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 521 | 5521 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1936 | 11/1936 | ||||||||
N5/2 | 522 | 5522 | 9256 | 69256 | 09/1893 | BFD 40F 40F W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Boston Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 19/11/1955 |
19/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 523 | 5523 | 9257 | 69257 | 10/1893 | NEA 34A 34A 34E 34E 38B 34E 30A 34E W |
Neasden Kings Cross Kings Cross Neasden Neasden Annesley Neasden Stratford Neasden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 22/08/1953 19/09/1953 23/10/1954 13/11/1954 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 524 | 5524 | 9258 | 69258 | 10/1893 | LIV 34E 41A W |
Brunswick New England Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/05/1958 13/12/1958 10/09/1960 |
10/09/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 525 | 5525 | 9259 | 69259 | 10/1893 | NEA 39B W |
Neasden Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 14/11/1958 |
14/11/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 526 | 5526 | 9260 | 69260 | 10/1893 | GOR 36E W |
Gorton Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1955 23/07/1956 |
23/07/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 527 | 5527 | 9261 | 69261 | 10/1893 | BFD 40F 40F 40B 40E W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Boston Boston Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 12/11/1955 16/03/1957 08/01/1958 |
08/01/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 528 | 5528 | 9262 | 69262 | 10/1893 | NTH 9F 9F 34E W |
Northwich Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 10/05/1958 22/12/1959 |
22/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 529 | 5529 | 9263 | 69263 | 11/1893 | CLK WFD WFD 38A 38D 41J W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 07/1949 19/12/1953 13/11/1954 31/10/1959 17/11/1960 |
17/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 530 | 5530 | 9264 | 69264 | 11/1893 | ARD MEX W |
Ardsley Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 14/02/1955 |
14/02/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 531 | 5531 | 11/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | ||||||||
N5/2 | 532 | 5532 | 9265 | 69265 | 11/1893 | WAL W |
Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 533 | 5533 | 9266 | 69266 | 12/1893 | COP 37A 37A 39B 31E 34C 34E W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Sheffield Darnall Bury St Edmunds Hatfield New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/08/1952 06/09/1952 14/02/1953 13/12/1958 01/08/1959 03/10/1959 25/11/1960 |
25/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 534 | 5534 | 9267 | 69267 | 12/1893 | WRX 54B 34E W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Tyne Dock New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1957 19/07/1958 26/01/1960 |
26/01/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 535 | 5535 | 9268 | 69268 | 01/1894 | BRN 41J W |
Barnsley Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/10/1959 26/01/1960 |
26/01/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 537 | 5537 | 9271 | 69271 | 01/1894 | COP 37A 38A 41A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Colwick Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 16/05/1953 17/12/1955 03/08/1958 |
03/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 538 | 127 | 5127 | 9269 | 69269 | 01/1894 | WFD 38D 40B 40F 38D W |
Woodford Halse Staveley (G.C.) Immingham Boston Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 12/11/1955 24/03/1956 25/08/1956 17/10/1958 |
17/10/1958 | |||||
N5/2 | 539 | 5539 | 9272 | 69272 | 02/1894 | GOR W |
Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 26/05/1956 |
26/05/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 540 | 5540 | 9273 | 69273 | 02/1894 | NEA MEX RET 34E 34E W |
Neasden Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Neasden Neasden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 01/05/1948 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 27/06/1955 |
27/06/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 541 | 5541 | 9274 | 69274 | 02/1894 | CHR 34E W |
Chester Northgate New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/05/1958 26/11/1960 |
26/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 542 | 5542 | 9275 | 69275 | 02/1894 | TUX LIN W |
Tuxford Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 19/11/1955 |
19/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 543 | 5543 | 9276 | 69276 | 03/1894 | STP 34E W |
Heaton Mersey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/05/1958 22/12/1959 |
22/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 544 | 5544 | 9277 | 69277 | 03/1894 | BRN RET RET W |
Barnsley Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 20/11/1956 |
20/11/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 545 | 5545 | 9278 | 69278 | 03/1894 | GOR BRN W |
Gorton Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 19/11/1955 |
19/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 546 | 5546 | 9279 | 69279 | 03/1894 | CLK STV W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 13/06/1955 |
13/06/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 547 | 5547 | 9280 | 69280 | 03/1894 | BFD 40F 40F 40C 40C 36B W |
Bradford Hammerton Street Boston Boston Louth Louth Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 25/07/1953 22/11/1955 |
22/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 548 | 5548 | 9281 | 69281 | 03/1894 | CHR 6E W |
Chester Northgate Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 31/08/1958 |
31/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 744 | 5744 | 9282 | 69282 | 08/1894 | MEX RET W |
Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 25/07/1955 |
25/07/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 745 | 5745 | 9283 | 69283 | 08/1894 | NEA 36E 36E W |
Neasden Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 12/06/1958 |
12/06/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 746 | 5746 | 9284 | 69284 | 08/1894 | LNG 40F 40E W |
Langwith Junction Boston Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1956 16/02/1957 03/08/1958 |
03/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 747 | 5747 | 9285 | 69285 | 09/1894 | BRN 36A 36A 36E 36A 36A 39B W |
Barnsley Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 14/02/1953 05/11/1955 |
05/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 748 | 5748 | 9286 | 69286 | 09/1894 | CLK ANN WFD WFD 38A 41A 41J W |
Colwick Annesley Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Sheffield Darnall Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 21/11/1953 17/12/1955 18/04/1959 26/11/1960 |
26/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 749 | 5749 | 9287 | 69287 | 09/1894 | TUX LIN 40B 40B 40A 40A 39B W |
Tuxford Lincoln Immingham Immingham Lincoln Lincoln Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 21/06/1952 12/07/1952 19/12/1953 11/07/1955 |
11/07/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 750 | 5750 | 9288 | 69288 | 10/1894 | LIV 6E W |
Brunswick Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 23/04/1955 |
23/04/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 751 | 5751 | 9289 | 69289 | 10/1894 | BID 6E W |
Bidston Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 20/02/1954 |
20/02/1954 | ||||||
N5/2 | 752 | 5752 | 9290 | 69290 | 10/1894 | WRX 54B 34E 41A W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Tyne Dock New England Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1957 19/07/1958 13/12/1958 02/10/1959 |
02/10/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 753 | 5753 | 9291 | 69291 | 11/1894 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1955 |
04/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/1 | 754 | 8 | 1368 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1914 | 01/1914 | |||||||
N5/1 | 755 | 9 | 1369 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1914 | 01/1914 | |||||||
N5/2 | 536 | 5536 | 9293 | 69293 | 05/1895 | GOR NTH 6D 6D 34E W |
Gorton Northwich Chester Northgate Chester Northgate New England Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 02/09/1950 09/09/1950 10/05/1958 29/11/1960 |
29/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 200 | 200 | 5200 | 9292 | 69292 | 09/1895 | STV 39B 31E W |
Staveley (G.C.) Sheffield Darnall Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 13/12/1958 29/01/1960 |
29/01/1960 | |||||
N5/2 | 756 | 23 | 756 | 5756 | 12/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1938 | 10/1938 | ||||||
N5/2 | 757 | 5757 | 9297 | 69297 | 02/1896 | MEX 40B 36D W |
Mexborough Immingham Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 25/08/1956 08/08/1958 |
08/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 758 | 5758 | 03/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1937 | 11/1937 | ||||||||
N5/2 | 759 | 5759 | 9298 | 69298 | 04/1896 | STP WAL W |
Heaton Mersey Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 760 | 5760 | 9299 | 69299 | 05/1896 | WRX GOR 9F 9F 41A 41J W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Gorton Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Sheffield Darnall Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 07/10/1952 29/11/1952 10/05/1958 19/07/1958 29/01/1960 |
29/01/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 761 | 5761 | 9300 | 69300 | 05/1896 | LIN NEA NEA 36E 36E 36D W |
Lincoln Neasden Neasden Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Barnsley Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/1936 01/01/1948 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 17/12/1955 03/08/1958 |
03/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 762 | 5762 | 9301 | 69301 | 06/1896 | STV W |
Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1955 |
16/12/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 201 | 54 | 5054 | 9296 | 69296 | 09/1896 | GOR 39B W |
Gorton Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 06/12/1960 |
06/12/1960 | |||||
N5/2 | 202 | 21 | 5021 | 9294 | 69294 | 10/1896 | RET 36A 36A 39B W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 14/02/1953 02/10/1959 |
02/10/1959 | |||||
N5/2 | 203 | 25 | 5025 | 9295 | 69295 | 12/1896 | STV 39B W |
Staveley (G.C.) Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 12/04/1958 |
12/04/1958 | |||||
N5/2 | 754 | 19 | 754 | 5754 | 01/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | ||||||
N5/2 | 755 | 20 | 755 | 5755 | 9302 | 69302 | 01/1896 | NEA 39B W |
Neasden Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 08/01/1958 |
08/01/1958 | ||||
N5/2 | 17 | 409 | 5409 | 9270 | 69270 | 02/1896 | GOR W |
Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1956 |
10/1956 | |||||
N5/2 | 18 | 410 | 5410 | 02/1896 | GOR W |
Gorton Withdrawn |
12/1935 02/1936 |
02/1936 | |||||||
N5/2 | 763 | 5763 | 9303 | 69303 | 03/1898 | COP BRN W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 19/11/1955 |
19/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 764 | 5764 | 9304 | 69304 | 03/1898 | TFD 2B W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 12/03/1955 |
12/03/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 765 | 5765 | 9305 | 69305 | 05/1898 | IMM 36B W |
Immingham Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 03/08/1958 |
03/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 766 | 5766 | 9306 | 69306 | 05/1898 | LTH 36B W |
Louth Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/07/1953 08/11/1955 |
08/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 767 | 5767 | 9307 | 69307 | 05/1898 | GOR GOR W |
Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 10/12/1960 |
10/12/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 768 | 5768 | 9308 | 69308 | 05/1898 | GOR NTH 36E 36B W |
Gorton Northwich Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 23/04/1955 17/12/1955 17/02/1960 |
17/02/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 769 | 5769 | 9309 | 69309 | 07/1898 | IMM 40C 38D W |
Immingham Louth Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/07/1953 12/11/1955 23/11/1960 |
23/11/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 770 | 5770 | 9310 | 69310 | 07/1898 | WFD 38A W |
Woodford Halse Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1953 18/11/1955 |
18/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/3 | 771 | 5771 | 9311 | 69311 | 07/1898 | TUX LIN W |
Tuxford Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 04/02/1952 |
04/02/1952 | ||||||
N5/2 | 772 | 5772 | 9312 | 69312 | 07/1898 | CLK WFD 38A 39B 39B W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Colwick Sheffield Darnall Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 09/04/1950 16/06/1951 23/06/1951 07/10/1957 |
07/10/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 773 | 5773 | 9313 | 69313 | 08/1898 | NEA MEX RET W |
Neasden Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 01/05/1948 21/03/1955 |
21/03/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 774 | 5774 | 08/1898 | LEI W |
Leicester (G.C.) Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/1939 |
01/1939 | ||||||||
N5/2 | 775 | 5775 | 9314 | 69314 | 08/1898 | MEX 36E 36E 34E 41A W |
Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) New England Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 15/11/1958 13/12/1958 20/01/1960 |
20/01/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 204 | 51 | 5189 | 9317 | 69317 | 02/1898 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1956 |
11/02/1956 | |||||
N5/2 | 205 | 173 | 5251 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1943 | 03/1943 | |||||||
N5/2 | 206 | 189 | 5051 | 9315 | 69315 | 04/1898 | NEA 36D W |
Neasden Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 03/06/1958 |
03/06/1958 | |||||
N5/2 | 207 | 251 | 5173 | 9316 | 69316 | 05/1898 | MEX 39B W |
Mexborough Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 11/03/1957 |
11/03/1957 | |||||
N5/2 | 894 | 5894 | 9318 | 69318 | 03/1899 | NEA W |
Neasden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1956 |
05/11/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 895 | 5895 | 9319 | 69319 | 03/1899 | LNG 34E W |
Langwith Junction Neasden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1957 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 896 | 5896 | 9320 | 69320 | 04/1899 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1959 |
06/10/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 897 | 5897 | 9321 | 69321 | 05/1899 | RET W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1956 |
08/10/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 898 | 5898 | 9322 | 69322 | 06/1899 | LIN IMM 40C 40E 36E 34E W |
Lincoln Immingham Louth Langwith Junction Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) New England Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 25/07/1953 20/10/1956 16/03/1957 15/11/1958 24/06/1959 |
24/06/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 899 | 5899 | 9323 | 69323 | 06/1899 | LNG 39B W |
Langwith Junction Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1954 26/11/1956 |
26/11/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 900 | 5900 | 9324 | 69324 | 07/1899 | CLK WFD 38A 39B 39B W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Colwick Sheffield Darnall Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 08/04/1950 16/06/1951 23/06/1951 08/11/1954 |
08/11/1954 | ||||||
N5/2 | 901 | 5901 | 9325 | 69325 | 08/1899 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1956 |
24/09/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 902 | 5902 | 9326 | 69326 | 09/1899 | NTH WRX TFD W |
Northwich Wrexham Rhosddu Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 23/10/1948 14/12/1957 |
14/12/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 903 | 5903 | 9327 | 69327 | 09/1899 | LNG 40A 40A 40C 41A 31E W |
Langwith Junction Lincoln Lincoln Louth Sheffield Darnall Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 25/07/1953 12/11/1955 13/12/1958 17/09/1959 |
17/09/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 904 | 5904 | 9328 | 69328 | 10/1899 | NTH STP 39A 91E W |
Northwich Heaton Mersey Gorton To Eastern Region Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 09/01/1957 |
09/01/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 905 | 5905 | 9329 | 69329 | 11/1899 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1957 |
21/09/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 906 | 5906 | 9330 | 69330 | 11/1899 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 907 | 5907 | 9331 | 69331 | 11/1899 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1957 |
26/01/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 908 | 5908 | 9332 | 69332 | 12/1899 | NTH STP 6D 41A 41G W |
Northwich Heaton Mersey Chester Northgate Sheffield Darnall Barnsley Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 18/04/1953 10/05/1958 19/07/1958 11/02/1959 |
11/02/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 909 | 5909 | 9333 | 69333 | 12/1899 | GOR 39A W |
Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1950 02/01/1956 |
02/01/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 910 | 5910 | 9334 | 69334 | 01/1900 | BRN BRN W |
Barnsley Barnsley Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 09/07/1956 |
09/07/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 911 | 5911 | 9335 | 69335 | 02/1900 | NTH 9E 9E 6E W |
Northwich Trafford Park (LMS) Trafford Park (LMS) Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 21/05/1955 14/09/1957 |
14/09/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 912 | 5912 | 9336 | 69336 | 03/1900 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1954 |
11/12/1954 | ||||||
N5/2 | 913 | 5913 | 9337 | 69337 | 03/1900 | LIV 35A 37A 37A 37C 36B 39B W |
Brunswick New England Ardsley Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Mexborough Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1950 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 16/05/1953 20/06/1953 25/12/1954 06/08/1956 |
06/08/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 914 | 5914 | 9338 | 69338 | 04/1900 | WAL GOR W |
Walton on the Hill Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 14/03/1955 |
14/03/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 915 | 5915 | 9339 | 69339 | 05/1900 | LIV 6F W |
Brunswick Bidston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 17/03/1956 |
17/03/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 916 | 5916 | 9340 | 69340 | 06/1900 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1956 |
12/05/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 917 | 5917 | 9341 | 69341 | 06/1900 | NEA W |
Neasden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 918 | 5918 | 9342 | 69342 | 07/1900 | LIV 6D 41A 41G W |
Brunswick Chester Northgate Sheffield Darnall Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 10/05/1958 19/07/1958 06/08/1959 |
06/08/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 919 | 5919 | 9343 | 69343 | 09/1900 | TFD 6E 9E 41A 41G 41F W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Wrexham Rhosddu Trafford Park (LMS) Sheffield Darnall Barnsley Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 01/12/1956 10/05/1958 19/07/1958 09/01/1960 11/01/1960 |
11/01/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 920 | 5920 | 9344 | 69344 | 10/1900 | WAL W |
Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 921 | 5921 | 9345 | 69345 | 11/1900 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/10/1956 |
25/10/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 922 | 5922 | 9346 | 69346 | 12/1900 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1957 |
09/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 923 | 5923 | 9347 | 69347 | 12/1900 | GOR 9E 9C 9E W |
Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Macclesfield Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1950 09/09/1950 24/09/1950 14/12/1957 |
14/12/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 924 | 5924 | 9348 | 69348 | 12/1900 | BRN 36A 39B W |
Barnsley Doncaster Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1954 23/10/1954 25/01/1957 |
25/01/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 925 | 5925 | 9349 | 69349 | 04/1900 | NTH W |
Northwich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 31/08/1958 |
31/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 926 | 5926 | 9350 | 69350 | 04/1900 | NEA W |
Neasden Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 18/01/1957 |
18/01/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 927 | 5927 | 9351 | 69351 | 04/1900 | STV 39A W |
Staveley (G.C.) Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1955 16/10/1956 |
16/10/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 928 | 5928 | 9352 | 69352 | 05/1900 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1955 |
11/06/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 929 | 5929 | 9353 | 69353 | 05/1900 | GOR 91M 27E W |
Gorton To London Midland Region Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/05/1950 17/06/1950 14/11/1955 |
14/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 930 | 5930 | 9354 | 69354 | 05/1900 | NEA RET 34E 34E 36D 41F W |
Neasden Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Neasden Neasden Barnsley Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 20/10/1956 09/01/1960 12/02/1960 |
12/02/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 931 | 5931 | 9355 | 69355 | 05/1900 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1958 |
21/04/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 932 | 5932 | 9356 | 69356 | 05/1900 | WAL W |
Walton on the Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 |
23/02/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 933 | 5933 | 9357 | 69357 | 05/1900 | BRN 36B W |
Barnsley Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1954 11/11/1955 |
11/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 934 | 5934 | 9358 | 69358 | 05/1900 | NEA 9E 9E 9E W |
Neasden Trafford Park (LMS) Trafford Park (LMS) Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 06/10/1951 10/11/1956 |
10/11/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 935 | 5935 | 9359 | 69359 | 05/1900 | STP W |
Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1956 |
28/04/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 936 | 5936 | 9360 | 69360 | 06/1900 | STV CLK WFD WFD 38A 39A W |
Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 25/06/1949 07/1949 21/11/1953 17/12/1955 19/03/1960 |
19/03/1960 | ||||||
N5/2 | 937 | 5937 | 9361 | 69361 | 06/1900 | LIN TFD 41A W |
Lincoln Trafford Park (LNER) Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 10/05/1958 08/06/1959 |
08/06/1959 | ||||||
N5/2 | 938 | 5938 | 9362 | 69362 | 06/1900 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/08/1958 |
31/08/1958 | ||||||
N5/2 | 939 | 5939 | 9363 | 69363 | 07/1900 | LNG STV W |
Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 09/07/1956 |
09/07/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 940 | 5940 | 9364 | 69364 | 07/1900 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 |
13/08/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 941 | 5941 | 9365 | 69365 | 02/1901 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/02/1957 |
09/02/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 942 | 5942 | 9366 | 69366 | 02/1901 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 |
11/08/1956 | ||||||
N5/2 | 943 | 5943 | 9367 | 69367 | 02/1901 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1955 |
04/11/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 944 | 5944 | 9368 | 69368 | 02/1901 | BRN W |
Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/05/1955 |
02/05/1955 | ||||||
N5/2 | 945 | 5945 | 9369 | 69369 | 03/1901 | NEA 39B 40F 40B W |
Neasden Sheffield Darnall Boston Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 12/11/1955 24/03/1956 02/02/1957 |
02/02/1957 | ||||||
N5/2 | 946 | 5946 | 9370 | 69370 | 03/1901 | TFD 41A 41G 41F W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Sheffield Darnall Barnsley Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/05/1958 19/07/1958 09/01/1960 10/09/1960 |
10/09/1960 |